Hooge v. Union Pacific Railroad Company et al
Plaintiff: Mrs. Monica McDonald Hooge and Monica McDonald Hooge
Defendant: Union Pacific Railroad Company, Louisiana Railroad Association, Mr. Carmack M Blackmon and Carmack Blackmon
Case Number: 3:2018cv01112
Filed: December 31, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Richard L Bourgeois
Referring Judge: John W deGravelles
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 22, 2019 Filing 13 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Carmack Blackmon, Louisiana Railroad Association.(Hamilton, Leo)
February 21, 2019 Filing 12 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Union Pacific Railroad Company.(Fraser, David)
February 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Carmack Blackmon's answer due 2/25/2019; Louisiana Railroad Association's answer due 2/25/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 2/4/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (JSL)
February 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Linda C. Schoonmaker to Appear Pro Hac Vic. Linda C. Schoonmaker is enrolled pro hac vice as counsel for Defendant Union Pacific Railroad Company in this matter. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 2/4/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (JSL)
February 1, 2019 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #9 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to #1 Complaint, . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (ELW)
February 1, 2019 Filing 9 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to #1 Complaint, with Request for Expedited Consideration by Carmack Blackmon, Louisiana Railroad Association. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading; Order)(Shirley, Melissa) Modified on 2/1/2019 to edit text (ELW).
February 1, 2019 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #8 MOTION for Linda C. Schoonmaker to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $100.00, Receipt Number ALAMDC-1894769). This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (ELW)
February 1, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Linda C. Schoonmaker to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $100.00, Receipt Number ALAMDC-1894769) by Union Pacific Railroad Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading; Order, #2 Affidavit, #3 Attachment Certificate of Good Standing)(Fraser, David)
January 31, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties by Union Pacific Railroad Company (Fraser, David)
January 31, 2019 Filing 6 Notice to Counsel: In view of the Court's order granting Union Pacific an extension of time until 2/22/2019 to file an answer, the Scheduling Conference set for 3/14/2019 is RESET for 3/21/2019 at 01:30 PM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois Jr. Deadline to file the Joint Status Report is reset to 3/7/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (JSL)
January 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Union Pacific Railroad Company's answer due 2/22/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 1/31/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (JSL)
January 31, 2019 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #4 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (ELW)
January 31, 2019 Filing 4 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Union Pacific Railroad Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading; Order)(Fraser, David)
January 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 3/14/2019 at 09:00 AM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois Jr. Status Report due by 2/28/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 1/24/2019. (SGO)
January 2, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Carmack Blackmon, Louisiana Railroad Association, Union Pacific Railroad Company. (NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve both the summons and all attachments in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4.) (SGO)
December 31, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAMDC-1880527.), filed by Monica McDonald Hooge. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons (Union Pacific), #3 Summons (Louisiana Railroad Association), #4 Summons (Blackmon))(Smith, J.) Modified on 1/2/2019 to flatten documents (SGO).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hooge v. Union Pacific Railroad Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mrs. Monica McDonald Hooge
Represented By: J. Arthur Smith, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Monica McDonald Hooge
Represented By: J. Arthur Smith, III
Represented By: Robert Moseley Schmidt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Union Pacific Railroad Company
Represented By: David Andrew Fraser
Represented By: Linda C. Schoonmaker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Louisiana Railroad Association
Represented By: Jacob Ellis Roussel
Represented By: Leo Charles Hamilton
Represented By: Melissa M. Shirley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mr. Carmack M Blackmon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carmack Blackmon
Represented By: Jacob Ellis Roussel
Represented By: Leo Charles Hamilton
Represented By: Melissa M. Shirley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?