United States of America v. Multiple Firearms

Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Multiple Firearms
Case Number: 3:2018cv00887
Filed: October 5, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
0 Judge: Shelly D Dick
1 Judge: Erin Wilder-Doomes
Nature of Suit: Forfeit/Penalty: Other
Cause of Action: 49:781
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 27, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 27, 2018 Filing 7 Return on Warrant of Arrest in Rem. (Zachary, Chase)
October 16, 2018 Filing 6 Warrant of Arrest in Rem issued (KAH)
October 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #4 Application for Warrant of Arrest In Rem. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 10/16/2018. (KAH)
October 16, 2018 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #4 MOTION APPLICATION FOR WARRANT OF ARREST IN REM. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (BLR)
October 12, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION APPLICATION FOR WARRANT OF ARREST IN REM by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading;)(Zachary, Chase)
October 5, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Multiple Firearms. (NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve both the summons and all attachments in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4.) (NLT)
October 5, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by United States of America (Thompson, James)
October 5, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR FORFEITURE IN REM against Multiple Firearms, filed by United States of America.(Zachary, Chase)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Multiple Firearms
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Multiple Firearms
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Chase Evan Zachary
Represented By: James Patrick Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?