Charles v. Robertson et al

Plaintiff: Timothy Bryant Charles
Defendant: James M. LeBlanc, Creshawnda Thompson, Randall Robertson and Francis Abbott
Case Number: 3:2019cv00027
Filed: January 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Richard L Bourgeois
Referring Judge: Shelly D Dick
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 14, 2019 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #8 MOTION for Leave to File an Alter Amended Complaint. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (EDC)
March 13, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to File an Alter Amended Complaint by Timothy Bryant Charles. (EDC)
March 13, 2019 Filing 7 AMENDED NOTICE OF APPEAL to #4 Report and Recommendations by Timothy Bryant Charles. (EDC)
February 28, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF APPEAL/OBJECTION to #4 Report and Recommendations filed by Timothy Bryant Charles. (EDC)
February 28, 2019 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #5 MOTION for Leave to File an Amended Complaint and Motion to Vacate Judgment MOTION to Vacate. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (EDC)
February 28, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to File an Amended Complaint and Motion to Vacate Judgment by Timothy Bryant Charles. (EDC)
February 11, 2019 Filing 4 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS regarding #1 Complaint filed by Timothy Bryant Charles. It is the recommendation of the Magistrate Judge that this action be dismissed, with prejudice, for failure to state a claim upon which relief may be granted pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(e) and 1915A. Objections to R&R due by 2/25/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 2/11/2019. (KAH)
February 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #2 Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. The Clerk of Court is directed to withhold issuance of summons until further order of the Court. No service shall be made by the USM at this time. It is ordered that the plaintiff pay an initial partial filing fee of $$0.00 in accordance with 28 USC 1915. A copy of this order shall be sent to the plaintiff and to Centralized Inmate Banking. Filing Fee due by 3/4/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 2/11/2019. (KAH)
January 14, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis with Statement of Account by Timothy Bryant Charles. (EDC)
January 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Francis Abbott, James M. LeBlanc, Randall Robertson, Creshawnda Thompson, filed by Timothy Bryant Charles.(EDC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Charles v. Robertson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James M. LeBlanc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Creshawnda Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randall Robertson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Francis Abbott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy Bryant Charles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?