Dukes v. ARC of East Ascension
Plaintiff: Norma Dukes
Defendant: Arc of East ascension
Case Number: 3:2018cv00697
Filed: July 17, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Office: Baton Rouge Office
Presiding Judge: Richard L Bourgeois
Referring Judge: Shelly D Dick
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 11/8/2018 at 09:30 AM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois Jr. Status Report due by 10/25/2018.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 8/22/2018. (JSL)
August 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 MOTION to Substitute Complaint filed by Norma Dukes. Plaintiff's Complaint (R. Doc. 1) shall be substituted with Plaintiff's corrected Complaint (R. Doc. 9-1). Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 8/22/2018. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (JSL)
August 22, 2018 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #9 MOTION to Substitute Plaintiff's Original Complaint due to deficiency. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (SGO)
August 21, 2018 Filing 9 MOTION to Substitute Complaint by Norma Dukes. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Corrected Complaint, #2 Proposed Pleading; Proposed Order)(Blackman, Natalie) Modified on 8/22/2018 to edit text (SGO).
August 21, 2018 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to ARC of East Ascension. (NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve both the summons and all attachments in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4.) (SGO)
August 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #2 Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis. The Clerk shall file said complaint without prepayment of costs or security thereof and the Clerk is directed to issue process to the defendant(s). The plaintiff(s) is responsible for service of summons and complaint on the defendant(s). Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 8/21/2018. (SGO)
August 21, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines (Court Use Only) (SGO)
August 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER denying #3 Motion to Substitute In Forma Pauperis Form and Complaint, #4 Motion to Strike Plaintiffs Motion to Substitute In Forma Pauperia Form and Complaint, and #5 Motion to Substitute In Forma Pauperis Form and Complaint. Plaintiff has seven (7) days from the filing of this Order to file a Motion to Substitute Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 8/21/2018. (SGO)
July 24, 2018 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #5 MOTION to Substitute Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis and Complaint due to deficiency. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (SGO)
July 24, 2018 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #4 MOTION to Strike #3 MOTION to Substitute Complaint and Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis due to deficiency . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (SGO)
July 24, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION to Substitute Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis and Complaint due to deficiency by Norma Dukes. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading; Proposed Order, #2 Attachment corrected Middle District Pauper Form, #3 Attachment Complaint on letter size paper)(Blackman, Natalie) Modified on 7/24/2018 to flatten attachment 2 (SGO).
July 24, 2018 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #3 MOTION to Substitute Complaint and Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis due to deficiency. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (SGO)
July 24, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION to Strike #3 MOTION to Substitute Complaint and Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis due to deficiency by Norma Dukes. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading; proposed order)(Blackman, Natalie)
July 24, 2018 Filing 3 MOTION to Substitute Complaint and Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis due to deficiency by Norma Dukes. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Proposed Order)(Blackman, Natalie)
July 18, 2018 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #2 MOTION to Proceed in forma pauperis . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (SGO)
July 17, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION to Proceed in forma pauperis by Norma Dukes. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading; proposed order)(Blackman, Natalie)
July 17, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Arc of East ascension, filed by Norma Dukes. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Summons, #2 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet)(Blackman, Natalie) Modified on 7/18/2018 to flatten document (SGO). Modified on 8/23/2018 to substitute complaint as per RD 10 (SGO).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dukes v. ARC of East Ascension
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Norma Dukes
Represented By: Natalie Shalane Blackman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arc of East ascension
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?