Amoroso et al v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company et al

Plaintiff: Michal Ann Amoroso Traina, Anthony Amoroso, V, Elaine Amoroso Swart and Denise Amoroso
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company and State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Case Number: 3:2018cv01106
Filed: December 28, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: John W deGravelles
Referring Judge: Erin Wilder-Doomes
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 20, 2019 Filing 7 Notice to Counsel: The Scheduling Conference set for 3/7/2019 is CANCELED. The court will issue a separate scheduling order in the matter. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (BLR)
February 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER of Reference: The foregoing matter is referred to a United States Magistrate Judge for the conduct of all further proceedings and the entry of judgment in accordance with 28 USC 636(c) and the foregoing consent of the parties. Signed by Judge John W. deGravelles on 2/19/2019. (KAH)
February 19, 2019 Filing 5 CONSENT to Proceed before US Magistrate by All Parties. (BLR)
February 19, 2019 Filing 4 Joint STATUS REPORT by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Consent to Magistrate Judge)(Atkinson, Daniel)
January 8, 2019 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company, State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company.(Boudreaux, Brad)
January 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 3/7/2019 at 01:30 PM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes. Status Report due by 2/21/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 1/4/2019. (SGO)
December 28, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 19th Judicial District Court, Case Number 676991. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAMDC-1879975), filed by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company, State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Civil cover sheet, #2 Proposed Pleading; Certificate, #3 Exhibit Exhibit)(Boudreaux, Brad)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Amoroso et al v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michal Ann Amoroso Traina
Represented By: John C. Jacobs
Represented By: Kevin P. Kleinpeter
Represented By: C. John Naquin, Jr.
Represented By: Rebecca Renee Indest
Represented By: Daniel R. Atkinson, Jr.
Represented By: John T. Joubert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Amoroso, V
Represented By: John C. Jacobs
Represented By: Kevin P. Kleinpeter
Represented By: C. John Naquin, Jr.
Represented By: Rebecca Renee Indest
Represented By: Daniel R. Atkinson, Jr.
Represented By: John T. Joubert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elaine Amoroso Swart
Represented By: John C. Jacobs
Represented By: Kevin P. Kleinpeter
Represented By: C. John Naquin, Jr.
Represented By: Rebecca Renee Indest
Represented By: Daniel R. Atkinson, Jr.
Represented By: John T. Joubert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Denise Amoroso
Represented By: John C. Jacobs
Represented By: Kevin P. Kleinpeter
Represented By: C. John Naquin, Jr.
Represented By: Rebecca Renee Indest
Represented By: Daniel R. Atkinson, Jr.
Represented By: John T. Joubert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Represented By: Brad M Boudreaux
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Represented By: Brad M Boudreaux
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?