Eckel v. JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. et al

Plaintiff: James W. Eckel
Defendant: Does 1-10 and JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Case Number: 3:2018cv00826
Filed: September 6, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
0 Judge: Richard L Bourgeois
1 Judge: Brian A Jackson
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 9, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 31, 2018 Filing 5 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS regarding #1 Complaint filed by James W. Eckel. It is the recommendation of the Magistrate Judge that this matter be dismissed without prejudice for Plaintiffs failure to pay the filing fee or file a motion to proceed in forma pauperis. Objections to R&R due by 11/14/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 10/31/2018. (KAH)
October 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. granted extension of time until 11/26/2018 to file it responsive pleading. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 10/23/2018. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (JSL)
October 22, 2018 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #3 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to #1 Complaint . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (KAH)
October 22, 2018 Filing 3 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to #1 Complaint by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service, #2 Proposed Order)(Grodsky, Barry)
October 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER: Within 21 days from the date of this order the plaintiff shall pay thefiling fee in the amount of $400.00 or file a motion to proceed in forma pauperis. Failure to comply with this order could result in the dismissal of this matter without further notice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 10/1/2018. (SGO)
September 6, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Does 1-10, JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., filed by James W. Eckel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 summons, #3 civil cover sheet, #4 envelope)(EDC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Eckel v. JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Barry Herbert Grodsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James W. Eckel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?