Young v. Eye Laser Surgery Center: Dr. Mark Meadows, M.D.
Plaintiff: Latasha Young
Defendant: Eye Laser Surgery Center: Dr. Mark Meadows, M.D.
Case Number: 3:2018cv00696
Filed: July 17, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Office: Baton Rouge Office
Presiding Judge: John W deGravelles
Referring Judge: Erin Wilder-Doomes
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:1981
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 12, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #6 Motion to Reset Status Conference. Status Report due by 10/18/2018. Scheduling Conference set for 11/1/2018 at 04:00 PM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 9/12/2018. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (BLR)
September 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleadings. Eye Laser Surgery Center: Dr. Mark Meadows, M.D. answer due 10/12/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 9/12/2018. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (BLR)
September 11, 2018 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #7 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to #1 Complaint . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (SGO)
September 11, 2018 Filing 7 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to #1 Complaint by Eye Laser Surgery Center: Dr. Mark Meadows, M.D.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading; Order)(Huffstetler, Scott) Modified on 9/11/2018 to edit text (SGO).
September 10, 2018 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #6 MOTION to Reset Status Conference. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (SGO)
September 10, 2018 Filing 6 MOTION to Reset Status Conference by Latasha Young. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading; Order)(Blackman, Natalie) Modified on 9/10/2018 to edit text (SGO).
July 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 10/4/2018 at 02:30 PM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes. Status Report due by 9/20/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 7/31/2018. (EDC) Main Document 5 replaced on 8/8/2018 to correct attachment A. (BLR).
July 19, 2018 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Eye Laser Surgery Center: Dr. Mark Meadows, M.D.. (NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve both the summons and all attachments in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4.) (SGO)
July 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #2 Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis. The Clerk shall file said complaint without prepayment of costs or security thereof and the Clerk is directed to issue process to the defendant. The plaintiff is responsible for service of summons and complaint on the defendant. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 7/19/2018. (SGO)
July 18, 2018 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #2 MOTION to Proceed in forma pauperis . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (SGO)
July 17, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION to Proceed in forma pauperis by Latasha Young. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Proposed Order)(Blackman, Natalie)
July 17, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Eye Laser Surgery Center: Dr. Mark Meadows, M.D. filed by Latasha Young. (Attachments: #1 Attachment summons, #2 Affidavit Civil Cover sheet)(Blackman, Natalie) Modified on 7/17/2018 to flatten documents and edit text (SGO).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Young v. Eye Laser Surgery Center: Dr. Mark Meadows, M.D.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Latasha Young
Represented By: Natalie Shalane Blackman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eye Laser Surgery Center: Dr. Mark Meadows, M.D.
Represented By: Scott D. Huffstetler
Represented By: Theresa R. Hagen
Represented By: Chelsea Gomez Caswell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?