Brown v. Coca-Cola Company

Plaintiff: Marvin Brown
Defendant: Coca-Cola Company and Coca Cola Bottling Company United, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00096
Filed: February 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Brian A Jackson
Referring Judge: Erin Wilder-Doomes
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 19, 2019 Filing 9 Notice to Counsel: In light of all defendants having not made an appearance in this matter, good cause is shown to CONTINUE the Scheduling Conference to 6/27/2019 at 10:30 AM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes. Status Report due by 6/13/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (BLR)
March 4, 2019 Filing 8 Summons Not Issued: Counsel has requested issuance of a summons for Coca Cola Bottling Company United, Inc. The summons was not completely filled out. Therefore, summons will not be issued. (SWE)
February 28, 2019 Filing 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Coca Cola Bottling Company United, Inc., filed by Marvin Brown.(SWE)
February 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that the #4 Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint against Coca-Cola Company, filed by Plaintiff Marvin Brown, is GRANTED, as there is no Scheduling Order in place at this time, the Motion was filed thirteen days after Plaintiffs #1 original Complaint, defendant consents to the motion, leave shall be freely granted pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 15(a), and good grounds exist because Plaintiff seeks to amend to name the correct defendant. The clerk is directed to docket R. Doc. [4-1], which shall become the operative Complaint of Plaintiff in this matter. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 2/28/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (BLR)
February 27, 2019 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #4 MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (KAH)
February 26, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Submitted (Blackman, Natalie) Modified on 2/27/2019 to flatten document (KAH).
February 26, 2019 Filing 4 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint against Coca-Cola Company, filed by Marvin Brown. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading; Amended Complaint, #2 Proposed Pleading; Order)(Blackman, Natalie) Modified on 2/27/2019 to edit the event type (KAH).
February 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 4/18/2019 at 03:30 PM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes. Status Report due by 4/4/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 2/20/2019. (KAH)
February 13, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Not Issued: Counsel has requested issuance of a summons for CT Corporation System. The named person/entity is not reflected on the docket sheet as a party in the case and summons not filled out properly. Therefore, summons will not be issued. (KAH)
February 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Coca Cola Bottling Company United, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAMDC-1899990.), filed by Marvin Brown. (Attachments: #1 Attachment, #2 Attachment)(Blackman, Natalie) Modified on 2/13/2019 to flatten attachments (KAH).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brown v. Coca-Cola Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Coca-Cola Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Coca Cola Bottling Company United, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marvin Brown
Represented By: Natalie Shalane Blackman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?