Davis v. United States Department of the Treasury et al
Plaintiff: Patrick A. Davis
Defendant: United States Internal Revenue Service, Defense Accounting and Finance Agency and United States Department of the Treasury
Case Number: 3:2018cv01041
Filed: December 10, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Shelly D Dick
Referring Judge: Erin Wilder-Doomes
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 28:7402
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 28, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Filing Fee due by 2/8/2019. (SWE)
January 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: that Plaintiff shall complete and submit the attached form,AO 239-Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs (Long Form) to the Court by February 8, 2019. This matter will be considered submitted at that time for the issuance of a ruling on Plaintiffs Motions to Proceed in Forma Pauperis. Further, the clerks office is to serve this Order on Plaintiff via certified mail return receipt requested to the address listed on PACER. Plaintiffs failure to comply with this order may result in a recommendation of dismissal of his claims in this matter. Plaintiff is also reminded that, pursuant to Local Civil Rule 41(b)(4), the failure to keep the Court apprised of the correct address may result in a recommendation of dismissal for failure to prosecute. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 1/23/2019. (Attachments: #1 Attachment AO 239 - Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs)(SWE)
January 23, 2019 Filing 6 USPS Tracking information for Certified # 7004 1160 0003 2648 6925. (BLR)
January 22, 2019 Filing 5 Mail Returned as Undeliverable on #3 Order on Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis. Mail returned from Patrick A. Davis. Reason: Return to Sender - unable to forward. (EDC)
January 14, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Certificate of Service by Patrick A. Davis (EDC)
December 13, 2018 Set Deadlines: AO 239- Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs (Long Form) due by 12/27/2018. (ELW)
December 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER denying #2 Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff shall complete and submit the attached form, AO 239- Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs (Long Form) to the Court by December 27, 2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 12/13/2018. (ELW)
December 12, 2018 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #2 MOTION to Proceed in forma pauperis. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (EDC)
December 10, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION to Proceed in forma pauperis by Patrick A. Davis. (EDC)
December 10, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Defense Accounting and Finance Agency, United States Department of the Treasury, United States Internal Revenue Service, filed by Patrick A. Davis. (Attachments: #1 Attachment, #2 civil cover sheet, #3 envelope)(EDC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Davis v. United States Department of the Treasury et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Internal Revenue Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Defense Accounting and Finance Agency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of the Treasury
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patrick A. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?