Attuso, et al v. Omegaflex, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Marc Attuso, Monique Attuso, Zachary Attuso, Eli Darwin, Republic Fire & Casualty Insurance Co. and Ricky Rodriguez
Defendant: Audubon Plumbing, Inc. and Omegaflex, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2018cv00157
Filed: February 16, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Office: Baton Rouge Office
Presiding Judge: Shelly D. Dick
Presiding Judge: Richard L. Bourgeois
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1446pl Petition for Removal - Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 99 RULING granting in part and denying in part 57 Motion for Summary Judgment. Omega Flexs Motion is GRANTED as toRepublics breach of warranty claim and DENIED as to Republics failure to warn claim.Republics breach of warranty claim under the LPLA is therefore DISMISSED withprejudice. Signed by Chief Judge Shelly D. Dick on 4/13/2020. (KMW)
April 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 98 RULING denying 77 Motion to Exclude Certain Opinions and Testimony of Elizabeth Buc. Signed by Chief Judge Shelly D. Dick on 04/09/2020. (NLT)
April 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 95 RULING granting 67 Motion in Limine. Signed by Chief Judge Shelly D. Dick on 4/7/2020. (EDC)
April 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 94 Ruling denying 58 Motion in Limine. Signed by Chief Judge Shelly D. Dick on 04/06/2020. (LT)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Attuso, et al v. Omegaflex, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marc Attuso
Represented By: William Ransom Pipes
Represented By: Edward E. Rundell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Monique Attuso
Represented By: William Ransom Pipes
Represented By: Edward E. Rundell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zachary Attuso
Represented By: William Ransom Pipes
Represented By: Edward E. Rundell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eli Darwin
Represented By: William Ransom Pipes
Represented By: Edward E. Rundell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Republic Fire & Casualty Insurance Co.
Represented By: William Ransom Pipes
Represented By: Edward E. Rundell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ricky Rodriguez
Represented By: William Ransom Pipes
Represented By: Edward E. Rundell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Audubon Plumbing, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Omegaflex, Inc.
Represented By: David R. Frohn
Represented By: Meghan Brianne Senter
Represented By: Kevin R Sloan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?