Bias v. CF Industries Holdings, Inc
Plaintiff: Katina Bias
Defendant: CF Industries, Inc, CF Industries Employee Services, LLC and CF Industries Holdings, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2018cv00769
Filed: August 14, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Office: Baton Rouge Office
Presiding Judge: John W deGravelles
Referring Judge: Erin Wilder-Doomes
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 8, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 8, 2018 Filing 17 Corporate Disclosure Statement by CF Industries Employee Services, LLC. (Kiggans, Thomas)
October 8, 2018 Filing 16 MOTION to Dismiss by CF Industries Employee Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Attachment)(Kiggans, Thomas)
September 24, 2018 Filing 15 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against CF Industries Employee Services, LLC filed by Katina Bias.(SWE)
September 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 NOTICE AND ORDER: The #13 Motion to Substitute, which the undersigned considers as a Motion to Amend Plaintiff's Complaint, is GRANTED. The clerk is ORDERED to file the Amended Complaint with Jury Demand (R. Doc. 13-1) into the record. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 9/24/2018. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (BLR)
September 24, 2018 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #13 Second MOTION to Substitute Complaint . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (LLH)
September 21, 2018 Filing 13 Second MOTION to Substitute Complaint by Katina Bias. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading;)(Haley, Ronald) Modified on 9/24/2018 to remove blank page from motion (LLH).
September 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 NOTICE AND ORDER denying #10 MOTION to Substitute Complaint. The #7 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint with Jury Demand is DENIED without prejudice to Plaintiff reurging motion as written. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 9/20/2018. (LLH)
September 18, 2018 Filing 11 Notice to Counsel: A review of the #10 Motion to Substitute indicates the document is not in compliance with Local Rule 5(f)(1). Plaintiff shall have 3 days, to and including 9/21/2018, to file a certificate of service for R. Doc. 10 in compliance with the aforementioned Local Rule. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (BLR)
September 13, 2018 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #10 MOTION to Substitute Complaint . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (LLH)
September 12, 2018 Filing 10 MOTION to Substitute Complaint by Katina Bias. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading;)(Haley, Ronald)
August 29, 2018 Set Deadlines in accordance with record document 9: Motion to Substitute shall be filed by 9/12/2018. (NLT)
August 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NOTICE AND ORDER: Plaintiff shall file a Motion to Substitute the proposed Amended Complaint with Jury Demand (R. Doc. 7-1) with a comprehensive Amended Complaint that adequately alleges the citizenship of the defendant(s) in this action within fourteen (14) days of this Notice and Order. No further leave of court is required to file the Motion to Substitute. Failure to timely comply with this Notice and Order may result in sanctions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 8/29/2018. (BLR)
August 29, 2018 Filing 8 Notice to Counsel: In light of the #7 Motion for Leave of Court to File Amended Complaint with Jury Demand, the Show Cause Hearing set for 8/31/2018 is CANCELED. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (BLR)
August 29, 2018 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #7 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (SWE)
August 28, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint by Katina Bias. (Attachments: #1 Amended Complaint)(Haley, Ronald)
August 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: Plaintiff shall SHOW CAUSE for failure to comply with the court's #2 Notice and Order in a timely manner. Show Cause Hearing set for 8/31/2018 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 5 before Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes. Show Cause Response due by 8/29/2018. Failure to appear or respond as ordered may result in a recommendation that Plaintiffs claims in this matter be dismissed without further notice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 8/24/2018. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.)(BLR) Modified to edit text on 8/27/2018 (BLR).
August 23, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE Regarding Federal Jurisdiction by CF Industries Holdings, Inc. (Kiggans, Thomas) Modified on 8/24/2018 to edit the text (NLT).
August 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 10/18/2018 at 03:30 PM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes. Status Report due by 10/4/2018.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 8/16/2018. (SWE)
August 16, 2018 Reset Deadlines in accordance with record document 2: Amended Pleadings due by 8/23/2018. Motions shall be filed by 8/23/2018. (NLT)
August 16, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Not Issued: Counsel has requested issuance of summons but summons were blank. Therefore, summons will not be issued. (EDC)
August 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 NOTICE AND ORDER: as to #1 Complaint. Plaintiff shall file either: (1) a comprehensive amended complaint that adequately alleges the citizenship of Defendant, CF Industries Holding, Inc. as completely diverse from Plaintiff; or (2) a Motion to Voluntarily Dismiss this Matter due to lack of federal subject matter jurisdiction. Plaintiff shall have 7 days from this Notice and Order to file the comprehensive amended complaint or the Motion to Voluntarily Dismiss. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 8/16/2018. (SWE) Modified on 8/17/2018 to edit the title (NLT).
August 14, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Katina Bias ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAMDC-1816406.), filed by Katina Bias. (Attachments: #1 Civil Coversheet, #2 Civil Summons)(Haley, Ronald) (Attachment 2 replaced on 8/15/2018) (EDC). Modified on 8/15/2018 to flatten document. (EDC).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bias v. CF Industries Holdings, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CF Industries, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CF Industries Employee Services, LLC
Represented By: Thomas Harry Kiggans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CF Industries Holdings, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas Harry Kiggans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Katina Bias
Represented By: Ronald S. Haley, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?