Garnett v. USAA General Indemnity Company
Plaintiff: Anthony Garnett
Defendant: USAA General Indemnity Company
Case Number: 3:2019cv00099
Filed: February 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Richard L Bourgeois
Referring Judge: Brian A Jackson
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SCHEDULING ORDER: In accordance with FRCP 16(b), the following discovery deadlines are established. Amended Pleadings due by 5/1/2019. F.R.C.P. 26(a)(1) disclosures due by 4/12/2019. Discovery due by 2/3/2020. Plaintiff`s Expert Witness List due by 10/1/2019. Defendant`s Expert Witness List due by 11/1/2019. Plaintiff`s Expert Reports due by 12/2/2019. Defendant`s Expert Reports due by 1/2/2020. Discovery from Experts due by 4/1/2020. Motions shall be filed by 6/15/2020. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 10/5/2020. Pretrial Conference set for 10/29/2020 at 01:30 PM in chambers before Judge Brian A. Jackson. Motions In Limine shall be filed by 11/9/2020. Affidavit of Settlement Efforts due by 11/23/2020. Joint jury instructions, voir dire, verdict forms, and trial briefs due by 11/30/2020. Jury Trial set for 12/14/2020 to as/16/2020 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 2 before Judge Brian A. Jackson. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 4/11/2019. (SWE)
April 10, 2019 Filing 6 Notice to Counsel: The Scheduling Conference set for 4/11/2019 at 10:15 AM is CANCELLED. The Court shall issue a separate scheduling order. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (SGO)
April 10, 2019 Filing 5 Amended STATUS REPORT by Anthony Garnett. (Matthews, Brad)
March 28, 2019 Filing 4 STATUS REPORT by Anthony Garnett. (Matthews, Brad)
March 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 4/11/2019 at 10:15 AM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois Jr. Status Report due by 3/28/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 3/4/2019. (JSL)
February 24, 2019 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by USAA General Indemnity Company.(Thompson, Michael)
February 15, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 18th Judicial District Court, Parish of West Baton Rouge, Case Number 44,961. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number BLAMDC-1901530), filed by USAA General Indemnity Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet)(Thompson, Michael) (Attachment 2 replaced on 2/15/2019 to correct the page orientation) (NLT).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Garnett v. USAA General Indemnity Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USAA General Indemnity Company
Represented By: Michael Mann Thompson
Represented By: Marvin Huber Olinde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Garnett
Represented By: Brad R. Matthews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?