Broadcast Music, Inc. et al v. Coco Bongo Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Broadcast Music, Inc., Hip City Music Inc., Hifrost Publishing, Interior Music Corp., Springtime Music, Inc., Dynatone Publishing Company, Amazement Music and Unichappell Music Inc.
Defendant: Coco Bongo Inc., Lloyd Ruffins and Ruffins Downtown Daiquiri Lounge
Case Number: 3:2019cv00106
Filed: February 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Brian A Jackson
Referring Judge: Erin Wilder-Doomes
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER finding as moot #10 Motion to Continue Scheduling Conference in light of the Notice to Counsel (R. Doc. 11). Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 4/3/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (BLR)
April 3, 2019 Filing 11 Notice to Counsel: In light of all defendants having not made an appearance in the matter, the Scheduling Conference is reset for 5/23/2019 at 10:00 AM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes. Status Report due by 5/9/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.)(BLR)
April 3, 2019 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #10 MOTION to Continue Scheduling Conference . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (ELW)
April 2, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Continue Scheduling Conference by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 proposed order)(Balkin, Mark)
March 25, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed: Coco Bongo Inc. served on 3/18/2019, answer due 4/8/2019; Lloyd Ruffins served on 3/18/2019, answer due 4/8/2019. (Attachments: #1 Ruffins Summons)(Balkin, Mark) Modified to edit text on 4/3/2019 (BLR).
February 20, 2019 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Coco Bongo Inc., Lloyd Ruffins. (NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve both the summons and all attachments in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4.) (KAH)
February 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 4/18/2019 at 09:30 AM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes. Status Report due by 4/4/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 2/20/2019. (KAH)
February 20, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Submitted (Attachments: #1 corrected summons)(Balkin, Mark)
February 19, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action or Appeal Regarding a Copyright. (KAH)
February 19, 2019 Filing 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Interior Music Corp., Amazement Music, Hip City Music Inc., Dynatone Publishing Company, Hifrost Publishing, Broadcast Music, Inc., Unichappell Music Inc., Springtime Music, Inc..(Balkin, Mark)
February 19, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Coco Bongo Inc. (NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve both the summons and all attachments in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4.) (KAH)
February 18, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Amazement Music, Broadcast Music, Inc., Dynatone Publishing Company, Hifrost Publishing, Hip City Music Inc., Interior Music Corp., Springtime Music, Inc., Unichappell Music Inc. identifying Corporate Parent TEGNA, Inc. for Broadcast Music, Inc.; Corporate Parent Jadar Music Corporation for Dynatone Publishing Company; Corporate Parent Warner Music Group Corp. for Unichappell Music Inc... (Balkin, Mark)
February 18, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAMDC-1901896.), filed by Interior Music Corp., Amazement Music, Hip City Music Inc., Dynatone Publishing Company, Hifrost Publishing, Broadcast Music, Inc., Unichappell Music Inc., Springtime Music, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Attachment Summons (Coco Bongo), #3 Attachment Summons (Ruffins))(Balkin, Mark) Modified on 2/19/2019 to flatten the attachments (KAH).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Broadcast Music, Inc. et al v. Coco Bongo Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Broadcast Music, Inc.
Represented By: Mark Allen Balkin
Represented By: Joseph C. Chautin, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hip City Music Inc.
Represented By: Mark Allen Balkin
Represented By: Joseph C. Chautin, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hifrost Publishing
Represented By: Mark Allen Balkin
Represented By: Joseph C. Chautin, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Interior Music Corp.
Represented By: Mark Allen Balkin
Represented By: Joseph C. Chautin, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Springtime Music, Inc.
Represented By: Mark Allen Balkin
Represented By: Joseph C. Chautin, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dynatone Publishing Company
Represented By: Mark Allen Balkin
Represented By: Joseph C. Chautin, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amazement Music
Represented By: Mark Allen Balkin
Represented By: Joseph C. Chautin, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Unichappell Music Inc.
Represented By: Mark Allen Balkin
Represented By: Joseph C. Chautin, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Coco Bongo Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lloyd Ruffins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ruffins Downtown Daiquiri Lounge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?