Fairchild v. Wilkinson et al
Plaintiff: Shawn Fairchild
Defendant: Brandon M. Wilkinson, Beckman Coulter, Inc. and Ace American Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2019cv00098
Filed: February 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Richard L Bourgeois
Referring Judge: Shelly D Dick
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 5, 2019 Filing 10 Notice Setting Trial and Related Deadlines: Jury Trial set for 8/17/2020 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3 before Chief Judge Shelly D. Dick. Pretrial Conference set for 8/4/2020 at 10:30 AM in chambers before Chief Judge Shelly D. Dick. Affidavit of Settlement Efforts due by 7/6/2020. All other Trial deadlines are set as stated in the attached Notice. Signed by Chief Judge Shelly D. Dick on 4/5/19. (BKA)
April 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SCHEDULING ORDER: The Scheduling Conference set for 4/11/2019 is CANCELLED. In accordance with FRCP 16(b), the following discovery deadlines are established. Amended Pleadings due by 5/1/2019. Discovery due by 12/2/2019. Plaintiff`s Expert Witness List due by 8/1/2019. Defendant`s Expert Witness List due by 9/3/2019. Plaintiff`s Expert Reports due by 9/3/2019. Defendant`s Expert Reports due by 10/1/2019. Discovery from Experts due by 12/2/2019. Motions shall be filed by 12/16/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 4/4/2019. (SGO)
April 4, 2019 Filing 8 Joint STATUS REPORT by Shawn Fairchild. (Murphy, John)
April 3, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Shawn Fairchild. Brandon M. Wilkinson served on 3/23/2019, answer due 4/15/2019. (Murphy, John)
March 27, 2019 Filing 6 Joint STATUS REPORT by Shawn Fairchild. (Murphy, John)
March 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 4/11/2019 at 10:45 AM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois Jr. Status Report due by 3/28/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 3/4/2019. (JSL)
March 1, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Brandon M. Wilkinson. (NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve both the summons and all attachments in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4.) (NLT)
March 1, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Submitted (Murphy, John) (Main Document 3 replaced on 3/1/2019 to flatten the image) (NLT).
February 20, 2019 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Ace American Insurance Company, Beckman Coulter, Inc..(King, James)
February 13, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 21st JDC-Livingston Parish, Case Number 161573-D. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number CLAMDC-1900468), filed by ACE American Insurance Company, Beckman Coulter, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(King, James) Modified on 2/13/2019 to edit the text (NLT).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fairchild v. Wilkinson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brandon M. Wilkinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beckman Coulter, Inc.
Represented By: Lee Morgan Peacocke
Represented By: James Vance King, III
Represented By: Jennifer E. Michel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ace American Insurance Company
Represented By: Lee Morgan Peacocke
Represented By: James Vance King, III
Represented By: Jennifer E. Michel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shawn Fairchild
Represented By: John Gregory Murphy
Represented By: Richard F. Zimmerman, III
Represented By: Chet G. Boudreaux
Represented By: Charles Chadwick Boykin
Represented By: Brad R. Matthews
Represented By: Douglas K. Foster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?