Thompson et al v. Atlantic Credit and Finance, Inc., et al
Plaintiff: Daralee Thompson and William Thompson
Defendant: DOES 1-10, inclusive and Atlantic Credit and Finance, Inc.,
Case Number: 3:2018cv01080
Filed: December 13, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Richard L Bourgeois
Referring Judge: John W deGravelles
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 8, 2019 Filing 8 Joint STATUS REPORT by Daralee Thompson, William Thompson. (Solak, Jennifer)
February 4, 2019 Filing 7 Notice to Counsel: Scheduling Conference set for 2/21/2019 is RESET for 2/28/2019 at 11:00 AM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois Jr. Deadline to file Joint Status Report is reset to 2/14/2019.(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (JSL)
February 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading. Defendant Atlantic Credit and Finance, Inc.'s answer due February 14, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 2/4/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (JSL)
February 4, 2019 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #5 MOTION for Extension of Time to file Responsive Pleading. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (EDC)
February 1, 2019 Filing 5 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to file Responsive Pleading by Atlantic Credit and Finance, Inc.,. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading;)(McDade, Matthew) Modified on 2/4/2019 to edit text (LLH).
December 27, 2018 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by William Thompson, Daralee Thompson. Atlantic Credit and Finance, Inc., served on 12/24/2018, answer due 1/14/2019. (Solak, Jennifer)
December 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 2/21/2019 at 01:30 PM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois Jr. Status Report due by 2/7/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 12/17/2018. (JSL)
December 14, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Atlantic Credit and Finance, Inc.,. (NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve both the summons and all attachments in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4.) (NLT)
December 13, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Atlantic Credit and Finance, Inc.DOES 1-10, inclusive ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAMDC-1874841.), filed by William Thompson, Daralee Thompson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Solak, Jennifer) Modified on 12/14/2018 to edit the text (NLT).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thompson et al v. Atlantic Credit and Finance, Inc., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1-10, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Atlantic Credit and Finance, Inc.,
Represented By: Matthew Ward McDade
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daralee Thompson
Represented By: Jennifer M. Solak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Thompson
Represented By: Jennifer M. Solak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?