Santos v. Baton Rouge Water Works Company
Plaintiff: JORGE SANTOS
Defendant: Baton Rouge Water Works Company and The Baton Rouge Water Works Company
Case Number: 3:2018cv01098
Filed: December 24, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Richard L Bourgeois
Referring Judge: John W deGravelles
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 20, 2019 Filing 6 STATUS REPORT by Jorge Santos. (Siddiqui, Imtiaz)
January 18, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by The Baton Rouge Water Works Company.(Peak, Thomas)
January 10, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jorge Santos. The Baton Rouge Water Works Company served on 12/28/2018, answer due 1/18/2019. (Siddiqui, Imtiaz)
January 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 3/7/2019 at 10:00 AM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois Jr. Status Report due by 2/21/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 1/7/2019. (EDC)
December 26, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to The Baton Rouge Water Works Company. (NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve both the summons and all attachments in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4.) (ELW)
December 24, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Baton Rouge Water Works Company ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAMDC-1879071.), filed by JORGE SANTOS. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Attachment Summons in a Civil Action)(Siddiqui, Imtiaz)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Santos v. Baton Rouge Water Works Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Baton Rouge Water Works Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Baton Rouge Water Works Company
Represented By: Thomas Robert Peak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JORGE SANTOS
Represented By: Imtiaz A Siddiqui
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?