Carmouche v. Cigna Health and Life Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Anthony L. Carmouche
Defendant: Cigna Health and Life Insurance Company
Not Classified By Court: Lawrence C. Bulleaud
Case Number: 3:2018cv00492
Filed: April 23, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Office: Baton Rouge Office
Presiding Judge: Richard L Bourgeois
Referring Judge: Shelly D Dick
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1001
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 11, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 11, 2018 Filing 10 Return on Electronic Transfer from Western District of Louisiana. (ELW)
June 11, 2018 Filing 9 Extraction Log of a case Transferred to Western District of Louisiana. (ELW)
June 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #6 Motion to Transfer Case Case transferred to District of Western District of Louisiana. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 06/07/2018. (ELW)
June 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: In view of the pending Joint Motion to Transfer, the Scheduling Conference set for 6/21/2018 at 11:15 AM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois Jr. and the deadline of 6/7/2018 to file a Joint Status Report are CANCELLED. The parties shall contact the Court to reset the conference, if necessary. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 6/6/2018. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.)(JSL)
May 31, 2018 Filing 6 Joint MOTION to Transfer Case to Western District of Louisiana (Lafayette Division) by Cigna Health and Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Proposed Order)(Gonsoulin, Benjamin)
May 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 6/21/2018 at 11:15 AM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois Jr. Status Report due by 6/7/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 05/14/2018. (ELW)
May 14, 2018 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Cigna Health and Life Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Cigna Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent Connecticut General Corp., Corporate Parent Connecticut General Life Insurance Company, Corporate Parent Cigna Corporation for Cigna Health and Life Insurance Company.. (Gonsoulin, Benjamin)
May 14, 2018 Filing 3 Defendant Cigna Health and Life Insurance Company's ANSWER to Complaint by Cigna Health and Life Insurance Company.(Gonsoulin, Benjamin)
May 2, 2018 Filing 2 Letter to Attorney Lawrence Billeaud who is lead counsel for party Plaintiff. Attorney is not admitted to practice in LAMD. (ELW)
April 23, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 19th JDC, East Baton Rouge Parish, Case Number C666553. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053N-1758180), filed by Cigna Health and Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet)(Gonsoulin, Benjamin) (Attachment 2 replaced on 4/24/2018) (ELW). Modified on 4/24/2018 to correct page orientation (ELW).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Carmouche v. Cigna Health and Life Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cigna Health and Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Benjamin Eric Gonsoulin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony L. Carmouche
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Lawrence C. Bulleaud
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?