Byrd v. Ford Motor Company, et al
Plaintiff: Eddie Byrd
Defendant: Ford Motor Company and James V. Johnson
Case Number: 3:2018cv01086
Filed: December 17, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Richard L Bourgeois
Referring Judge: John W deGravelles
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #5 Consent Motion for Entry of Stipulated Sharing and Non-Sharing Protective Order. The attached Protective Order is entered into the record of the above-referenced matter. The Court has made modifications in bold in the Protective Order. The Court notes for counsel the additions it has made in bold concerning the filing of documents under seal. See paragraph 12, footnotes 1 and 2. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 2/14/2019. (Attachments: #1 Attachment) (KAH)
February 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #6 Motion to Dismiss Defendant James v. Johnson Without Prejudice. Defendant James V. Johnson is hereby dismissed without prejudice, with each side to bear its own costs. The claims against Ford Motor Company will remain pending. Signed by Judge John W. deGravelles on 2/11/2019. (KAH)
February 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SCHEDULING ORDER: The scheduling conference presently set for February 14, 2019 is CANCELLED. In accordance with FRCP 16(b), the following discovery deadlines are established. Amended Pleadings due by 4/1/2019. Discovery due by 4/1/2020. Plaintiff`s Expert Witness List due by 2/3/2020. Defendant`s Expert Witness List due by 5/1/2020. Plaintiff`s Expert Reports due by 2/3/2020. Defendant`s Expert Reports due by 5/1/2020. Discovery from Experts due by 7/1/2020. Motions shall be filed by 8/31/2020. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 12/21/2020. Pretrial Conference set for 1/14/2021 at 02:00 PM in chambers before Judge John W. deGravelles. Motions In Limine shall be filed by 1/19/2021. Affidavit of Settlement Efforts due by 2/1/2021. Joint jury instructions, voir dire, verdict forms, and trial briefs due by 2/26/2021. 10-day Jury Trial set for 3/15/2021 - 3/26/2021 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 1 before Judge John W. deGravelles. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 2/11/2019. (JSL)
February 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Joint MOTION to Substitute Status Report filed by Ford Motor Company. The Joint Status Report filed on 2/1/2019 (R. Doc. 4) shall be substituted with the corrected Joint Status Report (R. Doc. 7 at 3-11). Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 2/8/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (JSL)
February 8, 2019 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #7 Joint MOTION to Substitute Status Report . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (SGO)
February 8, 2019 Filing 7 Joint MOTION to Substitute Status Report by Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading;)(Maxwell, Robert)
February 8, 2019 Filing 6 Unopposed MOTION to Dismiss Defendant JAMES V. JOHNSON, without prejudice by Eddie Byrd. (Ellis, Peter) Modified on 2/11/2019 (LLH).
February 7, 2019 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #5 MOTION for Entry of Stipulated Sharing and Non-Sharing Protective Order. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (KAH)
February 7, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Entry of Stipulated Sharing and Non-Sharing Protective Order by Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Stipulated Sharing and Non-Sharing Protective Order, #2 Proposed Pleading;)(Maxwell, Robert) Modified on 2/7/2019 to edit the text (KAH).
February 1, 2019 Filing 4 STATUS REPORT by All Plaintiffs. (Ellis, Peter) Modified on 2/11/2019 to replace as per rec doc 8 (KAH).
January 17, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Ford Motor Company. (Maxwell, Robert)
January 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 2/14/2019 at 01:45 PM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois Jr.. Status Report due by 1/31/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 1/7/2019. (KAH)
December 17, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 19th Judicial District Court, Case Number 670570. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAMDC-1876529), filed by Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D, #5 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Attachment State Court Record)(Maxwell, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Byrd v. Ford Motor Company, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ford Motor Company
Represented By: Robert William Maxwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James V. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eddie Byrd
Represented By: Peter Eugene Ellis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?