Taylor v. Union Pacific Railroad Company
Plaintiff: Mr. Johnny Taylor and Johnny Taylor
Defendant: Union Pacific Railroad Company and Union Pacific Railroad Company, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2018cv01110
Filed: December 31, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Shelly D Dick
Referring Judge: Erin Wilder-Doomes
Nature of Suit: Labor: Railway Labor Act
Cause of Action: 45 U.S.C. ยง 151
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 9, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 21, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Union Pacific Railroad Company, Inc..(Fraser, David)
February 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Linda C. Schoonmaker to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 2/5/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (BLR)
February 5, 2019 Filing 8 Notice to Counsel: In light of Union Pacific Railroad Company, Inc.'s answer being due 2/22/2019, good cause is shown to reset the Scheduling Conference to 4/4/2019 at 11:00 AM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes. Status Report due by 3/21/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (BLR)
February 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #4 Unopposed Motion for Extend the Deadline to Answer or Otherwise Plead. Union Pacific Railroad Company, Inc. answer due 2/22/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 2/5/2018. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (BLR)
February 1, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Linda C. Schoonmaker to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $100.00, Receipt Number ALAMDC-1894795) by Union Pacific Railroad Company, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading; Order, #2 Affidavit, #3 Affidavit Certificate of Good Standing)(Fraser, David)
February 1, 2019 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #6 MOTION for Linda C. Schoonmaker to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $100.00, Receipt Number ALAMDC-1894795). This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (KAH)
January 31, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties by Union Pacific Railroad Company, Inc. (Fraser, David)
January 31, 2019 Filing 4 Unopposed MOTION to Extend the Deadline to Answer or Otherwise Plead in Response to Plaintiff's Complaint by Union Pacific Railroad Company, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading; Order)(Fraser, David) Modified on 1/31/2019 to edit the text (NLT).
January 31, 2019 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #4 Unopposed MOTION to Extend the Deadline to Answer or Otherwise Plead in Response to Plaintiff's Complaint. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (NLT)
January 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 3/7/2019 at 09:00 AM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes. Status Report due by 2/21/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 1/7/2019. (KAH)
January 2, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Union Pacific Railroad Company, Inc.. (NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve both the summons and all attachments in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4.) (KAH)
December 31, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Union Pacific Railroad Company ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAMDC-1880458.), filed by Johnny Taylor. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Schmidt, Robert) Modified on 1/2/2019 to flatten attachments (KAH).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Taylor v. Union Pacific Railroad Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Union Pacific Railroad Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Union Pacific Railroad Company, Inc.
Represented By: David Andrew Fraser
Represented By: Linda C. Shoonmaker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mr. Johnny Taylor
Represented By: Robert Moseley Schmidt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Johnny Taylor
Represented By: Robert Moseley Schmidt
Represented By: J. Arthur Smith, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?