Olivier v. Exxon Mobil Corporation
Plaintiff: Billy D. Olivier
Defendant: Exxon Mobil Corporation
Petitioner: Tomas Paez
Case Number: 3:2018cv00568
Filed: May 21, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Office: Baton Rouge Office
Presiding Judge: Shelly D Dick
Referring Judge: Brian A Jackson
2 Judge: Erin Wilder-Doomes
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 22, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 158 ORDER granting #105 Motion in Limine No. 2 Regarding Contracts and Testimony on the Meaning and Effect of Contracts for the reasons set forth in the Court's #125 Ruling. Signed by Chief Judge Shelly D. Dick on 8/9/2022. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (SWE)
August 8, 2022 Filing 157 Proposed Jury Instructions by Billy D. Olivier. (Quackenbos, Andrew)
August 8, 2022 Filing 156 Proposed Voir Dire Questions by Billy D. Olivier. (Quackenbos, Andrew)
August 8, 2022 Filing 155 Proposed Voir Dire Questions by Exxon Mobil Corporation. (Morale, Trinity)
August 8, 2022 Filing 154 Proposed Jury Verdict Form by Billy D. Olivier.. (Quackenbos, Andrew)
August 8, 2022 Filing 153 Minute Entry/Video Hearing Report and Order for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes. Motion Hearing held on 8/8/2022 re #139 MOTION to Quash Trial Subpoena on Behalf of Tomas Paez. #139 MOTION to Quash Trial Subpoena on Behalf of Tomas Paez is TERMINATED AS MOOT, in light of the parties agreement to present Paezs trial testimony via contemporaneous transmission, as set forth here within. (ELW)
August 5, 2022 Filing 152 Minute Entry/VIDEO HEARING REPORT AND ORDER for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes: Motion Hearing held on 8/5/2022 re #139 MOTION to Quash Trial Subpoena on Behalf of Tomas Paez filed by Exxon Mobil Corporation, Tomas Paez. The #139 Motion to Quash Trial Subpoena, filed by witness Tomas Paez, is TAKEN UNDER ADVISEMENT while the parties investigate the feasibility of Paez providing testimony at trial via contemporaneous transmission using Zoom. A follow-up hearing shall be set for August 8, 2022, at 1:00 p.m. via Zoom so that the parties can resume these discussions. (LLH)
August 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 150 ORDER granting in part #147 Ex Parte Motion to Substitute Pleading and to Strike Pleading Filed in Error. The clerk is directed to replace R. Doc. 143 with R. Doc. 147-2. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 8/4/2022. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (BLR)
August 3, 2022 Filing 151 REPLY Memorandum in Support of #139 MOTION to Quash Trial Subpoena on Behalf of Tomas Paez filed by Tomas Paez and Exxon Mobil Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 4-Deposition)(LLH)
August 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 149 ORDER granting #148 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Reply Memorandum in Support of Motion to Quash Trial Subpoena on Behalf of Tomas Paez filed by Tomas Paez. Signed by Chief Judge Shelly D. Dick on 8/3/2022. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (SWE)
August 3, 2022 Filing 148 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Reply Memorandum in Support of Motion to Quash Trial Subpoena on Behalf of Tomas Paez by Tomas Paez (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proposed Pleading; Reply Memorandum in Support of Motion to Quash Trial Subpoena on Behalf of Tomas Paez, #3 Exhibit 4: Paez deposition exhibits)(Taplin, Cherrell)
August 3, 2022 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #147 Ex Parte MOTION to Strike an Incorrectly Filed Document #143 Memorandum in Opposition to Exxon's Motion to Quash Trial Subpoena on behalf of Tomas Paez. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (ELW)
August 2, 2022 Filing 147 Ex Parte MOTION to Strike an Incorrectly Filed Document #143 Memorandum in Opposition to Exxon's Motion to Quash Trial Subpoena on behalf of Tomas Paez by Billy D. Olivier (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proposed Pleading; Memorandum in Opposition to Exxon's Motion to Quash Trial Subpoena on behalf of Tomas Paez, #3 Exhibit A, Depo Excerpts of Erik Case (Exxon), #4 Exhibit B, E-Mail with opposing counsel, #5 Exhibit C, Exxon's Notice of Video Deposition of Holly Sharp)(Quackenbos, Andrew)
August 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 146 NOTICE AND ORDER: The #142 Motion for Expedited Consideration Regarding #139 Motion to Quash Trial Subpoena on Behalf of Tomas Paez is GRANTED considering the August 29, 2022 trial date. A hearing will be held via Zoom on Friday, August 5, 2022 at 1:30 p.m. before Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on the #139 Motion to Quash Trial Subpoena on Behalf of Tomas Paez. Participant instructions are attached. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 8/2/2022. (BLR)
August 2, 2022 Filing 145 Notice of Deficiency with Administrative Procedure III(A)(1) as to #143 Memorandum in Opposition to. Pursuant to Administrative Procedure III(A)(1), Each exhibit should be submitted individually in CM/ECF with an exhibit number and short description (e.g., Ex.1 Plaintiff Depo). REQUIRED CORRECTION: The filer is directed to refile the exhibits in the proper format using the event Exhibit located under Other Documents in the CM/ECF system and link the exhibits to the previously filed document. The main document for this event shall be an exhibit list of the exhibits being attached. (NLT)
August 2, 2022 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #139 MOTION to Quash Trial Subpoena on Behalf of Tomas Paez, #142 MOTION for Expedited Hearing on #139 MOTION to Quash Trial Subpoena on Behalf of Tomas Paez . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (NLT)
August 1, 2022 Filing 144 Proposed Pretrial Order by All Plaintiffs (For your free look at document, enter your Individual PACER login and pw to confirm your right to view). (Quackenbos, Andrew)
August 1, 2022 Filing 143 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to #139 MOTION to Quash Trial Subpoena on Behalf of Tomas Paez filed by Billy D. Olivier. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Quackenbos, Andrew) Modified on 8/5/2022 to substitute document per Order #150 (LLH).
August 1, 2022 Filing 142 MOTION for Expedited Hearing on #139 MOTION to Quash Trial Subpoena on Behalf of Tomas Paez by Tomas Paez (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Motion for Expedited Consideration, #2 Proposed Order)(Taplin, Cherrell)
August 1, 2022 Filing 141 Exhibit(s) to #139 MOTION to Quash Trial Subpoena on Behalf of Tomas Paez by Exxon Mobil Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1: Affidavit of Tomas Paez, Jr., #2 Exhibit 1-A: Email correspondence, #3 Exhibit 1-B: Trial subpoena to Tomas Paez, #4 Exhibit 2: Notice of video deposition and deposition transcript of Paez, #5 Exhibit 3: Email correspondence with opposing counsel)(Taplin, Cherrell)
August 1, 2022 Filing 140 Notice of Deficiency with Administrative Procedure III(A)(1) as to #139 Motion to Quash,. Pursuant to Administrative Procedure III(A)(1), Each exhibit should be submitted individually in CM/ECF with an exhibit number and short description (e.g., Ex.1 Plaintiff Depo). REQUIRED CORRECTION: The filer is directed to refile the exhibits in the proper format using the event Exhibit located under Other Documents in the CM/ECF system and link the exhibits to the previously filed document. The main document for this event shall be an exhibit list of the exhibits being attached. (JEG)
July 29, 2022 Filing 139 MOTION to Quash Trial Subpoena by Tomas Paez and Exxon Mobil Corporation (Attachments: #1 Attachment, #2 Memorandum in Support, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 1-A, #5 Exhibit 1-B, #6 Exhibit 2, #7 Exhibit 3)(Taplin, Cherrell) Modified on 8/1/2022 to edit the text (NLT).
July 29, 2022 Filing 138 RULING denying #100 Motion in Limine; denying without prejudice #102 Motion in Limine. Objections are reserved and deferred to the time of trial. #101 Motion in Limine is DEFERRED and will be set for hearing outside the presence of the jury. Granting in part and denying in part #103 Motion in Limine as follows: the motion to exclude cumulative evidence is DENIED without prejudice to re-urging at the time of trial; the motion to preclude Plaintiff from using the terms "open hold hazard" is DENIED; the motion to exclude Plaintiff's Exhibit 81 is GRANTED. Signed by Chief Judge Shelly D. Dick on 7/28/2022. (EDC)
July 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 137 ORDER granting #136 Motion to Withdraw Attorneys Charles B. Wilmore and Randy J. Marse as counsel of record for Exxon Mobil Corporation. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Cherrell S. Taplin is be designated as Lead Attorney for Exxon Mobil Corporation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 7/8/2022. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (BLR)
July 8, 2022 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #136 Ex Parte MOTION for Randy J. Marse, Charles B. Wilmore to Withdraw as Attorney and Designate Lead Attorney. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (EDC)
July 7, 2022 Filing 136 Ex Parte MOTION for Randy J. Marse, Charles B. Wilmore to Withdraw as Attorney and Designate Lead Attorney by Exxon Mobil Corporation (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(McNeal, Robert)
June 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 135 ORDER denying without prejudice #134 Exxon Mobil Corporation's Ex Parte Motion to Withdraw Certain Counsel and Designate Lead Attorney. The Motion is not signed by Randy J. Marse and Charles B. Wilmore, the attorneys sought to be withdrawn, nor it is clear from the motion whether they are still employed by the law firm for Liskow & Lewis. To the extent there is a problem obtaining their signatures, movan shall so indicate and state what efforts were undertaken to obtain signatures in any subsequent motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 6/29/2022. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (BLR)
June 28, 2022 Filing 134 Ex Parte MOTION for Randy J. Marse, Charles B. Wilmore to Withdraw as Attorney and Designate Lead Attorney by Exxon Mobil Corporation (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading; Order)(McNeal, Robert)
June 28, 2022 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #134 Ex Parte MOTION for Randy J. Marse, Charles B. Wilmore to Withdraw as Attorney and Designate Lead Attorney. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (ELW)
June 10, 2022 Filing 133 REPLY MEMORANDUM in Support of #100 MOTION in Limine to Exclude All Evidence of Subsequent Remedial Measures filed by Exxon Mobil Corporation. (LLH)
June 10, 2022 Filing 132 REPLY MEMORANDUM in Support of #102 MOTION in Limine to Exclude All Evidence of OSHA Regulations filed by Exxon Mobil Corporation. (LLH)
June 10, 2022 Filing 131 REPLY in Support of #101 MOTION in Limine to Exclude References to Prior Unrelated Incident filed by Exxon Mobil Corporation. (LLH)
June 10, 2022 Filing 130 REPLY MEMORANDUM in Support of #103 MOTION in Limine (Omnibus) filed by Exxon Mobil Corporation. (LLH) Modified on 6/10/2022 to replace document (LLH).
June 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 129 ORDER granting #124 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Reply Memorandum in Support of #103 Omnibus Motion in Limine. Signed by Chief Judge Shelly D. Dick on 6/10/2022. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (SWE)
June 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 128 ORDER granting #123 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Reply Memorandum in Support of #102 Motion in Limine to Exclude All Evidence of OSHA Regulations. Signed by Chief Judge Shelly D. Dick on 6/10/2022. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (SWE)
June 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 127 ORDER granting #122 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Reply Memorandum in Further Support of #101 Motion in Limine to Exclude References to Prior Unrelated Incident . Signed by Chief Judge Shelly D. Dick on 6/10/2022. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (SWE)
June 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 126 ORDER granting #121 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Reply Memorandum in Further Support of #100 Motion in Limine to Exclude All Evidence of Subsequent Remedial Measures . Signed by Chief Judge Shelly D. Dick on 6/10/2022. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (SWE)
June 9, 2022 Filing 125 RULING: For the reasons set here within, EMC's #48 Motion for Summary Judgment is DENIED. Plaintiff's #50 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Regarding MedicalCausation is also DENIED. Signed by Chief Judge Shelly D. Dick on 6/8/2022. (ELW)
May 2, 2022 Filing 124 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Reply Memorandum in Support of #103 Omnibus Motion in Limine by Exxon Mobil Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading; Order, #2 Proposed Pleading; Reply Memorandum in Support of Omnibus Motion in Limine)(Taplin, Cherrell) Modified on 5/2/2022 to create linkage (ELW).
May 2, 2022 Filing 123 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Reply Memorandum in Support of #102 Motion in Limine to Exclude All Evidence of OSHA Regulations by Exxon Mobil Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading; Order, #2 Proposed Pleading; Reply Memorandum in Support of Motion in Limine to Exclude All Evidence of OSHA Regulations)(Taplin, Cherrell) Modified on 5/2/2022 to create linkage (ELW).
May 2, 2022 Filing 122 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Reply Memorandum in Further Support of #101 Motion in Limine to Exclude References to Prior Unrelated Incident by Exxon Mobil Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading; Order, #2 Proposed Pleading; Reply Memorandum in Support of Motion in Limine to Exclude References to Prior Unrelated Incident)(Taplin, Cherrell) Modified on 5/2/2022 to create linkage (ELW).
May 2, 2022 Filing 121 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Reply Memorandum in Further Support of #100 Motion in Limine to Exclude All Evidence of Subsequent Remedial Measures by Exxon Mobil Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading; Order, #2 Proposed Pleading; Reply Memorandum in Support of Motion in Limine to Exclude All Evidence of Subsequent Remedial Measures, #3 Exhibit D)(Taplin, Cherrell) Modified on 5/2/2022 to create linkage (ELW).
May 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 120 RULING and ORDER : The #53 Motion to Compel, for Leave to Take Outstanding Fact Depositions, and to Extend Discovery for the Completion of Outstanding Discovery, filed by Plaintiff Billy D. Olivier, is DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 5/2/2022. (ELW)
April 25, 2022 Filing 119 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to #103 MOTION in Limine (Omnibus) filed by Billy D. Olivier. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Quackenbos, Andrew)
April 25, 2022 Filing 118 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to #101 MOTION in Limine to Exclude References to Prior Unrelated Incident filed by Billy D. Olivier. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Quackenbos, Andrew)
April 25, 2022 Filing 117 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to #102 MOTION in Limine to Exclude All Evidence of OSHA Regulations filed by Billy D. Olivier. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Quackenbos, Andrew)
April 25, 2022 Filing 116 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to #100 MOTION in Limine to Exclude All Evidence of Subsequent Remedial Measures filed by Billy D. Olivier. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Quackenbos, Andrew)
April 25, 2022 Filing 115 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to #106 MOTION in Limine No. 3 to Exclude Argument, Testimony, and Evidence filed by Exxon Mobil Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-1, #2 Exhibit A-2, #3 Exhibit A-3, #4 Exhibit A-4)(Taplin, Cherrell)
April 25, 2022 Filing 114 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to #105 MOTION in Limine No. 2 Regarding Contracts and Testimony on the Meaning and Effect of Contracts filed by Exxon Mobil Corporation. (Taplin, Cherrell)
April 25, 2022 Filing 113 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to #104 MOTION in Limine No. 1 Regarding Speculative Testimony and Hearsay about the Actions or Inactions of Federal Agencies filed by Exxon Mobil Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Taplin, Cherrell)
April 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 112 ORDER granting #109 Motion to Enroll Additional Attorney. Added attorney Mark Richard Deethardt for Exxon Mobil Corporation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 4/25/2022. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (BLR)
April 25, 2022 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #109 Ex Parte MOTION to Enroll Mark R. Deethardt as Additional Attorney . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (ELW)
April 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 111 ORDER granting #110 Joint Motion for Extension of Deadline to File Joint Jury Instructions, Voir Dire, and Verdict Forms. Trial Briefs are not necessary. Signed by Chief Judge Shelly D. Dick on 4/22/2022. (SWE)
April 21, 2022 Filing 110 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Joint Jury Instructions, Voir Dire, Verdict Forms, and Trial Briefs, and for Leave to File Amended Pre-Trial Order by Billy D. Olivier. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Quackenbos, Andrew)
April 21, 2022 Filing 109 Ex Parte MOTION to Enroll Mark R. Deethardt as Additional Attorney by Exxon Mobil Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading;)(Taplin, Cherrell)
April 19, 2022 Filing 108 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge Shelly D. Dick: Pretrial Conference held on 4/19/2022. Pretrial Conference set for 8/16/2022 at 10:00 AM in chambers. Jury Trial set for 8/29/2022 to 9/2/2022 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3. The Court encouraged the parties to schedule a settlement conference with the Magistrate Judge. (SWE)
April 19, 2022 Filing 107 Notice to Counsel: Pretrial Conference set for 4/19/2022 at 02:30 PM is converted to Zoom video conference before Chief Judge Shelly D. Dick. Participant instructions will be sent by email. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.)(SWE)
April 18, 2022 Filing 106 MOTION in Limine No. 3 to Exclude Argument, Testimony, and Evidence by Billy D. Olivier. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K, #13 Exhibit L, #14 Proposed Order)(Quackenbos, Andrew)
April 18, 2022 Filing 105 MOTION in Limine No. 2 Regarding Contracts and Testimony on the Meaning and Effect of Contracts by Billy D. Olivier. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)(Quackenbos, Andrew)
April 18, 2022 Filing 104 MOTION in Limine No. 1 Regarding Speculative Testimony and Hearsay about the Actions or Inactions of Federal Agencies by Billy D. Olivier. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D)(Quackenbos, Andrew)
April 18, 2022 Filing 103 MOTION in Limine (Omnibus) by Exxon Mobil Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K)(Morale, Trinity)
April 18, 2022 Filing 102 MOTION in Limine to Exclude All Evidence of OSHA Regulations by Exxon Mobil Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D)(Taplin, Cherrell)
April 18, 2022 Filing 101 MOTION in Limine to Exclude References to Prior Unrelated Incident by Exxon Mobil Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D)(Taplin, Cherrell)
April 18, 2022 Filing 100 MOTION in Limine to Exclude All Evidence of Subsequent Remedial Measures by Exxon Mobil Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C)(Taplin, Cherrell)
April 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER denying #48 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying #50 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. The Court hereby denies the Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Defendant (Rec. Doc. No. 48) and the Motion for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Plaintiff (Rec. Doc. No. 50) for written reasons to be assigned. Signed by Chief Judge Shelly D. Dick on 4/18/2022. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (Dick, Shelly)
April 12, 2022 Filing 98 RULING granting in part and denying in part #60 MOTION for Leave to Correct Exhibit Filed with Rec. Doc. 48, Strike Incorrect Statements, and Supplement Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Chief Judge Shelly D. Dick on 4/12/2022. (SWE)
April 8, 2022 Filing 97 Proposed Pretrial Order by all parties by Billy D. Olivier (For your free look at document, enter your Individual PACER login and pw to confirm your right to view). (Quackenbos, Andrew)
April 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ORDER granting #95 Joint MOTION to Continue Deadline for Filing Pre-Trial Order. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 4/8/2022. Signed by Chief Judge Shelly D. Dick on 4/5/2022. (SWE)
April 5, 2022 Filing 95 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Pre-Trial Order by Billy D. Olivier. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Quackenbos, Andrew)
April 1, 2022 Filing 94 RULING denying #49 Motion in Limine,with the exception that Plaintiff is advised that the word neglected in the second challenged conclusion should be substituted. Signed by Chief Judge Shelly D. Dick on 4/1/2022. (EDC)
March 28, 2022 Filing 93 AFFIDAVIT of Settlement Efforts by Exxon Mobil Corporation. (Taplin, Cherrell)
March 25, 2022 Filing 92 Minute Entry/Settlement Conference Report and Order for settlement conference held before Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 3/25/2022: the parties did not resolve the claim in this case after a period of negotiations. All deadlines contained in the #47 current Scheduling Order remain in effect, including the May 9, 2022 jury trial, unless otherwise ordered. (EWD) Modified on 3/28/2022 to edit date (LLH).
March 18, 2022 Filing 91 NOTICE of Compliance by Exxon Mobil Corporation to 90 Order on Motion for Leave,, (Taplin, Cherrell)
March 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER granting #54 MOTION for Leave to Leave to Allow Testimony by Contemporaneous Transmission. Exxon shall identify those witnesses made the subject of the Plaintiff's Motion whom it WILL call at the trial on or before March 18, 2022. The Plaintiff is Granted Leave to take the testimony of witnesses who are not identified by Exxon as "Will Call" by Contemporaneous Transmission. Signed by Chief Judge Shelly D. Dick on 3/3/2022. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (Dick, Shelly)
February 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 89 SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER: Settlement Conference set for 3/25/2022 at 01:30 PM by video before Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 2/24/2022. (Attachments: #1 Participant Instructions)(BLR)
January 25, 2022 Filing 88 SURREPLY MEMORANDUM in Opposition to #48 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Billy D. Olivier. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(LLH)
January 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER granting #70 Ex Parte MOTION for Leave to File Surreply to #48 Motion for Summary Judgment with Partial Consent and Partial Opposition filed by Billy D. Olivier. Signed by Chief Judge Shelly D. Dick on 1/25/2022. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (BKA)
December 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER GRANTING IN PART #72 SEALED Motion for Leave to File Exhibits Under Seal filed by Defendant Exxon Mobil Corporation to the extent it seeks leave to file documents alleged to be privileged under seal. The Clerk of Court is directed to file R. Doc. 72-1 and R. Doc. 72-2 into the record UNDER SEAL. The request for in camera review is DENIED. A revised privilege log has been provided to Plaintiff, but Plaintiff has not challenged via written motion the sufficiency of the revised log or the applicability of the privileges asserted. See Firefighters' Retirement System, et al. v. Citco Group Limited, et al., No. 13-373, 2018 WL 305604, at *1 (M.D. La. Jan. 5, 2018) (in camera review appropriate only if privilege log is deficient). Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 12/21/2021. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (BLR)
December 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER DENYING #69 Motion to Partially Withdraw Motion to Compel Discovery and #81 Second Motion to Withdraw Motion to Compel Discovery, filed by Plaintiff Billy Olivier. The Court will not permit a piecemeal withdrawal of the pending #53 Motion to Compel Discovery, and for Leave to Take Outstanding Discovery, however, the issues raised in the #53 Motion to Compel as to the deposition of Kim Munksgaard and the search of Exxon's OIMS manual/system are MOOT, in light of the parties' agreements as stated in the #69 and #81 Motions. If the search of the OIMS manual/system is not performed as agreed to by the parties, Plaintiff shall file a supplemental memo of no longer than 3 pages in support of the pending Motion to Compel notifying the Court that the issues raised as to the OIMS search is no longer moot and explaining the current status of the search of the OIMS manual/system. Any supplemental memorandum on this issue must be filed by no later than January 7, 2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 12/21/2021. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (BLR)
December 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER granting #60 MOTION for Leave to Correct. Signed by Chief Judge Shelly D. Dick on 12/20/2021. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (BKA)
December 20, 2021 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #81 Second MOTION to Partially Withdraw #53 MOTION to Compel Discovery. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (SWE)
December 17, 2021 Filing 83 REPLY Memorandum in Support of #53 MOTION to Compel Discovery, for Leave to Take Outstanding Fact Depositions, and to Extend Discovery for the Completion of Outstanding Discovery filed by Billy D. Olivier. (LLH)
December 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER granting #76 Consent MOTION for Leave to File Reply Memorandum in Support of Motion to Compel Discovery (Rec. Doc. 53). The clerk is directed to file R. Doc. 76-2 into the record. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 12/17/2021. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (BLR)
December 17, 2021 Filing 81 Second MOTION to Partially Withdraw #53 MOTION to Compel Discovery by Billy D. Olivier. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Quackenbos, Andrew) Modified on 12/20/2021 to edit text (SWE).
December 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER granting #74 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Reply in Support of R. Doc. No. 60 and Incorporated Memorandum in Support filed by Exxon Mobil Corporation. Signed by Chief Judge Shelly D. Dick on 12/17/2021. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (BKA)
December 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER granting #75 Ex Parte Motion to Strike 73 Reply Memorandum. Signed by Chief Judge Shelly D. Dick on 12/16/2021. (SWE)
December 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER granting #77 MOTION to Substitute R. Doc. No. 74. Signed by Chief Judge Shelly D. Dick on 12/16/2021. (EDC)
December 15, 2021 Filing 77 MOTION to Substitute R. Doc. No. 74 by Exxon Mobil Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading; Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Reply, #2 Proposed Order)(Taplin, Cherrell)
December 15, 2021 Filing 76 Consent MOTION for Leave to File Reply Memorandum in Support of Motion to Compel Discovery (Rec. Doc. 53) by Billy D. Olivier. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proposed Pleading; Plaintiff's Reply Memorandum in Support of Motion to Compel Discovery (Rec. Doc. 53))(Quackenbos, Andrew) Modified on 12/15/2021 to edit text (SWE).
December 15, 2021 Filing 75 Ex Parte MOTION to Strike 73 Reply Memorandum in Support of Motion to Compel Discovery (Rec. Doc. 53) by Billy D. Olivier. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Quackenbos, Andrew) Modified on 12/15/2021 to edit text (SWE).
December 15, 2021 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #76 Consent MOTION for Leave to File Reply Memorandum in Support of Motion to Compel Discovery (Rec. Doc. 53). This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (SWE)
December 15, 2021 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #75 Ex Parte MOTION to Strike 73 Reply Memorandum in Support of Motion to Compel Discovery (Rec. Doc. 53). This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (SWE)
December 14, 2021 Filing 74 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Reply in Support of R. Doc. No. 60 and Incorporated Memorandum in Support by Exxon Mobil Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proposed Pleading; Reply Memorandum, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11)(Taplin, Cherrell) Modified on 12/15/2021 to edit text(SWE). (Main Document 74 replaced on 12/16/2021) (EDC). Modified on 12/16/2021 in accordance with record document 78. (EDC).
December 14, 2021 Filing 73 STRICKEN FROM THE RECORD REPLY in Support of #53 MOTION to Compel Discovery, for Leave to Take Outstanding Fact Depositions, and to Extend Discovery for the Completion of Outstanding Discovery filed by Billy D. Olivier. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Quackenbos, Andrew) Modified on 12/16/2021 to remove document in accordance with RD 79 (SWE).
December 10, 2021 Filing 72 SEALED MOTION for Leave to File Exhibits Under Seal by Exxon Mobil Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Proposed Order)(Taplin, Cherrell)
December 10, 2021 Filing 71 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to #53 MOTION to Compel Discovery, for Leave to Take Outstanding Fact Depositions, and to Extend Discovery for the Completion of Outstanding Discovery filed by Exxon Mobil Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Taplin, Cherrell) ( #6 Exhibit A, #7 Exhibit B) . Modified on 12/22/2021to add exhibits as per Order #86 (LLH).
December 10, 2021 Filing 70 Ex Parte MOTION for Leave to File Surreply to #48 Motion for Summary Judgment with Partial Consent and Partial Opposition by Billy D. Olivier. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proposed Pleading;, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C)(Quackenbos, Andrew) Modified on 12/10/2021 to edit text and add docket entry relationship (SWE).
December 10, 2021 Filing 69 MOTION to Partially Withdraw #53 MOTION to Compel Discovery by Billy D. Olivier. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Quackenbos, Andrew) Modified on 12/10/2021 to edit text (SWE).
December 10, 2021 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #69 MOTION to Partially Withdraw #53 MOTION to Compel Discovery. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (SWE)
December 3, 2021 Filing 68 REPLY in Support of #50 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Regarding Medical Causation filed by Billy D. Olivier. (Attachments: #1 Plaintiff's Response to Exxon Mobil Corporation's Statement of Additional Material Facts, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C)(Quackenbos, Andrew)
December 3, 2021 Filing 67 REPLY in Support of #48 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Exxon Mobil Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Reply Statement of Material Facts, #2 Exhibit A)(Taplin, Cherrell)
December 3, 2021 Filing 66 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to #54 MOTION for Leave to Allow Testimony by Contemporaneous Transmission or, in the Alternative, for Extension/Leave to Take Trial Depositions of Certain Witnesses filed by Exxon Mobil Corporation. (Taplin, Cherrell)
November 30, 2021 Filing 64 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to #60 MOTION for Leave to Correct, Strike, and Supplement Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Billy D. Olivier. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Quackenbos, Andrew)
November 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER Vacating 62 Order on Motion for Leave. It has come to the Court's attention that the Motion #60 will be opposed, therefore it is VACATED and the Motion will be reopened. Signed by Chief Judge Shelly D. Dick on 11/30/2021. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.)(BKA)
November 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER granting #60 MOTION for Leave to Correct, Strike, and Supplement. Signed by Chief Judge Shelly D. Dick on 11/30/2021. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (BKA)
November 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER granting #59 Unopposed MOTION to Substitute Exhibits filed by Exxon Mobil Corporation. Signed by Chief Judge Shelly D. Dick on 11/30/2021. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (BKA)
November 29, 2021 Filing 65 Minute Entry/Telephone Conference Report and Order for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes: Telephone Conference held on 11/29/2021 to discuss #53 Motion to Compel Discovery. The parties shall engage in discussions to attempt to amicably resolve the issues raised in the Motion, as discussed during the conference and pursuant to the guidance provided. By no later than 12/10/2021, Plaintiff shall file a motion to withdraw the Motion if the parties resolve the issues raised. Alternatively, Exxon may file any opposition memorandum by 12/10/2021 and the Motion will be ruled upon in due course. By no later than Friday, 12/3/2021, Defendant Exxon Mobil Corporation shall produce a revised privilege log to Plaintiff, which contains the required log information so that Plaintiff can determine if a valid privilege exists. (EDC)
November 29, 2021 Filing 60 MOTION for Leave to Correct, Strike, and Supplement by Exxon Mobil Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit H)(Taplin, Cherrell) Modified on 4/12/2022 to un-terminate motion(SWE).
November 22, 2021 Filing 59 Unopposed MOTION to Substitute Exhibits by Exxon Mobil Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit E, #5 Exhibit F, #6 Exhibit H, #7 Exhibit I)(Taplin, Cherrell)
November 19, 2021 Filing 58 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to #49 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Plaintiff's Liability Experts, Gregg S. Perkin and Garret S. Perkin filed by Billy D. Olivier. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Quackenbos, Andrew)
November 19, 2021 Filing 57 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to #48 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Billy D. Olivier. (Attachments: #1 Opposing Statement of Material Facts, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K, #13 Exhibit L, #14 Exhibit M, #15 Exhibit N, #16 Exhibit O, #17 Exhibit P, #18 Exhibit Q, #19 Exhibit R, #20 Exhibit S, #21 Exhibit T, #22 Exhibit U)(Quackenbos, Andrew)
November 19, 2021 Filing 56 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to #50 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Regarding Medical Causation filed by Exxon Mobil Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Statement of Undisputed Facts Response to Plaintiff's Statement of Material Facts, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I)(Taplin, Cherrell) Modified on 12/1/2021 to replace documents as per Order #61 (LLH).
November 16, 2021 Filing 55 NOTICE OF TELEPHONE CONFERENCE: IT IS ORDERED that the #53 Motion to Compel Discovery, for Leave to Take Outstanding Fact Depositions, and to Extend Discovery for the Completion of Outstanding Discovery filed by Plaintiff Billy D. Olivier is set for a telephone conference on November 29, 2021 at 11:00 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes. The purpose of the conference is to discuss the pending Motion prior to the deadline to file an opposition memorandum, therefore, it is not necessary to provide an opposition memorandum before the telephone conference. If the conference does not resolve the issues raised in the motion, an opposition memorandum may still be filed within the deadlines imposed by the Local Civil Rules. Counsel participating in the Conference shall call 877-336-1839 using access code 9565780 five minutes prior to conference. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.)(BLR)
November 15, 2021 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #53 MOTION to Compel Discovery, for Leave to Take Outstanding Fact Depositions, and to Extend Discovery for the Completion of Outstanding Discovery. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (ELW)
November 12, 2021 Filing 54 MOTION for Leave to Allow Testimony by Contemporaneous Transmission or, in the Alternative, for Extension/Leave to Take Trial Depositions of Certain Witnesses by Billy D. Olivier. (Attachments: #1 Rule 37 Certificate of Compliance, #2 Memorandum in Support)(Quackenbos, Andrew)
November 12, 2021 Filing 53 MOTION to Compel Discovery, for Leave to Take Outstanding Fact Depositions, and to Extend Discovery for the Completion of Outstanding Discovery by Billy D. Olivier. (Attachments: #1 Rule 37 Certificate of Compliance, #2 Memorandum in Support, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit F, #9 Exhibit G, #10 Exhibit H, #11 Exhibit I, #12 Exhibit J, #13 Exhibit K, #14 Exhibit L)(Quackenbos, Andrew)
November 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER granting #51 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to #49 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Plaintiff's Liability Experts, Gregg S. Perkin and Garret S. Perkin, #50 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Regarding Medical Causation and #48 MOTION for Summary Judgment until 11/19/2021. Signed by Chief Judge Shelly D. Dick on 11/12/2021. (EDC)
November 8, 2021 Filing 51 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to #50 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Regarding Medical Causation, #49 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Plaintiff's Liability Experts, Gregg S. Perkin and Garret S. Perkin, #48 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Billy D. Olivier. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Quackenbos, Andrew)
October 21, 2021 Filing 50 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Regarding Medical Causation by Billy D. Olivier. (Attachments: #1 Statement of Material Facts, #2 Memorandum in Support, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit F, #9 Exhibit G, #10 Exhibit H)(Quackenbos, Andrew)
October 21, 2021 Filing 49 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Plaintiff's Liability Experts, Gregg S. Perkin and Garret S. Perkin by Exxon Mobil Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit A)(Taplin, Cherrell)
October 21, 2021 Filing 48 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Exxon Mobil Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Statement of Undisputed Facts, #3 Exhibit Exhibit A (1 of 3), #4 Exhibit Exhibit A (2 of 3), #5 Exhibit Exhibit A (3 of 3), #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit)(Taplin, Cherrell) (AttachmentS 4, 5 & 7 replaced on 10/25/2021) (EDC). Modified on 10/25/2021 to rotate pages. (EDC). ( #12 Exhibit H) (LLH). Modified on 12/20/2021 to Correct Exhibit #6 and Add Exhibit H as per Order #84 (LLH).
September 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER granting #46 Joint Motion to Modify Pretrial Deadlines for good cause: Fact and Expert Discovery due by 11/11/2021; Plaintiff`s Expert Reports (liability) due by 10/13/2021; Defendant`s Expert Reports (liability) due by 10/29/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 09/02/2021. (EWD)
August 31, 2021 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #46 Joint MOTION to modify Pretrial Deadlines. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (ELW)
August 27, 2021 Filing 46 Joint MOTION to modify Pretrial Deadlines by Billy D. Olivier. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Quackenbos, Andrew) Modified on 8/31/2021 to edit text (ELW).
June 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER granting #44 Motion to Enroll Additional Attorney. Added attorney Trinity A. Morale for Exxon Mobil Corporation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 6/3/2021. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (BLR)
June 2, 2021 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #44 Ex Parte MOTION to Enroll Trinity A. Morale as Additional Attorney . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (NLT)
June 1, 2021 Filing 44 Ex Parte MOTION to Enroll Trinity A. Morale as Additional Attorney by Exxon Mobil Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading; proposed Order)(Taplin, Cherrell)
May 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER granting #42 Motion to Amend Scheduling Order. Discovery due by 8/27/2021. Plaintiff`s Expert Witness List due by 8/9/2021. Defendant`s Expert Witness List due by 9/6/2021. Plaintiff`s Expert Reports due by 8/27/2021. Defendant`s Expert Reports due by 9/24/2021. Discovery from Experts due by 10/8/2021.Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 5/12/2021. (ELW)
May 11, 2021 Filing 42 Joint MOTION to Amend Scheduling Order to Modify Pre-Trial Deadlines by Billy D. Olivier. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Quackenbos, Andrew)
May 11, 2021 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #42 Joint MOTION to Amend Scheduling Order to Modify Pre-Trial Deadlines. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (EDC)
May 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER denying #40 Joint Motion to Modify Pretrial Deadlines. Although good cause appears to exist for the requested extensions as Plaintiff continues to treat, the proposed deadline of December 17, 2021 to file dispositive/Daubert motions does not comply with the district judge's scheduling requirements for an April 19, 2022 pretrial conference. The denial is without prejudice to reurging a motion that either: 1) does not seek an extension of the deadline to file dispositive/Daubert motions beyond October 21, 2021; or 2) requests a continuance of the May 9, 2022 trial date directed to the district judge. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 05/10/2021. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (EWD) Modified to edit text on 5/10/2021 (BLR).
May 7, 2021 Filing 40 Joint MOTION to Modify Pre-Trial Deadlines by Billy D. Olivier. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Quackenbos, Andrew) Modified on 5/7/2021 to edit text. (EDC).
May 7, 2021 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #40 Joint MOTION to Modify Pre-Trial Deadlines. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (EDC)
November 10, 2020 Filing 39 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge Shelly D. Dick: Status Conference held on 11/10/2020. (BKA)
October 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER granting #37 Motion to Enroll Additional Attorney. Added attorney Thomas R. Edwards for Billy D. Olivier.. Signed by Chief Judge Shelly D. Dick on 10/21/2020. (SWE)
October 19, 2020 Filing 37 Consent MOTION to Enroll Thomas R. Edwards as Additional Attorney of Record by Billy D. Olivier. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Quackenbos, Andrew)
October 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER granting #34 Joint MOTION to Substitute Corrected Status Report. The clerk is directed to replace R. Doc. 32 with 34-1. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 10/5/2020. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (BLR)
October 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 35 SCHEDULING ORDER: In accordance with FRCP 16(b), the following discovery deadlines are established. Amended Pleadings due by 4/12/2021. Discovery due by 6/12/2021. Plaintiff`s Expert Witness List due by 6/12/2021. Defendant`s Expert Witness List due by 7/12/2021. Plaintiff`s Expert Reports due by 7/24/2021. Defendant`s Expert Reports due by 8/23/2021. Discovery from Experts due by 9/21/2021. Proposed Findings of Facts due by 4/18/2022. Dispositive and Daubert Motions shall be filed by 10/21/2021. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 4/5/2022. Pretrial Conference set for 4/19/2022 at 02:30 PM in chambers before Chief Judge Shelly D. Dick. Motions In Limine shall be filed by 4/18/2022. Affidavit of Settlement Efforts due by 3/28/2022. Joint jury instructions, voir dire, verdict forms, and trial briefs due by 5/2/2022. Five day Jury Trial set for 5/9/2022 - 5/13/2022 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3 before Chief Judge Shelly D. Dick. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 10/2/2020. (EDC) (Main Document 35 replaced on 10/5/2020) (EDC). Modified on 10/5/2020 for incorrect date. (EDC).
October 2, 2020 Filing 34 Joint MOTION to Substitute Corrected Status Report by Billy D. Olivier. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading; Corrected Status Report, #2 Proposed Order)(Quackenbos, Andrew)
October 2, 2020 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #34 Joint MOTION to Substitute Corrected Status Report . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (SWE)
October 1, 2020 Filing 33 R. Doc. 33 no longer exists. Docketed in error. Modified on 10/2/2020 (BLR).
September 25, 2020 Filing 32 STATUS REPORT by Exxon Mobil Corporation and by Billy D. Olivier. (Quackenbos, Andrew) (Main Document 32 replaced on 10/5/2020) (EDC). Modified on 10/5/2020 in accordance with record document 36. (EDC).
September 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER granting #30 Motion to Reopen Case. The parties shall confer and submit a new status report within fourteen days from the date of this Order. A telephone scheduling conference is scheduled for 11/10/2020 at 2:30 p.m. Signed by Chief Judge Shelly D. Dick on 9/11/2020. (EDC)
September 11, 2020 *** Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry) Status Report due by 9/25/2020. Telephone Conference before the District Judge set for 11/10/2020 at 02:30 PM before Chief Judge Shelly D. Dick. (EDC)
August 17, 2020 Filing 30 Joint MOTION to Reopen Case by Billy D. Olivier. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Quackenbos, Andrew)
June 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER: The request (R. Doc. 28) for permission to file another Joint Status Report is sixty (60) days to advise the Court whether the case should be reopened or remain stayed and closed is GRANTED. The parties shall submit a joint Status Report by no later than August 16, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 6/17/2020. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.)(BLR)
April 8, 2020 Filing 28 Joint STATUS REPORT by Billy D. Olivier. (Quackenbos, Andrew)
July 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER STAYING CASE: In light of the representations of counsel during the July 12, 2019 telephone conference, all proceedings and deadlines in this matter are STAYED. The Clerk shall ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSE this matter until ordered by the court to reopen these proceedings. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 7/15/2019. (EDC) (Main Document 27 replaced on 7/16/2019) (EDC). Modified on 7/16/2019 to add routing. (EDC).
July 12, 2019 Filing 26 TELEPHONE CONFERENCE REPORT AND ORDER for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes: Telephone Conference held on 7/12/2019. The parties discussed the current case management schedule in light of the plaintiff's ongoing medical treatment. In light of the representations of counsel during the telephone conference, the Clerk of Court is directed to STAY and ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSE this case. The parties shall submit a joint Status Report by no later than 4/10/2020, advising as to whether the case should be reopened or whether the stay and administrative closure should remain in effect. If it should remain in effiect, then they shall also advise the court as to how long. (EDC)
July 10, 2019 Filing 25 NOTICE of TELEPHONE CONFERENCE: In light of correspondence to the court. A Telephone Conference is set for 7/12/2019 at 11:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes. Counsel participating in the Conference shall call 877-336-1839 using access code 9565780 five minutes prior to conference. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.)(BLR)
July 10, 2019 Filing 24 Letter dated 7/8/2019 from Andrew J. Quackenbos to Judge Wilder-Doomes Re: request for status conference. (BLR)
May 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting in part #20 Joint Motion to Modify Scheduling Order. Discovery due by 8/30/2019. Plaintiff`s Expert Witness List due by 8/30/2019. Defendant`s Expert Witness List due by 10/5/2019. Plaintiff`s Expert Reports due by 10/5/2019. Defendant`s Expert Reports due by 12/13/2019. Discovery from Experts due by 1/25/2020. Motions shall be filed by 3/8/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 5/28/2019. (EDC)
May 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting #21 MOTION to Substitute Rec. Doc. 20. The clerk is directed to replace R. Doc. 20 with 21-1. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 5/23/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (BLR)
May 22, 2019 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #21 MOTION to Substitute Rec. Doc. 20 Joint Motion to Modify Scheduling Order. This motion is now pending before the USDJ. (LT)
May 22, 2019 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #20 Joint MOTION for Extension of Discovery Deadlines to Modify Scheduling OrderJoint MOTION to Amend #10 Scheduling Order,, . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (ELW)
May 22, 2019 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #21 MOTION to Substitute Rec. Doc. 20 Joint Motion to Modify Scheduling Order. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (LT)
May 21, 2019 Filing 21 MOTION to Substitute Rec. Doc. 20 by Exxon Mobil Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading; Corrected document, #2 Proposed Pleading; Order)(Taplin, Cherrell) Modified on 5/21/2019 (LT).
May 21, 2019 Filing 20 Joint MOTION for Extension of Discovery Deadlines to Modify Scheduling Order, Joint MOTION to Amend #10 Scheduling Order,, by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading; Proposed Amended Scheduling Order, #2 Proposed Pleading; Proposed Order to Amend Scheduling Order)(Taplin, Cherrell) (Main Document 20 replaced on 5/28/2019 in accordance with RD 22) (SWE).
January 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #18 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Cherrell Simms Taplin for Exxon Mobil Corporation replacing Dana M. Douglas. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 1/16/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (BLR)
January 15, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION to Substitute Cherrell Simms Taplin in place of Dana M. Douglas as Attorney by Exxon Mobil Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading; proposed Order)(Taplin, Cherrell)
January 15, 2019 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #18 MOTION to Substitute Cherrell Simms Taplin in place of Dana M. Douglas as Attorney . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (NLT)
January 14, 2019 Filing 17 Notice Setting Trial and Related Deadlines: Jury Trial set for 9/14/2020 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3 before Chief Judge Shelly D. Dick. Pretrial Conference set for 9/1/2020 at 02:30 PM in chambers before Chief Judge Shelly D. Dick. Affidavit of Settlement Efforts due by 8/3/2020. All other Trial deadlines are set as stated in the attached Notice. Signed by Chief Judge Shelly D. Dick on 1/14/2019. (BKA)
August 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #13 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Randy Marse for Exxon Mobil Corporation replacing Phillip R. Dore. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 8/27/2018. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (BLR)
August 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #14 Motion to Substitute Corrected Pleading. The clerk's office is directed to replace R. Doc. 13 with 14-1. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 8/27/2017. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (BLR)
August 24, 2018 Filing 14 MOTION to Substitute Doc.13 by Exxon Mobil Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Corrected Motion to Substitute Counsel of Record, #2 Proposed Pleading; Proposed Order)(Douglas, Dana)
August 24, 2018 Filing 13 MOTION to Substitute Randy J. Marse in place of Philip R. Dore as Attorney by Exxon Mobil Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading; Proposed Order)(Douglas, Dana) Modified on 8/28/2018 to replace main document per R.Doc. 15(SWE).
August 24, 2018 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #13 MOTION to Substitute Randy J. Marse in place of Philip R. Dore as Attorney . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (SWE)
August 24, 2018 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #14 MOTION to Substitute Doc.13 . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (LLH)
August 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER: Settlement Conference set for 11/5/2019 at 01:30 PM in chambers. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 11/5/2019. (SWE)
August 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SCHEDULING ORDER: In accordance with FRCP 16(b), the following discovery deadlines are established. Amended Pleadings due by 12/3/2018. F.R.C.P. 26(a)(1) disclosures due by 9/7/2018. Discovery due by 5/31/2019. Plaintiff`s Expert Witness List due by 5/31/2019. Defendant`s Expert Witness List due by 8/9/2019. Plaintiff`s Expert Reports due by 7/5/2019. Defendant`s Expert Reports due by 10/11/2019. Discovery from Experts due by 11/29/2019. Motions shall be filed by 1/10/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 8/20/2018. (SWE)
August 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SCHEDULING ORDER: In accordance with FRCP 16(b), the following discovery deadlines are established. Amended Pleadings due by 12/3/2018. F.R.C.P. 26(a)(1) disclosures due by 9/7/2018. Discovery due by 5/31/2019. Plaintiff`s Expert Witness List due by 5/31/2019. Defendant`s Expert Witness List due by 8/9/2019. Plaintiff`s Expert Reports due by 7/5/2019. Defendant`s Expert Reports due by 10/11/2019. Discovery from Experts due by 11/29/2019. Motions shall be filed by 1/10/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 8/20/2018. (EDC)
August 9, 2018 Filing 9 Notice to Counsel: In light of the #8 Joint Status Report filed, the Show Cause Hearing set for 8/14/2018 is CANCELED. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (BLR)
August 7, 2018 Filing 8 Joint STATUS REPORT by Billy D. Olivier. (Quackenbos, Andrew)
July 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: Plaintiff shall show cause for failure to comply withe the Court's #3 Scheduling Conference Order. In lieu of appearaing a Joint Status Report shall be filed by 8/7/2018. Show Cause Hearing set for 8/14/2018 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 5 before Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes. The Scheduling Conference set for 8/9/2018 is CANCELED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 7/31/2018. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.)(BLR)
June 27, 2018 Case Reassigned to Judge Shelly D. Dick. Chief Judge Brian A. Jackson no longer assigned to the case. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (LLH)
June 26, 2018 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Exxon Mobil Corporation. (Douglas, Dana)
June 26, 2018 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Exxon Mobil Corporation.(Douglas, Dana)
June 11, 2018 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Billy D. Olivier. Exxon Mobil Corporation served on 6/4/2018, answer due 6/25/2018. (Quackenbos, Andrew)
June 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 8/9/2018 at 11:00 AM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes. Status Report due by 7/26/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 6/8/2018. (LLH)
May 21, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Exxon Mobil Corporation. (NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve both the summons and all attachments in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4.) (EDC)
May 21, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT of Billy D. Olivier against Exxon Mobil Corporation ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053N-1770263.), filed by Billy D. Olivier. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Quackenbos, Andrew)
May 21, 2018 Case Reassigned to Chief Judge Brian A. Jackson. Judge John W. deGravelles no longer assigned to the case. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (EDC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Olivier v. Exxon Mobil Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Billy D. Olivier
Represented By: James Parkerson Roy
Represented By: John Parkerson Roy
Represented By: Andrew J. Quackenbos
Represented By: Thomas R. Edwards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Exxon Mobil Corporation
Represented By: Cherrell Simms Taplin
Represented By: Dana M. Douglas
Represented By: Charles Bradford Wilmore
Represented By: Mark Richard Deethardt
Represented By: Philip Dore
Represented By: Randy Marse
Represented By: Robert B. McNeal
Represented By: Trinity A. Morale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Tomas Paez
Represented By: Cherrell Simms Taplin
Represented By: Mark Richard Deethardt
Represented By: Robert B. McNeal
Represented By: Trinity A. Morale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?