Andrews v. Exxon Mobil Corporation
Plaintiff: Mr. Dwayne Andrews and Dwayne Andrews
Defendant: Exxon Mobil Corporation
Case Number: 3:2018cv01101
Filed: December 26, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Richard L Bourgeois
Referring Judge: Brian A Jackson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:451
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 15, 2019 Filing 13 ANSWER to #1 Complaint and Defenses by Exxon Mobil Corporation.(Huffstetler, Scott)
January 28, 2019 Filing 12 Notice to Counsel: In view of the Court's order granting Exxon Mobil Corporation an extension of time until 2/19/2019 to answer, the Scheduling Conference set for 3/7/2019 is RESET for 3/14/2019 at 10:45 AM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois Jr. Deadline to file the Joint Status Report is reset to 2/28/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (JSL)
January 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Exxon Mobil Corporation's answer due 2/19/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 1/28/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (JSL)
January 28, 2019 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Exxon Mobil Corporation. (Caswell, Chelsea)
January 28, 2019 Filing 9 Ex Parte MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to #1 Complaint by Exxon Mobil Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Caswell, Chelsea)
January 16, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Dwayne Andrews. Exxon Mobil Corporation served on 1/8/2019, answer due 1/29/2019. (Smith, J.)
January 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 3/7/2019 at 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois Jr.. Status Report due by 2/21/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 01/07/2019. (ELW)
January 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Motion to Strike Incorrect Document. The incorrectly filed summons (R. Doc. 2) shall be STRUCK from the record of this matter. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 1/4/2018. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (JSL)
January 2, 2019 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #5 MOTION to Strike an Incorrectly Filed Document 2 Summons Submitted . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (SGO)
January 2, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Strike an Incorrectly Filed Document 2 Summons Submitted by Dwayne Andrews. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Smith, J.)
January 2, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Exxon Mobil Corporation. (NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve both the summons and all attachments in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4.) (KAH)
December 31, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Submitted (Smith, J.) Modified on 1/2/2019 to flatten the document (KAH).
December 31, 2018 Filing 2 STRICKEN FROM THE RECORD Summons Submitted (Smith, J.) Modified on 1/2/2019 to flatten document (KAH). Modified on 1/7/2019 to remove document as it has been stricken as per Order #6 (LLH).
December 26, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Dwayne Andrews ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAMDC-1879439.), filed by Dwayne Andrews. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Smith, J.) Modified on 12/27/2018 to flatten cover sheet (SWE).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Andrews v. Exxon Mobil Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mr. Dwayne Andrews
Represented By: J. Arthur Smith, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dwayne Andrews
Represented By: J. Arthur Smith, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Exxon Mobil Corporation
Represented By: David Mark Whitaker
Represented By: Scott D. Huffstetler
Represented By: Zoe Wilde Vermeulen
Represented By: Theresa R. Hagen
Represented By: Chelsea Gomez Caswell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?