Bacigalupi et al v. American Security Insurance Company

Plaintiff: Debra Bacigalupi and Michael Bacigalupi
Defendant: American Security Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2019cv00019
Filed: January 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Brian A Jackson
Referring Judge: Erin Wilder-Doomes
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Motion to Dismiss With Prejudice. Signed by Judge Brian A. Jackson on 02/04/2019. (NLT)
February 1, 2019 Filing 5 Joint MOTION to Dismiss With Prejudice by Plaintiff and by American Security Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Proposed Order)(Serou, Gordon)
January 11, 2019 Filing 4 JOINT NOTICE of Settlement by Plaintiffs and by American Security Insurance Company (Serou, Gordon) Modified on 1/14/2019 to edit text (LLH).
January 11, 2019 Filing 3 Notice to Counsel: Counsel for the defendant advised the court by telephone 1/11/2019 that the parties had reached a settlement agreement. Counsel shall file the Joint Notice of Settlement contemplated by Local Civil Rule 16(c) by no later than 1/18/2019.(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (BLR)
January 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 NOTICE AND ORDER: American Security Insurance Company, shall file a memorandum and supporting evidence concerning whether the amount in controversy requirement of 28 U.S.C. 1332 is met, within ten (10) days of this Notice and Order. FURTHER, Plaintiffs shall file either: (1) a memorandum and supporting evidence concerning whether the amount in controversy requirement of 28 U.S.C. 1332 is met; or (2) a Motion to Remand within ten (10) days after the filing of the Defendant's memorandum regarding subject matter jurisdiction. The case will be allowed to proceed if jurisdiction is adequately established. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 1/11/2019. (NLT)
January 10, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 21st JDC Livingston Parish, Case Number 158087. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAMDC-1884881), filed by American Security Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet)(Serou, Gordon)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bacigalupi et al v. American Security Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Security Insurance Company
Represented By: Gordon P. Serou, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Debra Bacigalupi
Represented By: Jessie Braud Callahan
Represented By: Rajan Pandit
Represented By: John Dennis Carter
Represented By: Henry John Roth
Represented By: Casey Czjaka DeReus
Represented By: Jason M. Baer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Bacigalupi
Represented By: Jessie Braud Callahan
Represented By: Rajan Pandit
Represented By: John Dennis Carter
Represented By: Henry John Roth
Represented By: Casey Czjaka DeReus
Represented By: Jason M. Baer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?