Pruco Life Insurance Company v. TT&H Warehouse Co., Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Pruco Life Insurance Company
Defendant: Christina Teekel and TT&H Warehouse Co., Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00125
Filed: February 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Richard L Bourgeois
Referring Judge: John W deGravelles
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 22, 2019 Filing 19 STATUS REPORT by Pruco Life Insurance Company. (Baer, Andrew)
April 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #17 Motion for Extension of Time Within Which to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(f) Conference. The parties are granted an extension until 5/9/2019 to hold their Rule 26(f) conference. The deadline to file the Joint Status Report has been reset to 5/16/2019, and the Scheduling Conference has been reset for 5/30/2019 at 10:00 AM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois Jr. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 4/11/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (JSL)
April 11, 2019 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #17 MOTION for Extension of Time to Hold Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(f) Scheduling Conference. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (ELW)
April 11, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION for Extension of Time to Hold Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(f) Scheduling Conference by Pruco Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Order)(Burnthorn, Judy)
March 22, 2019 Filing 16 Notice to Counsel: In view of the waivers of service filed (R. Docs. 12, 13), indicating answers are due 5/6/19 and 5/14/19, the Scheduling Conference set for 5/2/2019 is RESET for 5/30/2019 at 10:00 AM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois Jr. Deadline to file the Joint Status Report is reset to 5/16/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (JSL)
March 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #14 MOTION to Substitute Letter Sized Waiver of Service for Legal Sized Waiver of Service filed by Pruco Life Insurance Company. The legal sized waiver of service (R. Doc. 13) shall be substituted with the letter sized waiver of service (R. Doc. 14-2). Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 3/22/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (JSL)
March 21, 2019 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #14 MOTION to Substitute Waiver of the Service of Summons . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (ELW)
March 19, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION to Substitute Waiver of the Service of Summons by Pruco Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Attachment proposed Order, #2 Proposed Pleading; Waiver of the Service of Summons)(Burnthorn, Judy)
March 18, 2019 Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Pruco Life Insurance Company. Christina Teekel waiver sent on 3/15/2019, answer due 5/14/2019. (Burnthorn, Judy)
March 7, 2019 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Pruco Life Insurance Company. TT&H Warehouse Co., Inc. waiver sent on 3/6/2019, answer due 5/6/2019. (Burnthorn, Judy)
March 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 5/2/2019 at 10:00 AM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois Jr. Status Report due by 4/18/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 3/4/2019. (JSL)
March 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER finding as moot #5 Motion for Issuance of Summons, as the Clerk has issued summons. Summons were issued 3/1/2019 to TT&H Warehouse Co. Inc. and Christina Teekel as Succession Representative of the Estate of Rodney Y. Teekel, Deceased. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 3/4/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (JSL)
March 1, 2019 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to TT&H Warehouse Co., Inc.. (NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve both the summons and all attachments in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4.) (SWE)
March 1, 2019 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Christina Teekel. (NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve both the summons and all attachments in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4.) (SWE)
February 28, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Submitted (Burnthorn, Judy)
February 28, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Submitted (Burnthorn, Judy)
February 28, 2019 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #5 MOTION for Issuance of Summons . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (SWE)
February 28, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Issuance of Summons by Pruco Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Summons in a Civil Action, #2 Attachment Summons in a Civil Action, #3 Proposed Pleading; proposed Order)(Burnthorn, Judy) Modified on 3/4/2019 to flatten document (SWE).
February 27, 2019 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Pruco Life Insurance Company. (Burnthorn, Judy)
February 27, 2019 Filing 3 Letter to Attorney Judy L. Burnthorn regarding Matthew T. Biggers who is Co-Counsel for party Pruco Life Insurance Company. Attorney is not admitted to practice in LAMD. (SWE) Modified on 2/27/2019 to replace document with flattened signature (SWE).
February 27, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Not Issued: Counsel has requested issuance of a summons. The summons attached were blank; therefore, summons will not be issued. (SWE)
February 26, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT in Interpleader against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAMDC-1905227.), filed by Pruco Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit Exhibit I, #10 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet, #11 Attachment Summons - TT&H, #12 Attachment Summons - Christina Teekel)(Burnthorn, Judy) (SWE). Modified on 2/27/2019 to remove blank pages (SWE). Modified on 2/27/2019 to flatten pages(SWE).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pruco Life Insurance Company v. TT&H Warehouse Co., Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christina Teekel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TT&H Warehouse Co., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pruco Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Judy L. Burnthorn
Represented By: Andrew Joseph Baer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?