Jennings v. Veeters et al

Plaintiff: Laurie Jennings
Defendant: Dutch Physical Therapy, Inc. and Philippe Veeters
Intervenor Plaintiff: Richard Kutcher Tygier & Luminais, LLP
Case Number: 3:2018cv00985
Filed: October 30, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
0 Judge: Shelly D Dick
1 Judge: Erin Wilder-Doomes
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 21, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER: Settlement Conference set for 4/25/2019 at 01:30 PM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 12/21/2018. (SWE)
December 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 SCHEDULING ORDER: In accordance with FRCP 16(b), the following discovery deadlines are established. Amended Pleadings due by 1/15/2019. F.R.C.P. 26(a)(1) disclosures due by 1/10/2019. Discovery due by 4/15/2019. Plaintiff`s Expert Witness List due by 5/15/2019. Defendant`s Expert Witness List due by 6/17/2019. Plaintiff`s Expert Reports due by 7/15/2019. Defendant`s Expert Reports due by 8/15/2019. Discovery from Experts due by 9/30/2019. Motions shall be filed by 10/30/2019. Motions In Limine shall be filed by 10/30/2019. The district judge will set the remaining deadlines, including dates for a pretrial conference and trial in this matter. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 12/21/2018. (SWE)
December 20, 2018 Filing 13 Notice to Counsel: The Scheduling Conference set for 12/27/2018 for is CANCELED. The court will issue an separate scheduling conference order. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (BLR)
December 14, 2018 Filing 12 Request for Jury by Laurie Jennings. (Hickman, Sarah) Modified on 12/17/2018 to edit the text (SWE).
December 13, 2018 Filing 11 Joint STATUS REPORT by Laurie Jennings. (Hickman, Sarah)
December 10, 2018 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Dutch Physical Therapy, Inc., Philippe Veeters.(Sonnier, Cynthia)
November 30, 2018 Filing 9 COMPLAINT of Intervention against Laurie Jennings, filed by Richard Kutcher Tygier & Luminais, LLP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(SWE) Modified on 12/10/2018 to rotate pages (SWE).
November 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE AND ORDER: The #7 Unopposed Motion to Intervene filed by Richard Kutcher Tygier & Luminais, LLP ("Intervenor") is GRANTED. Per the Motion, Intervenor certifies plaintiff has no objection to the intervention and points out that defendants have not filed an answer or made an appearance. The Fifth Circuit has treated the intervention of a discharged law firm with a contingency fee agreement as an intervention of right. See, Skinner v. Weslaco Independent School Dist., 220 F.3d 584 (5th Cir. 2000) (per curium) ("this Court has held that a firm with a contingency agreement is 'so situated that the final disposition of the action may as a practical matter impair or impede its ability to protect that interest.'") (citing Gaines v. Dixie Carriers, Inc., 434 F.2d 52, 54 (5th Cir. 1970)), and the undersigned's review indicates that the factors set forth in Fed. R. Civ. P. 24(a)(2) are satisfied. Accordingly, the Clerk is ORDERED to file Intervenor's Complaint of Intervention, along with accompanying exhibits (R. Doc. 7-1) into the record. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 11/30/2018. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (BLR)
November 29, 2018 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #7 Unopposed MOTION to Intervene . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (SWE)
November 29, 2018 Filing 7 Unopposed MOTION to Intervene by Richard Kutcher Tygier & Luminais, LLP. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed Pleading; Order)(Kutcher, Robert)
November 21, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Change of Affiliation by Laurie Jennings (Wagar, Nelson)
November 15, 2018 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Laurie Jennings. Philippe Veeters served on 11/15/2018, answer due 12/6/2018. (Wagar, Nelson)
November 15, 2018 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Laurie Jennings. Dutch Physical Therapy, Inc. served on 11/15/2018, answer due 12/6/2018. (Wagar, Nelson)
October 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 12/27/2018 at 03:30 PM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes. Status Report due by 12/13/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 10/30/2018. (SWE)
October 30, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Dutch Physical Therapy, Inc., Philippe Veeters. (NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve both the summons and all attachments in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4.) (SWE)
October 30, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAMDC-1854533.), filed by Laurie Jennings. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(Hickman, Sarah) Modified on 10/30/2018 to replace with flattened pages (SWE).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jennings v. Veeters et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dutch Physical Therapy, Inc.
Represented By: Cynthia Gatlin Sonnier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Philippe Veeters
Represented By: Cynthia Gatlin Sonnier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laurie Jennings
Represented By: Sarah W Hickman
Represented By: Nelson W. Wagar, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Richard Kutcher Tygier & Luminais, LLP
Represented By: Robert A. Kutcher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?