Jones v. Caliber Home Loans, Inc.

Plaintiff: Special Agent Larry Jones and Larry Jones
Defendant: Caliber Home Loans, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2018cv01023
Filed: November 16, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
0 Judge: Shelly D Dick
1 Judge: Erin Wilder-Doomes
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Accommodations
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 14, 2019 Filing 17 Joint STATUS REPORT by Caliber Home Loans, Inc.. (Seanor, Christina)
January 14, 2019 Filing 16 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Caliber Home Loans, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent LSF6 Service Operations, LLC, Corporate Parent LSF6 Mid-Servicer Holdings, LLC, Other Affiliate Caliber Home Loans, Inc. for Caliber Home Loans, Inc.. (Seanor, Christina)
January 14, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION to Strike an Incorrectly Filed Document #13 MOTION to Dismiss by Caliber Home Loans, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading; Order)(Seanor, Christina)
January 14, 2019 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #12 MOTION for Extension of Time Status Report. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (SWE)
January 11, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION to Dismiss by Caliber Home Loans, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss)(Seanor, Christina)
January 11, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION to Dismiss by Caliber Home Loans, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss)(Seanor, Christina)
January 11, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for Extension of Time Status Report by Larry Jones. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Order)(Holt, James)
January 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Motion to Enroll Additional Attorney. Added attorney Christina M. Seanor for Caliber Home Loans, Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 1/7/2018. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (BLR)
January 4, 2019 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #10 MOTION to Enroll Christina M. Seanor as Additional Attorney . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (KAH)
January 3, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Enroll Christina M. Seanor as Additional Attorney by Caliber Home Loans, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Proposed Order for Motion to Appear as Additional Counsel)(Goodsell, Blake)
December 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER denying #7 Motion for Entry of Default. Defendant's counsel filed a #6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleadings on 12/21/2018. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (SWE)
December 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Caliber Home Loans, Inc. responsive pleadings due 1/11/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 12/27/2018. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (BLR)
December 27, 2018 Filing 7 First MOTION for Clerks Entry of Default as to Caliber Home Loans, Inc. by Larry Jones. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Exhibit A: Affidavit of Jim Holt for Entry of Default Judgment, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1 Return of Service)(Holt, James)
December 26, 2018 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #6 MOTION for Extension of Time to file responsive pleadings to the Complaint. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (ELW)
December 21, 2018 Filing 6 MOTION for Extension of Time to file responsive pleadings to the Complaint by Caliber Home Loans, Inc.. (Goodsell, Blake)
December 4, 2018 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Larry Jones . Caliber Home Loans, Inc. served on 11/30/2018, answer due 12/21/2018. (Holt, James) Modified on 12/6/2018 to edit the text (SWE). Modified to include answer due date on 12/27/2018 (BLR).
November 26, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Signed Civil Cover Sheet by Larry Jones re 3 Order, #1 Complaint, (Holt, James) (Main Document 4 replaced on 11/27/2018) (EDC). Modified on 11/27/2018 to flatten document. (EDC).
November 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER: A review of the docket indicates that the Civil Cover Sheet (R. Doc. 1-2) is not signed. Plaintiff is ordered to file a signed Civil Cover Sheet by 11/30/18 into the record. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 11/26/2018. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.)(BLR)
November 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 1/24/2019 at 03:00 PM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes. Status Report due by 1/10/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 11/20/2018. (BLR)
November 16, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Plaintiffs ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAMDC-1863730.), filed by Larry Jones. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet)(Holt, James) (Attachment 1 replaced on 11/19/2018) (EDC). Modified on 11/19/2018 to flatten document. (EDC). Modified on 11/27/2018 to flatten document. (EDC).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jones v. Caliber Home Loans, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Special Agent Larry Jones
Represented By: James S. Holt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry Jones
Represented By: James S. Holt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caliber Home Loans, Inc.
Represented By: Christina M. Seanor
Represented By: Blake Goodsell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?