Louisiana Carpenters Health Benefit Fund et al v. Woodrow Wilson Construction, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Louisiana Carpenters Pension Fund, Louisiana Carpenters Health Benefit Fund and Louisiana Carpenters Supplemental Retirement Fund
Defendant: Jim A Wilson, W Kurt Wilson, Woodrow Wilson Construction, LLC, M. A. WILSON CONSTRUCTION AND CONSULTING, LLC, Mark A Wilson and M.A. Wilson Construction and Consulting, LLC
Case Number: 3:2018cv00802
Filed: August 28, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Brian A Jackson
Referring Judge: Erin Wilder-Doomes
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 19, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 12/13/2018 at 04:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes. Status Report due by 11/29/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 10/19/2018. (ELW)
October 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Joint Motion of the Parties to Withdraw #5 ERISA Case Order and Replace with the Court's Normal Scheduling Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 10/19/2018. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (BLR)
October 19, 2018 Opinion or Order MOTION(S) REFERRED: #10 Joint MOTION to Withdraw #5 ERISA Case Order. In order to facilitate an efficient progression of this action, the parties shall comply with the deadlines stated herein. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 9/13/2018. (BLR) . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (ELW)
October 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Joint MOTION to Withdraw #5 ERISA Case Order. In order to facilitate an efficient progression of this action, the parties shall comply with the deadlines stated herein. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 9/13/2018. (BLR) by Louisiana Carpenters Health Benefit Fund, Louisiana Carpenters Pension Fund, Louisiana Carpenters Supplemental Retirement Fund. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Richard-Spencer, Julie)
October 12, 2018 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, by M.A. Wilson Construction and Consulting, LLC, Jim A Wilson, Mark A Wilson, W Kurt Wilson, Woodrow Wilson Construction, LLC.(Wilson, Blane)
September 26, 2018 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Louisiana Carpenters Supplemental Retirement Fund, Louisiana Carpenters Pension Fund, Louisiana Carpenters Health Benefit Fund. Jim A Wilson served on 9/5/2018, answer due 9/26/2018. (Richard-Spencer, Julie)
September 26, 2018 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Louisiana Carpenters Supplemental Retirement Fund, Louisiana Carpenters Pension Fund, Louisiana Carpenters Health Benefit Fund. M.A. Wilson Construction and Consulting, LLC served on 8/30/2018, answer due 9/20/2018. (Richard-Spencer, Julie)
September 26, 2018 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Louisiana Carpenters Supplemental Retirement Fund, Louisiana Carpenters Pension Fund, Louisiana Carpenters Health Benefit Fund. Mark A Wilson served on 8/30/2018, answer due 9/20/2018. (Richard-Spencer, Julie)
September 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ERISA Case Order. In order to facilitate an efficient progression of this action, the parties shall comply with the deadlines stated herein. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 9/13/2018. (BLR)
August 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Vacating #3 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 8/30/2018. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.)(BLR)
August 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 11/15/2018 at 11:00 AM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes. Status Report due by 11/1/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 8/30/2018. (BLR)
August 29, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to M.A. Wilson Construction and Consulting, LLC, Jim A Wilson, Mark A Wilson, W Kurt Wilson, Woodrow Wilson Construction, LLC. (NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve both the summons and all attachments in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4.) (Attachments: #1 summons, #2 summons, #3 summons, #4 summons)(EDC)
August 28, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against M. A. WILSON CONSTRUCTION AND CONSULTING, LLC, Jim A Wilson, Mark A Wilson, W Kurt Wilson, Woodrow Wilson Construction, LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAMDC-1822972.), filed by Louisiana Carpenters Supplemental Retirement Fund, Louisiana Carpenters Pension Fund, Louisiana Carpenters Health Benefit Fund. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Attachment Woodrow Wilson Construction Summons, #3 Attachment Mark A. Wilson Summons, #4 Attachment Jim A. Wilson Summons, #5 Attachment W. Kurt Wilson Summons, #6 Attachment M.A. Wilson Construction and Consulting Summons)(Richard-Spencer, Julie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Louisiana Carpenters Health Benefit Fund et al v. Woodrow Wilson Construction, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jim A Wilson
Represented By: Blane Andrew Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: W Kurt Wilson
Represented By: Blane Andrew Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Woodrow Wilson Construction, LLC
Represented By: Blane Andrew Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. A. WILSON CONSTRUCTION AND CONSULTING, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark A Wilson
Represented By: Blane Andrew Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M.A. Wilson Construction and Consulting, LLC
Represented By: Blane Andrew Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Louisiana Carpenters Pension Fund
Represented By: Julie Richard-Spencer
Represented By: Louis L. Robein
Represented By: Paula Martin Bruner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Louisiana Carpenters Health Benefit Fund
Represented By: Julie Richard-Spencer
Represented By: Louis L. Robein
Represented By: Paula Martin Bruner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Louisiana Carpenters Supplemental Retirement Fund
Represented By: Julie Richard-Spencer
Represented By: Louis L. Robein
Represented By: Paula Martin Bruner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?