Ellison v. Kleinpeter Dairy Farm, LLC

Plaintiff: Tyrie I Ellison
Defendant: Kleinpeter Dairy Farm, LLC
Case Number: 3:2018cv00699
Filed: July 17, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Office: Baton Rouge Office
0 Judge: Richard L Bourgeois
1 Judge: Brian A Jackson
2 Judge: Erin Wilder-Doomes
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Accommodations
Cause of Action: 42:12182
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 31, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 10/4/2018 at 03:00 PM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes. Status Report due by 9/20/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 7/31/2018. (LLH) Main Document 6 replaced on 8/8/2018 to correct attachment A (BLR).
July 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #2 Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis. The Clerk shall file said complaint without prepayment of costs or security thereof and the Clerk is directed to issue process to the defendant(s). The plaintiff(s) is responsible for service of summons and complaint on the defendant(s). Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 7/30/2018. (SWE)
July 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. recused. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes for all further proceedings. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 7/24/2018. (LLH)
July 18, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Civil cover sheet by Tyrie I Ellison re #1 Complaint (Wilson, J.)
July 18, 2018 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #2 MOTION to Proceed in forma pauperis. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (LLH)
July 18, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION to Proceed in forma pauperis by Tyrie I Ellison. (Attachments: #1 Order)(LLH)
July 17, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Kleinpeter Dairy Farm, LLC, filed by Tyrie I Ellison. Modified on 7/18/2018 to remove documents (LLH).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ellison v. Kleinpeter Dairy Farm, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tyrie I Ellison
Represented By: J. Courtney Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kleinpeter Dairy Farm, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?