Asante' v. Experian Information Solutions, Inc

Plaintiff: Kwame Asante' and Kwame I. Asante'
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc
Case Number: 3:2018cv00852
Filed: September 20, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
0 Judge: Richard L Bourgeois
1 Judge: Brian A Jackson
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 8, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 12/20/2018 at 10:15 AM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois Jr. Status Report due by 12/6/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 11/8/2018. (JSL)
November 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER finding as moot #3 Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff has paid the filing fee. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 11/8/2018. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (Bourgeois, Richard)
October 30, 2018 Notice of Payment of $400.00 Initial Filing Fee by Kwame I. Asante'. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ALAMDC-1855095. (Asante, Kwame)
October 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: Plaintiff complete and submit the attached form, AO 239 -Application To Proceed In District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs (Long Form) to the Court by November 2, 2018. Application due by 11/2/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 10/19/2018. (ELW)
September 20, 2018 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #3 First MOTION to Proceed in forma pauperis . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (EDC)
September 20, 2018 Filing 3 First MOTION to Proceed in forma pauperis by Kwame Asante'. (Asante, Kwame)
September 20, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Experian Information Solutions, Inc. (NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve both the summons and all attachments in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4.) (ELW)
September 20, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Kwame Asante' against Experian Information Solutions, Inc, filed by Kwame Asante'. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Summons, #2 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet)(Asante, Kwame) (Attachment 1 & 2 replaced on 9/20/2018) (ELW). Modified on 9/20/2018 to flatten documents (ELW).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Asante' v. Experian Information Solutions, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kwame Asante'
Represented By: Kwame I. Asante
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kwame I. Asante'
Represented By: Kwame I. Asante
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?