Hicks v. Department of Public Safety & Corrections et al
Plaintiff: Ellis Ray Hicks
Defendant: Does 1-10, Department of Public Safety & Corrections, Terry Lawson and James M. LeBlanc
Case Number: 3:2019cv00108
Filed: February 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Richard L Bourgeois
Referring Judge: Shelly D Dick
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 20, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 8, 2019 Filing 10 Notice Setting Trial and Related Deadlines: Jury Trial set for 1/25/2021 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3 before Chief Judge Shelly D. Dick. Pretrial Conference set for 1/12/2021 at 02:30 PM in chambers before Chief Judge Shelly D. Dick. Affidavit of Settlement Efforts due by 12/14/2020. All other Trial deadlines are set as stated in the attached Notice. Signed by Chief Judge Shelly D. Dick on 4/8/19. (BKA)
April 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SCHEDULING ORDER: The Scheduling Conference set for 4/18/2019 is CANCELLED. In accordance with FRCP 16(b), the following discovery deadlines are established. Amended Pleadings due by 6/7/2019. F.R.C.P. 26(a)(1) disclosures due by 4/11/2019. Discovery due by 12/20/2019. Plaintiff`s Expert Witness List due by 12/31/2019. Defendant`s Expert Witness List due by 1/31/2020. Plaintiff`s Expert Reports due by 1/31/2020. Defendant`s Expert Reports due by 2/28/2020. Discovery from Experts due by 3/31/2020. Motions shall be filed by 4/30/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 4/8/2019. (SGO) Modified on 4/8/2019 to correct typo (SGO).
April 4, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Department of Public Safety & Corrections, Terry Lawson, James M. LeBlanc.(Wheeler, Jeffery)
April 3, 2019 Filing 7 Joint STATUS REPORT by Department of Public Safety & Corrections, Terry Lawson, James M. LeBlanc. (Wheeler, Jeffery)
March 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 4/18/2019 at 10:15 AM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois Jr. Status Report due by 4/4/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 3/4/2019. (JSL)
March 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #4 Second MOTION to Substitute Notice of Removal filed by Department of Public Safety & Corrections, Terry Lawson, James M. LeBlanc. The Notice of Removal (R. Doc. 1 at 1-4) shall be substituted with the corrected Notice of Removal (R. Doc. 4-2). Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 3/1/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (JSL)
February 27, 2019 Filing 4 Second MOTION to Substitute Notice of Removal by Department of Public Safety & Corrections, Terry Lawson, James M. LeBlanc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading;, #2 Exhibit)(Wheeler, Jeffery)
February 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER denying #2 MOTION to Substitute Notice of Removal filed by Department of Public Safety & Corrections, Terry Lawson, James M. LeBlanc, as the corrected Notice of Removal was not submitted with the motion to substitute. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 2/27/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (JSL)
February 27, 2019 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #4 Second MOTION to Substitute Notice of Removal . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (NLT)
February 20, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION to Substitute Notice of Removal by Department of Public Safety & Corrections, Terry Lawson, James M. LeBlanc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading;)(Wheeler, Jeffery)
February 20, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 19th Judicial Court, Case Number 677119. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAMDC-1902556), filed by Terry Lawson, James M. LeBlanc, Department of Public Safety & Corrections. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit)(Wheeler, Jeffery)(SWE). Modified on 2/20/2019 to flatten civil cover sheet (SWE). Modified on 3/4/2019 to substitute removal as per Order #5 (LLH).
February 20, 2019 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #2 MOTION to Substitute Notice of Removal . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (NLT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hicks v. Department of Public Safety & Corrections et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Public Safety & Corrections
Represented By: Jeffery A Wheeler, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terry Lawson
Represented By: Jeffery A Wheeler, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James M. LeBlanc
Represented By: Jeffery A Wheeler, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ellis Ray Hicks
Represented By: William Brock Most
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?