United States of America v. Two Million Dollars in UBS Swiss Financial Advisers Act CHXXXXXXXXXXXXXXX-2001
Plaintiff: Two Million Dollars in UBS Swiss Financial Advisors Account and United States of America
Defendant: Two Million Dollars in UBS Swiss Financial Advisers Act CHXXXXXXXXXXXXXXX-2001
Case Number: 3:2018cv01004
Filed: November 7, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Brian A Jackson
Referring Judge: Erin Wilder-Doomes
Nature of Suit: Forfeit/Penalty: Other
Cause of Action: 49:781
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 17, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 17, 2018 Filing 6 Warrant of Arrest in Rem issued (SWE) Modified on 12/17/2018 to edit the event (SWE).
December 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Application for Warrant of Arrest in Rem. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 12/17/2018. (SWE)
November 20, 2018 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #4 MOTION APPLICATION FOR WARRANT OF ARREST IN REM. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (SGO)
November 15, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION APPLICATION FOR WARRANT OF ARREST IN REM by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading;, #2 Proposed Pleading;)(Thompson, James)
November 8, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Two Million Dollars in UBS Swiss Financial Advisors Account. (NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve both the summons and all attachments in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4.) (SWE)
November 7, 2018 Filing 2 SEALED MOTION to File Unredacted Verified Complaint for Forfeiture in Rem Under Seal by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading;)(Thompson, James) Modified on 11/7/2018 to edit the text (NLT). Modified on 11/9/2018 - Motion terminated - Prior leave granted pursuant to Administrative Procedures I.K.2.a. (NLT).
November 7, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR FORFEITURE IN REM against Two Million Dollars in UBS Swiss Financial Advisors Account, filed by United States of America.(Thompson, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Two Million Dollars in UBS Swiss Financial Advisers Act CHXXXXXXXXXXXXXXX-2001
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Two Million Dollars in UBS Swiss Financial Advisors Account
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: James Patrick Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Two Million Dollars in UBS Swiss Financial Advisers Act CHXXXXXXXXXXXXXXX-2001
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?