Chisholm v. The Guardian Life Insurance Company of America
Plaintiff: Wendy Chisholm
Defendant: The Guardian Life Insurance Company of America
Case Number: 3:2018cv00728
Filed: July 31, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Office: Baton Rouge Office
Presiding Judge: Richard L Bourgeois
Referring Judge: Brian A Jackson
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 28, 2018 Filing 11 STATUS REPORT by The Guardian Life Insurance Company of America. (Malish, Amy)
September 4, 2018 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by The Guardian Life Insurance Company of America. (Malish, Amy)
September 4, 2018 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint and, COUNTERCLAIM against Wendy Chisholm by The Guardian Life Insurance Company of America.(Malish, Amy)
August 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 10/11/2018 at 09:45 AM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois Jr. Status Report due by 9/27/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 8/13/2018. (JSL)
August 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Madison Tate Donaldson to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Madison Tate Donaldson is hereby enrolled pro hac vice as co-counsel for Plaintiff in this matter. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 8/13/2018. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (JSL)
August 13, 2018 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #6 MOTION for Madison Donaldson to Appear Pro Hac Vice . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (SWE)
August 10, 2018 Filing 6 MOTION for Madison Donaldson to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Wendy Chisholm. (Attachments: #1 Oath, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order)(McNamara, J.)
August 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER denying #2 Motion for Madison Tate Donaldson to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Certificate of Good Standing [2-1] does not pertain to Madison Donaldson and is therefore insufficient. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 8/10/2018. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (Bourgeois, Richard)
August 3, 2018 Filing 4 Exhibit to #2 MOTION for Madison Tate Donaldson to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Wendy Chisholm. (McNamara, J.) Modified on 8/3/2018 to edit text (LLH).
August 1, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to The Guardian Life Insurance Company of America. (NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve both the summons and all attachments in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4.) (KAH)
August 1, 2018 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #2 MOTION for Madison Tate Donaldson to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $100.00, Receipt Number ALAMDC-1807369). This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (KAH)
July 31, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION for Madison Tate Donaldson to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $100.00, Receipt Number ALAMDC-1807369) by Wendy Chisholm. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Attachment Proposed Order)(McNamara, J.)
July 31, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against The Guardian Life Insurance Company of America ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAMDC-1807352.), filed by Wendy Chisholm. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Attachment Summons)(McNamara, J.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chisholm v. The Guardian Life Insurance Company of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Guardian Life Insurance Company of America
Represented By: Maura Zivalich Pelleteri
Represented By: Amy M. Malish
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wendy Chisholm
Represented By: J. Price McNamara
Represented By: Madison Tate Donaldson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?