Chem-Spray South, Inc. v. Global Energy Services, Inc.
Plaintiff: Chem-Spray South, Inc.
Defendant: Global Energy Services, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00133
Filed: March 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: John W deGravelles
Referring Judge: Erin Wilder-Doomes
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1330
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 29, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Global Energy Services, Inc. by Chem-Spray South, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Charles Deville, #2 Exhibit to Affidavit of Charles Deville, #3 Affidavit of Carroll Devillier Jr. as to Attorney Fees)(Devillier, Carroll)
April 8, 2019 Filing 8 CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Global Energy Services, Inc. (SWE)
April 5, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Clerks Entry of Default as to Global Energy Services, Inc. by Chem-Spray South, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit for Entry of Default, #2 Proposed Pleading; Order)(Devillier, Carroll)
March 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 5/16/2019 at 11:00 AM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes. Status Report due by 5/2/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 3/27/2019. (KAH)
March 19, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Chem-Spray South, Inc.. Global Energy Services, Inc. served on 3/11/2019, answer due 4/1/2019. (Devillier, Carroll)
March 1, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Global Energy Services, Inc.. (NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve both the summons and all attachments in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4.) (SWE)
March 1, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Submitted (Devillier, Carroll) Modified on 3/4/2019 to flatten document (SWE).
March 1, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Not Issued: Counsel has requested issuance of a summons for Global Energy Services, Inc. The summons was not completely filled out. Therefore, summons will not be issued. (SWE)
March 1, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Global Energy Services, Inc., filed by Chem-Spray South, Inc.(Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAMDC-1907220.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Attachment Summons) Receipt No. LAMDC-1907220 $400 (Devillier, Carroll) Modified on 3/1/2019 to flatten cover sheet (SWE). Modified on 3/4/2019 to flatten summons (SWE).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chem-Spray South, Inc. v. Global Energy Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Global Energy Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chem-Spray South, Inc.
Represented By: Jude C. Bursavich
Represented By: Carroll Devillier, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?