Action Industries, Inc. v. Allegheny Casualty Company et al
Plaintiff: Action Industries, Inc.
Defendant: UNIVERSAL INDUSTRIAL GASES, INC., Allegheny Casualty Company, Surety Bond Brokers of LA and Surety Bond Brokers of LA, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00043
Filed: January 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Richard L Bourgeois
Referring Judge: John W deGravelles
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 19, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Consent Rule 26(f)(2) Report Regarding the Parties' Rule 26(f) Conference by Allegheny Casualty Company (Lynch, Dylan)
March 18, 2019 Filing 16 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to #10 MOTION for More Definite Statement filed by Action Industries, Inc.. (Maley, Martin)
March 15, 2019 Filing 15 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to #9 MOTION to Remand filed by Allegheny Casualty Company. (Scharfenberg, Elliot)
March 12, 2019 Filing 14 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Surety Bond Brokers of LA, Inc. (Coleman, Joshua)
March 6, 2019 Filing 13 REPLY MEMORANDUM in Support of #2 MOTION for More Definite Statement filed by Allegheny Casualty Company. (Scharfenberg, Elliot) Modified on 3/6/2019 to edit the text (KAH).
March 4, 2019 Filing 12 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to #3 MOTION to Dismiss without Prejdice MOTION to Stay filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Gros, Marvin)
February 26, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Briefing Schedule on #10 MOTION for More Definite Statement : Opposition to the motion shall be filed within 21 days from the filing of the motion and shall not exceed 10 pages excluding attachments. The mover may file a reply brief within 14 days of the filing of the opposition and shall be limited to a total of 5 pages. No motion for leave will be required. Sur-Reply briefs will be permitted only with leave of Court for extraordinary reasons supported by sufficient facts. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.)(KDC)
February 25, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for More Definite Statement by Surety Bond Brokers of LA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)(Coleman, Joshua)
February 22, 2019 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #9 MOTION to Remand . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (SWE)
February 22, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Remand by Action Industries, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum In Support of Motion to Remand, #2 Plaintiff's Exhibits)(Gros, Marvin) Modified on 2/22/2019 to rotate exhibit pages (SWE).
February 20, 2019 Filing 8 First MEMORANDUM in Opposition to #2 MOTION for More Definite Statement filed by Action Industries, Inc.. (Maley, Martin)
February 19, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Briefing Schedule on #2 MOTION for More Definite Statement : Opposition to the motion shall be filed within 21 days from the filing of the motion and shall not exceed 10 pages excluding attachments. The mover may file a reply brief within 14 days of the filing of the opposition and shall be limited to a total of 5 pages. No motion for leave will be required. Sur-Reply briefs will be permitted only with leave of Court for extraordinary reasons supported by sufficient facts. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.)(KDC)
February 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 4/2/2019 at 11:15 AM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois Jr. Status Report due by 3/19/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 2/13/2019. (JSL)
February 12, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Briefing Schedule on #3 MOTION to Dismiss without Prejudice/ MOTION to Stay : Opposition to the motion shall be filed within 21 days from the filing of the motion and shall not exceed 10 pages excluding attachments. The mover may file a reply brief within 14 days of the filing of the opposition and shall be limited to a total of 5 pages. No motion for leave will be required. Sur-Reply briefs will be permitted only with leave of Court for extraordinary reasons supported by sufficient facts. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (KDC)
February 12, 2019 Filing 4 Exhibit(s) to #1 Notice of Removal, by Allegheny Casualty Company. (Scharfenberg, Elliot)
February 11, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to Dismiss; Alternatively, , MOTION to Stay by Universal Industrial Gases, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. UIG 2-Affidavit of HJ Strickland, #2 Memorandum in Support Memorandum In Support, #3 Exhibit EX UIG 1-Filed Complaint)(Anding, George) Modified on 2/11/2019 to edit the text (NLT).
January 30, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for More Definite Statement by Allegheny Casualty Company. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Memorandum in Support)(Scharfenberg, Elliot)
January 23, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 19th Judicial District Court for the Parish of East Baton Rouge, Case Number 677345. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAMDC-1890528), filed by Allegheny Casualty Company. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Petition for Declaratory Judgment, #3 Exhibit Affidavit of Mary Catherine Turner)(Scharfenberg, Elliot)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Action Industries, Inc. v. Allegheny Casualty Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNIVERSAL INDUSTRIAL GASES, INC.
Represented By: George K. Anding, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allegheny Casualty Company
Represented By: Elliot William Scharfenberg
Represented By: Dylan Dennis Lynch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Surety Bond Brokers of LA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Surety Bond Brokers of LA, Inc.
Represented By: David W. Carley
Represented By: David Carlyle Voss
Represented By: Edwin Allen Graves, Jr.
Represented By: Joshua Joseph Coleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Action Industries, Inc.
Represented By: Marvin Gros
Represented By: Martin K. Maley, Sr.
Represented By: Stacey Barnes Stephens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?