CC River District LLC et al

Plaintiff: Planning Commission of City of Baton Rouge and Parish of East Baton Rouge and Metropolitan City/Parish of City of Baton Rouge and Parish of East Baton Rouge and CC River District LLC
Defendant: Planning Commission of City of Baton Rouge and Parish of East Baton Rouge and Metropolitan City/Parish of City of Baton Rouge and Parish of East Baton Rouge
Case Number: 3:2018cv00911
Filed: October 12, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Richard L Bourgeois
Referring Judge: Shelly D Dick
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 3, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 3, 2018 Filing 10 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by CC River District LLC. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G)(McMahen, Thomas)
November 8, 2018 Filing 9 Notice to Counsel: In view of the Court's order granting defendants an extension of time until 12/14/2018 to answer, the Scheduling Conference set for 12/20/2018 is RESET for 1/3/2019 at 10:00 AM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois Jr. Deadline to file Joint Status Report is reset to 12/27/2018. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.)(JSL)
November 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Metropolitan City/Parish of City of Baton Rouge and Parish of East Baton Rouge's answer due 12/14/2018; Planning Commission of City of Baton Rouge and Parish of East Baton Rouge's answer due 12/14/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 11/8/2018. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (JSL)
November 6, 2018 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by CC River District LLC. All Defendants. (McMahen, Thomas)
November 6, 2018 Filing 6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Metropolitan City/Parish of City of Baton Rouge and Parish of East Baton Rouge, Planning Commission of City of Baton Rouge and Parish of East Baton Rouge. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading; Order)(Ford, Candace)
October 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 12/20/2018 at 09:30 AM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois Jr.. Status Report due by 12/6/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 10/19/2018. (JSL)
October 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Brett A. Berman to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Brett A. Berman is hereby enrolled pro hac vice as co-counsel for the plaintiff in this matter. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 10/19/2018. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (JSL)
October 18, 2018 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #3 Ex Parte MOTION for Brett A. Berman to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $100.00, Receipt Number ALAMDC-1847974). This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (ELW)
October 17, 2018 Filing 3 Ex Parte MOTION for Brett A. Berman to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $100.00, Receipt Number ALAMDC-1847974) by CC River District LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A (Certificate of Good Standing), #2 Exhibit Exhibit B (Oath), #3 Attachment Proposed Order)(McMahen, Thomas)
October 15, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve both the summons and all attachments in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4.) (ELW)
October 12, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Planning Commission of City of Baton Rouge and Parish of East Baton Rouge and Metropolitan City/Parish of City of Baton Rouge and Parish of East Baton Rouge ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAMDC-1846207.), filed by CC River District LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Summons, #10 Summons)(Furr, Brett)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CC River District LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Planning Commission of City of Baton Rouge and Parish of East Baton Rouge and Metropolitan City/Parish of City of Baton Rouge and Parish of East Baton Rouge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CC River District LLC
Represented By: Brett P. Furr
Represented By: Brett A. Berman
Represented By: Thomas Coulter McMahen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Planning Commission of City of Baton Rouge and Parish of East Baton Rouge
Represented By: Paolo J. Messina
Represented By: Candace B. Ford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metropolitan City/Parish of City of Baton Rouge and Parish of East Baton Rouge
Represented By: Paolo J. Messina
Represented By: Candace B. Ford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?