Clark v. McDonald's

Plaintiff: Katera Clark
Defendant: McDonald's and McDonald's Restaurant, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2018cv01107
Filed: December 28, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Richard L Bourgeois
Referring Judge: John W deGravelles
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 19, 2019 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to McDonald's Restaurant, Inc.. (NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve both the summons and all attachments in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4.) (KAH)
February 19, 2019 Filing 8 Summons Submitted (Blackman, Natalie) Modified on 2/19/2019 to flatten the document (KAH).
February 19, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Submitted (Blackman, Natalie) Modified on 2/19/2019 to flatten the document (KAH).
January 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 MOTION to Substitute Complaint filed by Katera Clark. The Complaint (R. Doc. 1) shall be substituted with the corrected Complaint (R. Doc. 5-2). Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 1/31/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (JSL)
January 31, 2019 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #5 MOTION to Substitute Complaint . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (KAH)
January 31, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Substitute Complaint by Katera Clark. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading; Order, #2 Proposed Pleading; Complaint)(Blackman, Natalie)
January 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: Within 10 days of the date of this order Plaintiff shall file a motion to substitute the complaint and attach a copy of the complaint with a corrected caption. A Scheduling Conference is set for 4/2/2019 at 10:30 AM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois Jr. Status Report due by 3/21/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 1/18/2019. (KAH)
January 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #2 Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis. The Clerk shall file said complaint without prepayment of costs or security thereof and the Clerk is directed to issue process to the defendant(s). The plaintiff(s) is responsible for service of summons and complaint on the defendant(s). Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 1/18/2019. (KAH)
December 28, 2018 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #2 MOTION to Proceed in forma pauperis. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (SGO)
December 28, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION to Proceed in forma pauperis by Katera Clark. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(SGO)
December 28, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Mc Donald's, filed by Katera Clark. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Attachment Application to Proceed InPauper, #3 Proposed Pleading; Order)(Blackman, Natalie) Modified on 12/28/2018 to flatten document (SGO). Modified on 2/1/2019 to replace complaint as per Order #6 (LLH).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Clark v. McDonald's
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McDonald's
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McDonald's Restaurant, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Katera Clark
Represented By: Natalie Shalane Blackman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?