Lillie et al v. Stanford Trust Company, et al
Plaintiff: Fred Demarest, Kenneth Wilkewitz, William Bruce Johnson, Margaret S Nix, Claudia O'Rear, Ronald McMorris, Charles White, Laura Lee, Charles Hart, Martha Jean Witmer, Terry Tullis, Kathleen Mier, Rodney P Starkey, Robert Smith, Charlie L Massey, Claude Marquette, Marcel Dumestre, Dennis Kirby, Sharon Witmer, Gwen Fabre, Virginia Buscheme, Linda Boyd, James Roland, Clyde J Chisholm, Lonnie Ordoyne, Olivia Sue Warnock, Ronald R Marston, Larry Smith, Bobby Nix, Louis Mier, Lynn J. Phillipe, Jacqueline Millett, Walter Stone, John Buscheme, Robert Bush, Mamie Sanchez, Julie Savoy, Kerry Kling, Jerry Burris, Thomas Slaughter, Darrell Courville, James Stegall, Lisa Scrantz, Margaret Dumestre, Jeanne Anne Mayhall, Michael J Giambrone, Kendall Forbes, William Dawson, Virginia McMorris, James Brown, Richard Feucht, Arthur Ordoyne, Troy Lillie, Susan Roland, Ira Causey, Kenneth Doughtery, Murphy Buell, Nancy Gill, Anita Ellen Carter, Willa Mae Gildersleeve, Wanda Bevis, Joseph Chustz, Jr., Monty Perkins, Larry Perkins, Deborah S Forbes, Thomas E Bowden, Charles Sanchez, Gary Magee, Leah Farr, Terry Tarver, Lynn Gildersleeve Michelli, Gordon C Gill, Robert Gildersleeve, John Wade, Ralph D D'Amore, Bille Ruth McMorris, Merrill Laplante, Mamie Baumann, Robert Schwendimann, Joan Feucht, Benny O'Rear, Stephen Wilson, Carol Stegall, Anthony Ventrella, Arthur Waxley, Daniel P Landry, Ronald Valentine, Terence Beven, MD and William Phillips
Defendant: Continental Casualty Company, Arch Insurance Company, Endurance Specialty Insurance Ltd, SEI Investments Company, Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's of London, Stanford Trust Company, Allied World Assurance Company (U.S.), Inc., Nutmeg Insurance Company, Indian Harbor Insurance Company, SEI Private Trust Company and Office of Financial Institutions State of Louisiana
Undetermined: Robert C Ahders
Case Number: 3:2019cv00138
Filed: March 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Richard L Bourgeois
Referring Judge: Shelly D Dick
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 8, 2019 Case Assigned to Chief Judge Shelly D. Dick and Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (SWE)
March 8, 2019 Filing 279 Case transferred in from the Texas Northern; Case Number 3:13-cv-03127. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
February 27, 2019 Filing 278 NOTICE of Adoption of Plaintiffs' Request for Designation of Contents of Record for Remand to US District Court, Middle District of Louisiana re: #277 Stipulation/Designation of Record for MDL Case Remand filed by Allied World Assurance Company (US) Inc, Arch Insurance Company, Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's of London, Continental Casualty Company, Indian Harbor Insurance Company, Nutmeg Insurance Company, SEI Investments Company, SEI Private Trust Company (Ashby, Danny) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 3/8/2019.]
February 12, 2019 Filing 277 Stipulation/Designation of Record for MDL Case Remand (Plaintiffs') filed by Mamie Baumann, Terence Beven, MD, Wanda Bevis, Thomas E Bowden, Linda Boyd, James Brown, Murphy Buell, Jerry Burris, John Buscheme, Virginia Buscheme, Robert Bush, Anita Ellen Carter, Ira Causey, Clyde J Chisholm, Joseph Chustz, Jr., Darrell Courville, Ralph D D'Amore, William Dawson, Fred Demarest, Kenneth Doughtery, Marcel Dumestre, Margaret Dumestre, Gwen Fabre, Leah Farr, Joan Feucht, Richard Feucht, Deborah S Forbes, Kendall Forbes, Michael J Giambrone, Robert Gildersleeve, Willa Mae Gildersleeve, Gordon C Gill, Nancy Gill, Charles Hart, William Bruce Johnson, Dennis Kirby, Kerry Kling, Daniel P Landry, Merrill Laplante, Laura Lee, Troy Lillie, Gary Magee, Claude Marquette, Ronald R Marston, Charlie L Massey, Jeanne Anne Mayhall, Bille Ruth McMorris, Ronald McMorris, Virginia McMorris, Lynn Gildersleeve Michelli, Kathleen Mier, Louis Mier, Jacqueline Millett, Bobby Nix, Margaret S Nix, Benny O'Rear, Claudia O'Rear, Arthur Ordoyne, Lonnie Ordoyne, Larry Perkins, Monty Perkins, Lynn J. Phillipe, William Phillips, James Roland, Susan Roland, Charles Sanchez, Mamie Sanchez, Julie Savoy, Robert Schwendimann, Lisa Scrantz, Thomas Slaughter, Larry Smith, Robert Smith, Rodney P Starkey, Carol Stegall, James Stegall, Walter Stone, Terry Tarver, Terry Tullis, Ronald Valentine, Anthony Ventrella, John Wade, Olivia Sue Warnock, Arthur Waxley, Charles White, Kenneth Wilkewitz, Stephen Wilson, Martha Jean Witmer, Sharon Witmer (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1, #2 Exhibit(s) A) (Preis, Phillip) Modified on 2/13/2019 (twd). [Transferred from Texas Northern on 3/8/2019.]
January 31, 2019 Filing 276 ***PLEASE DISREGARD- duplicate entry*** CONDITIONAL REMAND ORDER: The JPML has issued the attached order transferring one or more cases to the NDTX in MDL 2099, and that order has now been filed in the NDTX. Upon receipt of this NEF, each transferor court should enter this order, which has been certified as required, in each affected action and effect transfer without delay. Please do not close the case before transfer (if possible) but do include in the extraction function Remarks field the MDL number, title of this order, and a contact name. (If this court should use a different contact to request a future MDL-related transfer, please notify us at InterdistrictTransfer_TXND@txnd.uscourts.gov.) (epm) Modified on 1/31/2019 (epm). [Transferred from Texas Northern on 3/8/2019.]
January 31, 2019 Civil Case Terminated per #275 Conditional Remand Order. (twd) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 3/8/2019.]
January 31, 2019 Filing 275 CONDITIONAL REMAND ORDER: It is ORDERED that the action(s) on this conditional remand order be remanded to its/their respective transferor court(s). It is further ordered that, pursuant to Rule 10.4(a) of the Rules of Procedure of the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, the parties shall furnish the Clerk for the Northern District of Texas with a stipulation or designation of the contents of the record to be remanded. (Clerk's note: To docket the stipulation, please use the Stipulation/Designation of Record for MDL Case Remand event. (twd). [Transferred from Texas Northern on 3/8/2019.]
January 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 274 SUGGESTION OF REMAND TO THE MIDDLE DISTRICT OF LOUISIANA: The Court respectfully recommends the Panel that the Lille and Adhers cases be remanded to the transferor court. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 1/17/2019) (axm) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 3/8/2019.]
November 12, 2018 Filing 273 NOTICE of Requests for Production of Documents to SEI Investments Company and SEI Private Trust Company filed by Mamie Baumann, Terence Beven, MD, Wanda Bevis, Thomas E Bowden, Linda Boyd, James Brown, Murphy Buell, Jerry Burris, John Buscheme, Virginia Buscheme, Robert Bush, Anita Ellen Carter, Ira Causey, Clyde J Chisholm, Joseph Chustz, Jr., Darrell Courville, Ralph D D'Amore, William Dawson, Fred Demarest, Kenneth Doughtery, Marcel Dumestre, Margaret Dumestre, Gwen Fabre, Leah Farr, Joan Feucht, Richard Feucht, Deborah S Forbes, Kendall Forbes, Michael J Giambrone, Robert Gildersleeve, Willa Mae Gildersleeve, Gordon C Gill, Nancy Gill, Charles Hart, William Bruce Johnson, Dennis Kirby, Kerry Kling, Daniel P Landry, Merrill Laplante, Laura Lee, Troy Lillie, Gary Magee, Claude Marquette, Ronald R Marston, Charlie L Massey, Jeanne Anne Mayhall, Bille Ruth McMorris, Ronald McMorris, Virginia McMorris, Lynn Gildersleeve Michelli, Kathleen Mier, Louis Mier, Jacqueline Millett, Bobby Nix, Margaret S Nix, Benny O'Rear, Claudia O'Rear, Arthur Ordoyne, Lonnie Ordoyne, Larry Perkins, Monty Perkins, Lynn J. Phillipe, William Phillips, James Roland, Susan Roland, Charles Sanchez, Mamie Sanchez, Julie Savoy, Robert Schwendimann, Lisa Scrantz, Thomas Slaughter, Larry Smith, Robert Smith, Rodney P Starkey, Carol Stegall, James Stegall, Walter Stone, Terry Tarver, Terry Tullis, Ronald Valentine, Anthony Ventrella, John Wade, Olivia Sue Warnock, Arthur Waxley, Charles White, Kenneth Wilkewitz, Stephen Wilson, Martha Jean Witmer, Sharon Witmer (Preis, Phillip) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 3/8/2019.]
November 8, 2018 Filing 272 REPLY filed by Mamie Baumann, Terence Beven, MD, Wanda Bevis, Thomas E Bowden, Linda Boyd, James Brown, Murphy Buell, Jerry Burris, John Buscheme, Virginia Buscheme, Robert Bush, Anita Ellen Carter, Ira Causey, Clyde J Chisholm, Joseph Chustz, Jr., Darrell Courville, Ralph D D'Amore, William Dawson, Fred Demarest, Kenneth Doughtery, Marcel Dumestre, Margaret Dumestre, Gwen Fabre, Leah Farr, Joan Feucht, Richard Feucht, Deborah S Forbes, Kendall Forbes, Michael J Giambrone, Robert Gildersleeve, Willa Mae Gildersleeve, Gordon C Gill, Nancy Gill, Charles Hart, William Bruce Johnson, Dennis Kirby, Kerry Kling, Daniel P Landry, Merrill Laplante, Laura Lee, Troy Lillie, Gary Magee, Claude Marquette, Ronald R Marston, Charlie L Massey, Jeanne Anne Mayhall, Bille Ruth McMorris, Ronald McMorris, Virginia McMorris, Lynn Gildersleeve Michelli, Kathleen Mier, Louis Mier, Jacqueline Millett, Bobby Nix, Margaret S Nix, Benny O'Rear, Claudia O'Rear, Arthur Ordoyne, Lonnie Ordoyne, Larry Perkins, Monty Perkins, Lynn J. Phillipe, William Phillips, James Roland, Susan Roland, Charles Sanchez, Mamie Sanchez, Julie Savoy, Robert Schwendimann, Lisa Scrantz, Thomas Slaughter, Larry Smith, Robert Smith, Rodney P Starkey, Carol Stegall, James Stegall, Walter Stone, Terry Tarver, Terry Tullis, Ronald Valentine, Anthony Ventrella, John Wade, Olivia Sue Warnock, Arthur Waxley, Charles White, Kenneth Wilkewitz, Stephen Wilson, Martha Jean Witmer, Sharon Witmer re: #263 MOTION for Dismissal of the Summary Judgment File by SEI (ECF 249) Or In The Alternative, Motion to Obtain A Continuance Under Rule 56(D) Until Discovery Is Commenced And Substantially Completed (Preis, Phillip) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 3/8/2019.]
October 30, 2018 Filing 271 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance (Laster and Dietel) filed by SEI Investments Company, SEI Private Trust Company (Ashby, Danny) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 3/8/2019.]
October 29, 2018 Filing 270 Appendix in Support filed by SEI Investments Company, SEI Private Trust Company re #269 Response/Objection, (Attachments: #1 Declaration(s) with Exhibits A-M) (Ashby, Danny) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 3/8/2019.]
October 29, 2018 Filing 269 RESPONSE AND OBJECTION filed by SEI Investments Company, SEI Private Trust Company re: #263 MOTION for Dismissal of the Summary Judgment File by SEI (ECF 249) Or In The Alternative, Motion to Obtain A Continuance Under Rule 56(D) Until Discovery Is Commenced And Substantially Completed (Ashby, Danny) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 3/8/2019.]
October 29, 2018 Filing 268 REPLY filed by SEI Investments Company, SEI Private Trust Company re: #249 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Ashby, Danny) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 3/8/2019.]
October 15, 2018 Filing 264 Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Mamie Baumann, Terence Beven, MD, Wanda Bevis, Thomas E Bowden, Linda Boyd, James Brown, Murphy Buell, Jerry Burris, John Buscheme, Virginia Buscheme, Robert Bush, Anita Ellen Carter, Ira Causey, Clyde J Chisholm, Joseph Chustz, Jr., Darrell Courville, Ralph D D'Amore, William Dawson, Fred Demarest, Kenneth Doughtery, Marcel Dumestre, Margaret Dumestre, Gwen Fabre, Leah Farr, Joan Feucht, Richard Feucht, Deborah S Forbes, Kendall Forbes, Michael J Giambrone, Robert Gildersleeve, Willa Mae Gildersleeve, Gordon C Gill, Nancy Gill, Charles Hart, William Bruce Johnson, Dennis Kirby, Kerry Kling, Daniel P Landry, Merrill Laplante, Laura Lee, Troy Lillie, Gary Magee, Claude Marquette, Ronald R Marston, Charlie L Massey, Jeanne Anne Mayhall, Bille Ruth McMorris, Ronald McMorris, Virginia McMorris, Lynn Gildersleeve Michelli, Kathleen Mier, Louis Mier, Jacqueline Millett, Bobby Nix, Margaret S Nix, Benny O'Rear, Claudia O'Rear, Arthur Ordoyne, Lonnie Ordoyne, Larry Perkins, Monty Perkins, Lynn J. Phillipe, William Phillips, James Roland, Susan Roland, Charles Sanchez, Mamie Sanchez, Julie Savoy, Robert Schwendimann, Lisa Scrantz, Thomas Slaughter, Larry Smith, Robert Smith, Rodney P Starkey, Carol Stegall, James Stegall, Walter Stone, Terry Tarver, Terry Tullis, Ronald Valentine, Anthony Ventrella, John Wade, Olivia Sue Warnock, Arthur Waxley, Charles White, Kenneth Wilkewitz, Stephen Wilson, Martha Jean Witmer, Sharon Witmer re #263 MOTION for Dismissal of the Summary Judgment File by SEI (ECF 249) Or In The Alternative, Motion to Obtain A Continuance Under Rule 56(D) Until Discovery Is Commenced And Substantially Completed (Preis, Phillip) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 3/8/2019.]
October 15, 2018 Filing 263 MOTION for Dismissal of the Summary Judgment File by SEI (ECF 249) Or In The Alternative, Motion to Obtain A Continuance Under Rule 56(D) Until Discovery Is Commenced And Substantially Completed filed by Mamie Baumann, Terence Beven, MD, Wanda Bevis, Thomas E Bowden, Linda Boyd, James Brown, Murphy Buell, Jerry Burris, John Buscheme, Virginia Buscheme, Robert Bush, Anita Ellen Carter, Ira Causey, Clyde J Chisholm, Joseph Chustz, Jr., Darrell Courville, Ralph D D'Amore, William Dawson, Fred Demarest, Kenneth Doughtery, Marcel Dumestre, Margaret Dumestre, Gwen Fabre, Leah Farr, Joan Feucht, Richard Feucht, Deborah S Forbes, Kendall Forbes, Michael J Giambrone, Robert Gildersleeve, Willa Mae Gildersleeve, Gordon C Gill, Nancy Gill, Charles Hart, William Bruce Johnson, Dennis Kirby, Kerry Kling, Daniel P Landry, Merrill Laplante, Laura Lee, Troy Lillie, Gary Magee, Claude Marquette, Ronald R Marston, Charlie L Massey, Jeanne Anne Mayhall, Bille Ruth McMorris, Ronald McMorris, Virginia McMorris, Lynn Gildersleeve Michelli, Kathleen Mier, Louis Mier, Jacqueline Millett, Bobby Nix, Margaret S Nix, Benny O'Rear, Claudia O'Rear, Arthur Ordoyne, Lonnie Ordoyne, Larry Perkins, Monty Perkins, Lynn J. Phillipe, William Phillips, James Roland, Susan Roland, Charles Sanchez, Mamie Sanchez, Julie Savoy, Robert Schwendimann, Lisa Scrantz, Thomas Slaughter, Larry Smith, Robert Smith, Rodney P Starkey, Carol Stegall, James Stegall, Walter Stone, Terry Tarver, Terry Tullis, Ronald Valentine, Anthony Ventrella, John Wade, Olivia Sue Warnock, Arthur Waxley, Charles White, Kenneth Wilkewitz, Stephen Wilson, Martha Jean Witmer, Sharon Witmer (Attachments: #1 Declaration(s) Declaration of Phillip W. Preis in Support of Motion for Dismissal of the Summary Judgment filed by SEI (ECF 261) Or In The Alternative, To Obtain a Continuance Under Rule 56(D) Until Discover Is Commenced And Substantially Completed, #2 Proposed Order Order) (Preis, Phillip) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 3/8/2019.]
October 15, 2018 Filing 262 Appendix in Support filed by Mamie Baumann, Terence Beven, MD, Wanda Bevis, Thomas E Bowden, Linda Boyd, James Brown, Murphy Buell, Jerry Burris, John Buscheme, Virginia Buscheme, Robert Bush, Anita Ellen Carter, Ira Causey, Clyde J Chisholm, Joseph Chustz, Jr., Darrell Courville, Ralph D D'Amore, William Dawson, Fred Demarest, Kenneth Doughtery, Marcel Dumestre, Margaret Dumestre, Gwen Fabre, Leah Farr, Joan Feucht, Richard Feucht, Deborah S Forbes, Kendall Forbes, Michael J Giambrone, Robert Gildersleeve, Willa Mae Gildersleeve, Gordon C Gill, Nancy Gill, Charles Hart, William Bruce Johnson, Dennis Kirby, Kerry Kling, Daniel P Landry, Merrill Laplante, Laura Lee, Troy Lillie, Gary Magee, Claude Marquette, Ronald R Marston, Charlie L Massey, Jeanne Anne Mayhall, Bille Ruth McMorris, Ronald McMorris, Virginia McMorris, Lynn Gildersleeve Michelli, Kathleen Mier, Louis Mier, Jacqueline Millett, Bobby Nix, Margaret S Nix, Benny O'Rear, Claudia O'Rear, Arthur Ordoyne, Lonnie Ordoyne, Larry Perkins, Monty Perkins, Lynn J. Phillipe, William Phillips, James Roland, Susan Roland, Charles Sanchez, Mamie Sanchez, Julie Savoy, Robert Schwendimann, Lisa Scrantz, Thomas Slaughter, Larry Smith, Robert Smith, Rodney P Starkey, Carol Stegall, James Stegall, Walter Stone, Terry Tarver, Terry Tullis, Ronald Valentine, Anthony Ventrella, John Wade, Olivia Sue Warnock, Arthur Waxley, Charles White, Kenneth Wilkewitz, Stephen Wilson, Martha Jean Witmer, Sharon Witmer re #261 Brief/Memorandum in Support of Motion,,,,,,,, IRA Plaintiffs' Memorandum in Opposition to the Motion for Summary Judgment of SEI (ECF 249) and Motion for Dismissal of the Summary Judgment filed by SEI (ECF 249) Or In The Alternative, Motion to Obtain A Continuance Under Rule 56(D) Until Discovery Is Commenced And Substantially Completed (Preis, Phillip) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 3/8/2019.]
October 15, 2018 Filing 261 Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Mamie Baumann, Terence Beven, MD, Wanda Bevis, Thomas E Bowden, Linda Boyd, James Brown, Murphy Buell, Jerry Burris, John Buscheme, Virginia Buscheme, Robert Bush, Anita Ellen Carter, Ira Causey, Clyde J Chisholm, Joseph Chustz, Jr., Darrell Courville, Ralph D D'Amore, William Dawson, Fred Demarest, Kenneth Doughtery, Marcel Dumestre, Margaret Dumestre, Gwen Fabre, Leah Farr, Joan Feucht, Richard Feucht, Deborah S Forbes, Kendall Forbes, Michael J Giambrone, Robert Gildersleeve, Willa Mae Gildersleeve, Gordon C Gill, Nancy Gill, Charles Hart, William Bruce Johnson, Dennis Kirby, Kerry Kling, Daniel P Landry, Merrill Laplante, Laura Lee, Troy Lillie, Gary Magee, Claude Marquette, Ronald R Marston, Charlie L Massey, Jeanne Anne Mayhall, Bille Ruth McMorris, Ronald McMorris, Virginia McMorris, Lynn Gildersleeve Michelli, Kathleen Mier, Louis Mier, Jacqueline Millett, Bobby Nix, Margaret S Nix, Benny O'Rear, Claudia O'Rear, Arthur Ordoyne, Lonnie Ordoyne, Larry Perkins, Monty Perkins, Lynn J. Phillipe, William Phillips, James Roland, Susan Roland, Charles Sanchez, Mamie Sanchez, Julie Savoy, Robert Schwendimann, Lisa Scrantz, Thomas Slaughter, Larry Smith, Robert Smith, Rodney P Starkey, Carol Stegall, James Stegall, Walter Stone, Terry Tarver, Terry Tullis, Ronald Valentine, Anthony Ventrella, John Wade, Olivia Sue Warnock, Arthur Waxley, Charles White, Kenneth Wilkewitz, Stephen Wilson, Martha Jean Witmer, Sharon Witmer re #260 Response/Objection,,,,,, Memorandum in Opposition to the Motion for Summary Judgment of SEI (ECF 249) and Motion for Dismissal of the Summary Judgment filed by SEI (ECF 249) Or In The Alternative, Motion to Obtain A Continuance Under Rule 56(D) Until Discovery Is Commenced And Substantially Completed (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Troy Lillie et al.'s Responses to the SEI Defendants' Statement of Undisputed Facts in Support of SEI Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment) (Preis, Phillip) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 3/8/2019.]
October 15, 2018 Filing 260 RESPONSE filed by Mamie Baumann, Terence Beven, MD, Wanda Bevis, Thomas E Bowden, Linda Boyd, James Brown, Murphy Buell, Jerry Burris, John Buscheme, Virginia Buscheme, Robert Bush, Anita Ellen Carter, Ira Causey, Clyde J Chisholm, Joseph Chustz, Jr., Darrell Courville, Ralph D D'Amore, William Dawson, Fred Demarest, Kenneth Doughtery, Marcel Dumestre, Margaret Dumestre, Gwen Fabre, Leah Farr, Joan Feucht, Richard Feucht, Deborah S Forbes, Kendall Forbes, Michael J Giambrone, Robert Gildersleeve, Willa Mae Gildersleeve, Gordon C Gill, Nancy Gill, Charles Hart, William Bruce Johnson, Dennis Kirby, Kerry Kling, Daniel P Landry, Merrill Laplante, Laura Lee, Troy Lillie, Gary Magee, Claude Marquette, Ronald R Marston, Charlie L Massey, Jeanne Anne Mayhall, Bille Ruth McMorris, Ronald McMorris, Virginia McMorris, Lynn Gildersleeve Michelli, Kathleen Mier, Louis Mier, Jacqueline Millett, Bobby Nix, Margaret S Nix, Benny O'Rear, Claudia O'Rear, Arthur Ordoyne, Lonnie Ordoyne, Larry Perkins, Monty Perkins, Lynn J. Phillipe, William Phillips, James Roland, Susan Roland, Charles Sanchez, Mamie Sanchez, Julie Savoy, Robert Schwendimann, Lisa Scrantz, Thomas Slaughter, Larry Smith, Robert Smith, Rodney P Starkey, Carol Stegall, James Stegall, Walter Stone, Terry Tarver, Terry Tullis, Ronald Valentine, Anthony Ventrella, John Wade, Olivia Sue Warnock, Arthur Waxley, Charles White, Kenneth Wilkewitz, Stephen Wilson, Martha Jean Witmer, Sharon Witmer re: #249 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Preis, Phillip) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 3/8/2019.]
October 12, 2018 Filing 259 OBJECTION filed by Allied World Assurance Company (U.S.), Inc., Arch Insurance Company, Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's of London, Continental Casualty Company, Indian Harbor Insurance Company, Nutmeg Insurance Company re: #253 MOTION to Expedite Consideration of their Motion to Transfer Litigation to the Originating Court of the Middle District of Louisiana, #251 MOTION to Transfer Case out of District/Division to the Originating Court of the Middle District of Louisiana (Balascio, Michael) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 3/8/2019.]
October 12, 2018 Filing 258 RESPONSE AND OBJECTION filed by SEI Investments Company, SEI Private Trust Company re: #253 MOTION to Expedite Consideration of their Motion to Transfer Litigation to the Originating Court of the Middle District of Louisiana, #251 MOTION to Transfer Case out of District/Division to the Originating Court of the Middle District of Louisiana (Ashby, Danny) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 3/8/2019.]
September 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 257 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #255 Motion to Withdraw. Elizabeth Hoop Fay is withdrawn as counsel for SEI Private Trust Company and SEI Investments Company. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 9/28/2018) (ewd) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 3/8/2019.]
September 26, 2018 Filing 256 Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by SEI Investments Company, SEI Private Trust Company re #255 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw Appearance of Attorney Elizabeth Hoop Fay (Fay, Elizabeth) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 3/8/2019.]
September 26, 2018 Filing 255 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw Appearance of Attorney Elizabeth Hoop Fay filed by SEI Investments Company, SEI Private Trust Company (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Fay, Elizabeth) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 3/8/2019.]
September 25, 2018 Filing 254 Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Troy Lillie re #253 MOTION to Expedite Consideration of their Motion to Transfer Litigation to the Originating Court of the Middle District of Louisiana (Preis, Phillip) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 3/8/2019.]
September 25, 2018 Filing 253 MOTION to Expedite Consideration of their Motion to Transfer Litigation to the Originating Court of the Middle District of Louisiana filed by Troy Lillie (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Order) (Preis, Phillip) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 3/8/2019.]
September 25, 2018 Filing 252 Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Troy Lillie re #251 MOTION to Transfer Case out of District/Division to the Originating Court of the Middle District of Louisiana (Preis, Phillip) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 3/8/2019.]
September 25, 2018 Filing 251 MOTION to Transfer Case out of District/Division to the Originating Court of the Middle District of Louisiana filed by Troy Lillie (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Order) (Preis, Phillip) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 3/8/2019.]
September 24, 2018 Filing 250 Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by SEI Investments Company, SEI Private Trust Company re #249 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Attachments: #1 Index to Appendix to Memorandum of Law in Support of the Motion for Summary Judgment of Defendants SEI Investments Company and SEI Private Trust Company, #2 Appendix) (Ashby, Danny) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 3/8/2019.]
September 24, 2018 Filing 249 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by SEI Investments Company, SEI Private Trust Company (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Ashby, Danny) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 3/8/2019.]
September 14, 2018 Filing 248 NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT AND BAR ORDER PROCEEDINGS: The final hearing on the Motion is set for 12/14/2018 at 10:00 a.m. before Judge David C. Godbey. Any objections are due by 11/23/2018. (ewd) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 3/8/2019.]
September 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 247 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #245 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Jason H. Wilson. If not already done, Applicant must register as an ECF User within 14 days (LR 5.1(f)). (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 9/14/2018) (chmb) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 3/8/2019.]
September 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 246 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #243 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Ryan P. McCarthy. If not already done, Applicant must register as an ECF User within 14 days (LR 5.1(f)). (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 9/14/2018) (chmb) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 3/8/2019.]
September 13, 2018 Filing 245 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing (Filing fee $25; Receipt number 0539-9450093) filed by SEI Investments Company, SEI Private Trust Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Certificate of Good Standing)Attorney Jason H Wilson added to party SEI Investments Company(pty:dft), Attorney Jason H Wilson added to party SEI Private Trust Company(pty:dft) (Wilson, Jason) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 3/8/2019.]
September 13, 2018 Filing 244 Supplemental Document by SEI Investments Company, SEI Private Trust Company as to #243 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing for Attorney Ryan McCarthy (Filing fee $25; Receipt number 0539-9449755) Certificate of Good Standing. (Ashby, Danny) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 3/8/2019.]
September 13, 2018 Filing 243 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing for Attorney Ryan McCarthy (Filing fee $25; Receipt number 0539-9449755) filed by SEI Investments Company, SEI Private Trust Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Certificate of Good Standing) (Ashby, Danny) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 3/8/2019.]
September 7, 2018 Filing 242 NOTICE of Deposition of SEI Investments Company and SEI Private Trust Company filed by Robert C Ahders (Stanley, Michael) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 3/8/2019.]
August 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 241 ORDER granting #236 Motion to Substitute Attorney Danny S. Ashby, of Morgan, Lewis & Bockius, LLP in place of T. Gregory Jackson. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 8/17/2018) (zkc) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 3/8/2019.]
August 16, 2018 Filing 240 NOTICE of Response to the Court's Instructions from July 27, 2018 Status Conference filed by Robert C Ahders (Stanley, Michael) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 3/8/2019.]
August 13, 2018 Filing 239 NOTICE of Plaintiffs' Letter to The Honorable David Godbey As Requested During July 27, 2018 Status Conference filed by Mamie Baumann, Terence Beven, MD, Wanda Bevis, Thomas E Bowden, Linda Boyd, James Brown, Murphy Buell, Jerry Burris, John Buscheme, Virginia Buscheme, Robert Bush, Anita Ellen Carter, Ira Causey, Clyde J Chisholm, Joseph Chustz, Jr., Darrell Courville, Ralph D D'Amore, William Dawson, Fred Demarest, Kenneth Doughtery, Marcel Dumestre, Margaret Dumestre, Gwen Fabre, Leah Farr, Joan Feucht, Richard Feucht, Deborah S Forbes, Kendall Forbes, Michael J Giambrone, Robert Gildersleeve, Willa Mae Gildersleeve, Gordon C Gill, Nancy Gill, Charles Hart, William Bruce Johnson, Dennis Kirby, Kerry Kling, Daniel P Landry, Merrill Laplante, Laura Lee, Troy Lillie, Gary Magee, Claude Marquette, Ronald R Marston, Charlie L Massey, Jeanne Anne Mayhall, Bille Ruth McMorris, Ronald McMorris, Virginia McMorris, Lynn Gildersleeve Michelli, Kathleen Mier, Louis Mier, Jacqueline Millett, Bobby Nix, Margaret S Nix, Benny O'Rear, Claudia O'Rear, Arthur Ordoyne, Lonnie Ordoyne, Larry Perkins, Monty Perkins, Lynn J. Phillipe, William Phillips, James Roland, Susan Roland, Charles Sanchez, Mamie Sanchez, Julie Savoy, Robert Schwendimann, Lisa Scrantz, Thomas Slaughter, Larry Smith, Robert Smith, Rodney P Starkey, Carol Stegall, James Stegall, Walter Stone, Terry Tarver, Terry Tullis, Ronald Valentine, Anthony Ventrella, John Wade, Olivia Sue Warnock, Arthur Waxley, Charles White, Kenneth Wilkewitz, Stephen Wilson, Martha Jean Witmer, Sharon Witmer (Preis, Phillip) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 3/8/2019.]
August 10, 2018 Filing 238 NOTICE of Defendants' Letter to Honorable David Godbey re: #237 Supplemental Document filed by Allied World Assurance Company (U.S.), Inc., Arch Insurance Company, Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's of London, Continental Casualty Company, Indian Harbor Insurance Company, Nutmeg Insurance Company (Balascio, Michael) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 3/8/2019.]
August 10, 2018 Filing 237 Supplemental Document by SEI Investments Company, SEI Private Trust Company Letter from Attorney Gordon Cooney, Jr. per Judge Godbey. (Ashby, Danny) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 3/8/2019.]
August 9, 2018 Filing 236 MOTION to Substitute Attorney, added attorney Danny S Ashby,Danny S Ashby for SEI Investments Company,Danny S Ashby for SEI Private Trust Company. Motion filed by SEI Investments Company, SEI Private Trust Company (Ashby, Danny) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 3/8/2019.]
July 30, 2018 Filing 235 ELECTRONIC Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge David C Godbey: Status Conference held on 7/27/2018. Attorney Appearances: Plaitniff - Phillip W. Preis; Defendants J. Gordan Cooney, Jr. (Court Reporter: Shawn McRoberts) (No exhibits) Time in Court - :17. (chmb) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 3/8/2019.]
July 30, 2018 Filing 234 Notice of Filing of Official Electronic Transcript of Status Conference Proceedings held on 07/27/2018 before Judge David Godbey. Court Reporter/Transcriber Shawn McRoberts, Telephone number (214) 753-2349. Parties are notified of their #duty to review the transcript. A copy may be purchased from the court reporter or viewed at the clerk's office. If redaction of personal identifiers under MO 61 is necessary, file a #Redaction Request - Transcript within 21 days. If no action is taken, the entire transcript will be made available through PACER without redaction after 90 calendar days. The clerk will mail a copy of this notice to parties not electronically noticed. (22 pages) Redaction Request due 8/20/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/30/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/29/2018. (smm) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 3/8/2019.]
July 25, 2018 Filing 233 STATUS REPORT Regarding July 27, 2018 Status Conference filed by SEI Investments Company, SEI Private Trust Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B, #3 Exhibit(s) C, #4 Exhibit(s) D, #5 Proposed Order, #6 Exhibit(s) Confidentiality and Protective Order) (Jackson, T) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 3/8/2019.]
July 20, 2018 Filing 232 STATUS REPORT in Advance of the Status Conference Ordered by the Court (Doc. 231) by Plaintiffs, Troy Lillie, et al. filed by Mamie Baumann, Terence Beven, MD, Wanda Bevis, Thomas E Bowden, Linda Boyd, James Brown, Murphy Buell, Jerry Burris, John Buscheme, Virginia Buscheme, Robert Bush, Anita Ellen Carter, Ira Causey, Clyde J Chisholm, Joseph Chustz, Jr., Darrell Courville, Ralph D D'Amore, William Dawson, Fred Demarest, Kenneth Doughtery, Marcel Dumestre, Margaret Dumestre, Gwen Fabre, Leah Farr, Joan Feucht, Richard Feucht, Deborah S Forbes, Kendall Forbes, Michael J Giambrone, Robert Gildersleeve, Willa Mae Gildersleeve, Gordon C Gill, Nancy Gill, Charles Hart, William Bruce Johnson, Dennis Kirby, Kerry Kling, Daniel P Landry, Merrill Laplante, Laura Lee, Troy Lillie, Gary Magee, Claude Marquette, Ronald R Marston, Charlie L Massey, Jeanne Anne Mayhall, Bille Ruth McMorris, Ronald McMorris, Virginia McMorris, Lynn Gildersleeve Michelli, Kathleen Mier, Louis Mier, Jacqueline Millett, Bobby Nix, Margaret S Nix, Benny O'Rear, Claudia O'Rear, Arthur Ordoyne, Lonnie Ordoyne, Larry Perkins, Monty Perkins, Lynn J. Phillipe, William Phillips, James Roland, Susan Roland, Charles Sanchez, Mamie Sanchez, Julie Savoy, Robert Schwendimann, Lisa Scrantz, Thomas Slaughter, Larry Smith, Robert Smith, Rodney P Starkey, Carol Stegall, James Stegall, Walter Stone, Terry Tarver, Terry Tullis, Ronald Valentine, Anthony Ventrella, John Wade, Olivia Sue Warnock, Arthur Waxley, Charles White, Kenneth Wilkewitz, Stephen Wilson, Martha Jean Witmer, Sharon Witmer. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Appendix in Support of Status Report in Advance of Status Conference Ordered by the Court with Exhibit A) (Preis, Phillip)[Transferred from Texas Northern on 3/8/2019.]
June 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 231 ORDER: Status Conference set for 7/27/2018 10:30 AM in US Courthouse, Courtroom 1505, 1100 Commerce St., Dallas, TX 75242-1310 before Judge David C Godbey. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 6/12/2018) (axm) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 3/8/2019.]
June 6, 2018 Filing 230 RESPONSE filed by SEI Investments Company, SEI Private Trust Company re: #228 MOTION for Status Conference (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proposed Order) (Jackson, T) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 3/8/2019.]
May 31, 2018 Filing 229 Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Mamie Baumann, Terence Beven, MD, Wanda Bevis, Thomas E Bowden, Linda Boyd, James Brown, Murphy Buell, Jerry Burris, John Buscheme, Virginia Buscheme, Robert Bush, Anita Ellen Carter, Ira Causey, Clyde J Chisholm, Joseph Chustz, Jr., Darrell Courville, Ralph D D'Amore, William Dawson, Fred Demarest, Kenneth Doughtery, Marcel Dumestre, Margaret Dumestre, Gwen Fabre, Leah Farr, Joan Feucht, Richard Feucht, Deborah S Forbes, Kendall Forbes, Michael J Giambrone, Robert Gildersleeve, Willa Mae Gildersleeve, Gordon C Gill, Nancy Gill, Charles Hart, William Bruce Johnson, Dennis Kirby, Kerry Kling, Daniel P Landry, Merrill Laplante, Laura Lee, Troy Lillie, Gary Magee, Claude Marquette, Ronald R Marston, Charlie L Massey, Jeanne Anne Mayhall, Bille Ruth McMorris, Ronald McMorris, Virginia McMorris, Lynn Gildersleeve Michelli, Kathleen Mier, Louis Mier, Jacqueline Millett, Bobby Nix, Margaret S Nix, Benny O'Rear, Claudia O'Rear, Arthur Ordoyne, Lonnie Ordoyne, Larry Perkins, Monty Perkins, Lynn J. Phillipe, William Phillips, James Roland, Susan Roland, Charles Sanchez, Mamie Sanchez, Julie Savoy, Robert Schwendimann, Lisa Scrantz, Thomas Slaughter, Larry Smith, Robert Smith, Rodney P Starkey, Carol Stegall, James Stegall, Walter Stone, Terry Tarver, Terry Tullis, Ronald Valentine, Anthony Ventrella, John Wade, Olivia Sue Warnock, Arthur Waxley, Charles White, Kenneth Wilkewitz, Stephen Wilson, Martha Jean Witmer, Sharon Witmer re #228 MOTION for Status Conference (Preis, Phillip) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 3/8/2019.]
May 31, 2018 Filing 228 MOTION for Status Conference filed by Mamie Baumann, Terence Beven, MD, Wanda Bevis, Thomas E Bowden, Linda Boyd, James Brown, Murphy Buell, Jerry Burris, John Buscheme, Virginia Buscheme, Robert Bush, Anita Ellen Carter, Ira Causey, Clyde J Chisholm, Joseph Chustz, Jr., Darrell Courville, Ralph D D'Amore, William Dawson, Fred Demarest, Kenneth Doughtery, Marcel Dumestre, Margaret Dumestre, Gwen Fabre, Leah Farr, Joan Feucht, Richard Feucht, Deborah S Forbes, Kendall Forbes, Michael J Giambrone, Robert Gildersleeve, Willa Mae Gildersleeve, Gordon C Gill, Nancy Gill, Charles Hart, William Bruce Johnson, Dennis Kirby, Kerry Kling, Daniel P Landry, Merrill Laplante, Laura Lee, Troy Lillie, Gary Magee, Claude Marquette, Ronald R Marston, Charlie L Massey, Jeanne Anne Mayhall, Bille Ruth McMorris, Ronald McMorris, Virginia McMorris, Lynn Gildersleeve Michelli, Kathleen Mier, Louis Mier, Jacqueline Millett, Bobby Nix, Margaret S Nix, Benny O'Rear, Claudia O'Rear, Arthur Ordoyne, Lonnie Ordoyne, Larry Perkins, Monty Perkins, Lynn J. Phillipe, William Phillips, James Roland, Susan Roland, Charles Sanchez, Mamie Sanchez, Julie Savoy, Robert Schwendimann, Lisa Scrantz, Thomas Slaughter, Larry Smith, Robert Smith, Rodney P Starkey, Carol Stegall, James Stegall, Walter Stone, Terry Tarver, Terry Tullis, Ronald Valentine, Anthony Ventrella, John Wade, Olivia Sue Warnock, Arthur Waxley, Charles White, Kenneth Wilkewitz, Stephen Wilson, Martha Jean Witmer, Sharon Witmer (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Order) (Preis, Phillip) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 3/8/2019.]
September 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 227 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #226 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Michael A. Balascio. If not already done, Applicant must register as an ECF User within 14 days (LR 5.1(f)). (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 9/19/2017) (chmb) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 3/8/2019.]
September 15, 2017 Filing 226 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing for Attorney Michael A Balascio (Filing fee $25; Receipt number 102824) filed by Allied World Assurance Company (U.S.), Inc. Attorney Michael A Balascio added to party Allied World Assurance Company (U.S.), Inc. (pty:dft) (sss) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 3/8/2019.]
September 13, 2017 Filing 225 NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT AND BAR ORDER PROCEEDINGS - Hunton & Williams, LLP -- filed by Ralph S. Janvey et al. The final hearing is set for 11/28/17 at 10:00 a.m. before Judge David C. Godbey. Any objections are due by 11/7/2017. (ash) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 3/8/2019.]
September 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 224 ORDER: The Joint Expedited Motion filed by the Receiver, the Examiner and the Official Stanford Investors Committee seeking a status conference in 3:09-md-2099 at #70 is GRANTED. The Court will hold a status hearing for all parties to the Stanford MDL proceeding on 11/28/2017 at 11:0 0 a.m. in Courtroom 1505. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 9/7/2017) (ash) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 3/8/2019.]
August 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 223 SCHEDULING ORDER: A Final Approval Hearing will be held before the Honorable David C. Godbey at the United States Courthouse, 1100 Commerce Street, Dallas, Texas, at 10:00 a.m. on 11/28/17, which is a date at least ninety (90) calendar days after entry of this Scheduling Order. Any Person who wishes to object to the terms of the Settlement, the Bar Order, the Judgment and Bar Order, or Plaintiffs' request for approval of attorney's fees, or who wishes to appear at the Final Approval Hearing, must file a written objection in 3:09-CV-0298-N through ECF or by mailing the written objection to the Clerk of the United States District Court for the Northern District of Texas, 1100 Commerce Street, Dallas, Texas 75242 by 11/7/17. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 8/23/2017) (ash) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 3/8/2019.]
March 13, 2017 Filing 222 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's of London identifying Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate Fairfax Financial Holdings Limited, Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate Hanover Insurance Group, Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate Beazley PLC, Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate Novae Group PLC for Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's of London. (Dandelles, Stefan) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 3/8/2019.]
December 7, 2016 Filing 221 STATUS REPORT of Class Counsel Regarding Receipt of Notice of Pendency of Class Action filed by Mamie Baumann, Terence Beven, MD, Wanda Bevis, Thomas E Bowden, Linda Boyd, James Brown, Murphy Buell, Jerry Burris, John Buscheme, Virginia Buscheme, Robert Bush, Anita Ellen Carter, Ira Causey, Clyde J Chisholm, Joseph Chustz, Jr., Darrell Courville, Ralph D D'Amore, William Dawson, Fred Demarest, Kenneth Doughtery, Marcel Dumestre, Margaret Dumestre, Gwen Fabre, Leah Farr, Joan Feucht, Richard Feucht, Deborah S Forbes, Kendall Forbes, Michael J Giambrone, Robert Gildersleeve, Willa Mae Gildersleeve, Gordon C Gill, Nancy Gill, Charles Hart, Ralph S. Janvey, William Bruce Johnson, Dennis Kirby, Kerry Kling, Daniel P Landry, Merrill Laplante, Laura Lee, Troy Lillie, Gary Magee, Claude Marquette, Ronald R Marston, Charlie L Massey, Jeanne Anne Mayhall, Bille Ruth McMorris, Ronald McMorris, Virginia McMorris, Lynn Gildersleeve Michelli, Kathleen Mier, Louis Mier, Jacqueline Millett, Bobby Nix, Margaret S Nix, Benny O'Rear, Claudia O'Rear, Arthur Ordoyne, Lonnie Ordoyne, Larry Perkins, Monty Perkins, Lynn J. Phillipe, William Phillips, James Roland, Susan Roland, Charles Sanchez, Mamie Sanchez, Julie Savoy, Robert Schwendimann, Lisa Scrantz, Thomas Slaughter, Larry Smith, Robert Smith, Rodney P Starkey, Carol Stegall, James Stegall, Walter Stone, Terry Tarver, Terry Tullis, Ronald Valentine, Anthony Ventrella, John Wade, Olivia Sue Warnock, Arthur Waxley, Charles White, Kenneth Wilkewitz, Stephen Wilson, Martha Jean Witmer, Sharon Witmer. (Preis, Phillip) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 3/8/2019.]
November 7, 2016 Filing 220 NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT AND BAR ORDER PROCEEDINGS - BMB filed by Ralph S Janvey et al. (ctf) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 3/8/2019.]
November 7, 2016 Filing 219 NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT AND BAR ORDER PROCEEDINGS - WILLIS filed by Ralph S Janvey et al. (ctf) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 3/8/2019.]
October 6, 2016 Filing 218 NOTICE of Mailing of Notice of Pendency of Class Action and Request for Exclusion Form to Potential Class Members filed by Mamie Baumann, Terence Beven, MD, Wanda Bevis, Thomas E Bowden, Linda Boyd, James Brown, Murphy Buell, Jerry Burris, John Buscheme, Virginia Buscheme, Robert Bush, Anita Ellen Carter, Ira Causey, Clyde J Chisholm, Joseph Chustz, Jr., Darrell Courville, Ralph D D'Amore, William Dawson, Fred Demarest, Kenneth Doughtery, Marcel Dumestre, Margaret Dumestre, Gwen Fabre, Leah Farr, Joan Feucht, Richard Feucht, Deborah S Forbes, Kendall Forbes, Michael J Giambrone, Robert Gildersleeve, Willa Mae Gildersleeve, Gordon C Gill, Nancy Gill, Charles Hart, William Bruce Johnson, Dennis Kirby, Kerry Kling, Daniel P Landry, Merrill Laplante, Laura Lee, Troy Lillie, Gary Magee, Claude Marquette, Ronald R Marston, Charlie L Massey, Jeanne Anne Mayhall, Bille Ruth McMorris, Ronald McMorris, Virginia McMorris, Lynn Gildersleeve Michelli, Kathleen Mier, Louis Mier, Jacqueline Millett, Bobby Nix, Margaret S Nix, Benny O'Rear, Claudia O'Rear, Arthur Ordoyne, Lonnie Ordoyne, Larry Perkins, Monty Perkins, Lynn J. Phillipe, William Phillips, James Roland, Susan Roland, Charles Sanchez, Mamie Sanchez, Julie Savoy, Robert Schwendimann, Lisa Scrantz, Thomas Slaughter, Larry Smith, Robert Smith, Rodney P Starkey, Carol Stegall, James Stegall, Walter Stone, Terry Tarver, Terry Tullis, Ronald Valentine, Anthony Ventrella, John Wade, Olivia Sue Warnock, Arthur Waxley, Charles White, Kenneth Wilkewitz, Stephen Wilson, Martha Jean Witmer, Sharon Witmer (Preis, Phillip) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 3/8/2019.]
September 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 217 ORDER granting #215 Motion for Approval of Class Notice. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 9/28/2016) (ykp) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 3/8/2019.]
September 23, 2016 Filing 216 Appendix in Support filed by Mamie Baumann, Terence Beven, MD, Wanda Bevis, Thomas E Bowden, Linda Boyd, James Brown, Murphy Buell, Jerry Burris, John Buscheme, Virginia Buscheme, Robert Bush, Anita Ellen Carter, Ira Causey, Clyde J Chisholm, Joseph Chustz, Jr., Darrell Courville, Ralph D D'Amore, William Dawson, Fred Demarest, Kenneth Doughtery, Marcel Dumestre, Margaret Dumestre, Gwen Fabre, Leah Farr, Joan Feucht, Richard Feucht, Deborah S Forbes, Kendall Forbes, Michael J Giambrone, Robert Gildersleeve, Willa Mae Gildersleeve, Gordon C Gill, Nancy Gill, Charles Hart, William Bruce Johnson, Dennis Kirby, Kerry Kling, Daniel P Landry, Merrill Laplante, Laura Lee, Troy Lillie, Gary Magee, Claude Marquette, Ronald R Marston, Charlie L Massey, Jeanne Anne Mayhall, Bille Ruth McMorris, Ronald McMorris, Virginia McMorris, Lynn Gildersleeve Michelli, Kathleen Mier, Louis Mier, Jacqueline Millett, Bobby Nix, Margaret S Nix, Benny O'Rear, Claudia O'Rear, Arthur Ordoyne, Lonnie Ordoyne, Larry Perkins, Monty Perkins, Lynn J. Phillipe, William Phillips, James Roland, Susan Roland, Charles Sanchez, Mamie Sanchez, Julie Savoy, Robert Schwendimann, Lisa Scrantz, Thomas Slaughter, Larry Smith, Robert Smith, Rodney P Starkey, Carol Stegall, James Stegall, Walter Stone, Terry Tarver, Terry Tullis, Ronald Valentine, Anthony Ventrella, John Wade, Olivia Sue Warnock, Arthur Waxley, Charles White, Kenneth Wilkewitz, Stephen Wilson, Martha Jean Witmer, Sharon Witmer re #215 MOTION Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion for Approval of Class Notice (Preis, Phillip) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 3/8/2019.]
September 23, 2016 Filing 215 MOTION Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion for Approval of Class Notice filed by Mamie Baumann, Terence Beven, MD, Wanda Bevis, Thomas E Bowden, Linda Boyd, James Brown, Murphy Buell, Jerry Burris, John Buscheme, Virginia Buscheme, Robert Bush, Anita Ellen Carter, Ira Causey, Clyde J Chisholm, Joseph Chustz, Jr., Darrell Courville, Ralph D D'Amore, William Dawson, Fred Demarest, Kenneth Doughtery, Marcel Dumestre, Margaret Dumestre, Gwen Fabre, Leah Farr, Joan Feucht, Richard Feucht, Deborah S Forbes, Kendall Forbes, Michael J Giambrone, Robert Gildersleeve, Willa Mae Gildersleeve, Gordon C Gill, Nancy Gill, Charles Hart, William Bruce Johnson, Dennis Kirby, Kerry Kling, Daniel P Landry, Merrill Laplante, Laura Lee, Troy Lillie, Gary Magee, Claude Marquette, Ronald R Marston, Charlie L Massey, Jeanne Anne Mayhall, Bille Ruth McMorris, Ronald McMorris, Virginia McMorris, Lynn Gildersleeve Michelli, Kathleen Mier, Louis Mier, Jacqueline Millett, Bobby Nix, Margaret S Nix, Benny O'Rear, Claudia O'Rear, Arthur Ordoyne, Lonnie Ordoyne, Larry Perkins, Monty Perkins, Lynn J. Phillipe, William Phillips, James Roland, Susan Roland, Charles Sanchez, Mamie Sanchez, Julie Savoy, Robert Schwendimann, Lisa Scrantz, Thomas Slaughter, Larry Smith, Robert Smith, Rodney P Starkey, Carol Stegall, James Stegall, Walter Stone, Terry Tarver, Terry Tullis, Ronald Valentine, Anthony Ventrella, John Wade, Olivia Sue Warnock, Arthur Waxley, Charles White, Kenneth Wilkewitz, Stephen Wilson, Martha Jean Witmer, Sharon Witmer (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Preis, Phillip) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 3/8/2019.]
September 15, 2016 Filing 214 Second STATUS REPORT Supplemental Joint Status Report of the Parties With Respect to Class Notice filed by Mamie Baumann, Terence Beven, MD, Wanda Bevis, Thomas E Bowden, Linda Boyd, James Brown, Murphy Buell, Jerry Burris, John Buscheme, Virginia Buscheme, Robert Bush, Anita Ellen Carter, Ira Causey, Clyde J Chisholm, Joseph Chustz, Jr., Darrell Courville, Ralph D D'Amore, William Dawson, Fred Demarest, Kenneth Doughtery, Marcel Dumestre, Margaret Dumestre, Gwen Fabre, Leah Farr, Joan Feucht, Richard Feucht, Deborah S Forbes, Kendall Forbes, Michael J Giambrone, Robert Gildersleeve, Willa Mae Gildersleeve, Gordon C Gill, Nancy Gill, Charles Hart, William Bruce Johnson, Dennis Kirby, Kerry Kling, Daniel P Landry, Merrill Laplante, Laura Lee, Troy Lillie, Gary Magee, Claude Marquette, Ronald R Marston, Charlie L Massey, Jeanne Anne Mayhall, Bille Ruth McMorris, Ronald McMorris, Virginia McMorris, Lynn Gildersleeve Michelli, Kathleen Mier, Louis Mier, Jacqueline Millett, Bobby Nix, Margaret S Nix, Benny O'Rear, Claudia O'Rear, Arthur Ordoyne, Lonnie Ordoyne, Larry Perkins, Monty Perkins, Lynn J. Phillipe, William Phillips, James Roland, Susan Roland, Charles Sanchez, Mamie Sanchez, Julie Savoy, Robert Schwendimann, Lisa Scrantz, Thomas Slaughter, Larry Smith, Robert Smith, Rodney P Starkey, Carol Stegall, James Stegall, Walter Stone, Terry Tarver, Terry Tullis, Ronald Valentine, Anthony Ventrella, John Wade, Olivia Sue Warnock, Arthur Waxley, Charles White, Kenneth Wilkewitz, Stephen Wilson, Martha Jean Witmer, Sharon Witmer. (Preis, Phillip) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 3/8/2019.]
August 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 213 SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER: The Court orders that the class notice must include the Defendants Proposed Paragraph Concerning Article 596 and Prescription found in Exhibit B to the Supplemental Notice [203-2]. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 8/2/2016) (mem) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 3/8/2019.]
July 22, 2016 Filing 212 EXHIBIT to Document 173 in Case 3:09-cv-1736 and NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT AND BAR ORDER PROCEEDINGS. The final hearing on the Motion 165 in Case 3:09-cv-1736 is set for October 28, 2016. Any objection to the Agreement, the Motion, the Judgments and Bar Orders, the Final Bar Order, or the request for approval of the Receivers attorneys' fees must be filed, in writing, with the Court in the SEC Action no later than September 30, 2016. Any objections not filed by this date will be deemed waived and will not be considered by the Court. (gmg) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 3/8/2019.]
July 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 211 ORDER: The settlement hearing in these cases previously set for October 21, 2016, is reset to October 28, 2016, at 10:00 a.m. in Judge Godbey's Courtroom, 1505. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 7/21/2016) (gmg) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 3/8/2019.]
July 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 209 SCHEDULING ORDER: The court preliminarily finds that the settlement and Agreement proposed by Certain Underwriters at Lloyds of London, Arch Specialty Insurance Company, and Lexington Insurance Company (Underwriters) and the Receiver and Official Stanford Investors Committee are fair, reasonable, and equitable; have no obvious deficiencies; and are the product of serious, informed, arms-length negotiations. The Court, however, reserves a final ruling with respect to the terms of the Agreement until after the Final Approval Hearing. This hearing will be held at the United States Courthouse, 1100 Commerce Street, Dallas, Texas 75242, in Courtroom 1505, at 10:00 a.m. on Friday, October 21, 2016. See order for additional information and directives. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 7/11/2016) (ash) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 3/8/2019.]
July 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 210 NOTICE of ORDER (Originally entered in 3:09-cv-0298 as document #2334.): The Kroll settlement hearing previously set for 7/08/2016, is now set for 8/12/2016, at 11:00 a.m. at the United States Courthouse, 1100 Commerce Street, Dallas, Texas 75242, in Courtroom 1505. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 7/11/2016) (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 7/11/2016) (ash) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 3/8/2019.]
July 5, 2016 Filing 208 (Document Restricted) Sealed Exhibits re: #188 Appendix in Support filed by Mamie Baumann, Terence Beven, MD, Wanda Bevis, Thomas E Bowden, Linda Boyd, James Brown, Murphy Buell, Jerry Burris, John Buscheme, Virginia Buscheme, Robert Bush, Anita Ellen Carter, Ira Causey, Clyde J Chisholm, Joseph Chustz, Jr., Darrell Courville, Ralph D D'Amore, William Dawson, Fred Demarest, Kenneth Doughtery, Marcel Dumestre, Margaret Dumestre, Gwen Fabre, Leah Farr, Joan Feucht, Richard Feucht, Deborah S Forbes, Kendall Forbes, Michael J Giambrone, Robert Gildersleeve, Willa Mae Gildersleeve, Gordon C Gill, Nancy Gill, Charles Hart, Ralph S. Janvey, William Bruce Johnson, Dennis Kirby, Kerry Kling, Daniel P Landry, Merrill Laplante, Laura Lee, Troy Lillie, Gary Magee, Claude Marquette, Ronald R Marston, Charlie L Massey, Jeanne Anne Mayhall, Bille Ruth McMorris, Ronald McMorris, Virginia McMorris, Lynn Gildersleeve Michelli, Kathleen Mier, Louis Mier, Jacqueline Millett, Bobby Nix, Margaret S Nix, Benny O'Rear, Claudia O'Rear, Arthur Ordoyne, Lonnie Ordoyne, Larry Perkins, Monty Perkins, Lynn J. Phillipe, William Phillips, James Roland, Susan Roland, Charles Sanchez, Mamie Sanchez, Julie Savoy, Robert Schwendimann, Lisa Scrantz, Thomas Slaughter, Larry Smith, Robert Smith, Rodney P Starkey, Carol Stegall, James Stegall, Walter Stone, Terry Tarver, Terry Tullis, Ronald Valentine, Anthony Ventrella, John Wade, Olivia Sue Warnock, Arthur Waxley, Charles White, Kenneth Wilkewitz, Stephen Wilson, Martha Jean Witmer, Sharon Witmer (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Exhibit(s), #3 Exhibit(s), #4 Exhibit(s)) (sss) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 3/8/2019.]
June 30, 2016 Filing 206 RESPONSE filed by Allied World Assurance Company (U.S.), Inc., Arch Insurance Company, Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's of London, Continental Casualty Company, Indian Harbor Insurance Company, Nutmeg Insurance Company, SEI Investments Company, SEI Private Trust Company re: #205 Notice (Other) (Jackson, T) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 3/8/2019.]
June 23, 2016 Filing 205 NOTICE of Statement Concerning Class Definition filed by Ralph S. Janvey (Arlington, David) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 3/8/2019.]
June 1, 2016 Filing 204 NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT AND BAR ORDER PROCEEDINGS. Objections are due by July 22, 2016. A final hearing will be held before the Honorable David C. Godbey in the United States District Court for the Northern District of Texas, United States Courthouse, 1100 Commerce Street, Dallas, Texas 75242, in Courtroom 1505 at 10:00 a.m. on Friday, August 12, 2016. (ash) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 3/8/2019.]
June 1, 2016 Filing 203 Supplemental STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report of the Parties with Respect to Class Notice filed by SEI Investments Company, SEI Private Trust Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B, #3 Exhibit(s) C) (Jackson, T)[Transferred from Texas Northern on 3/8/2019.]
May 23, 2016 Filing 202 NOTICE of Joint Status Report of All Parties with Respect to Class Notice re: #201 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief filed by Mamie Baumann, Terence Beven, MD, Wanda Bevis, Thomas E Bowden, Linda Boyd, James Brown, Murphy Buell, Jerry Burris, John Buscheme, Virginia Buscheme, Robert Bush, Anita Ellen Carter, Ira Causey, Clyde J Chisholm, Joseph Chustz, Jr., Darrell Courville, Ralph D D'Amore, William Dawson, Fred Demarest, Kenneth Doughtery, Marcel Dumestre, Margaret Dumestre, Gwen Fabre, Leah Farr, Joan Feucht, Richard Feucht, Deborah S Forbes, Kendall Forbes, Michael J Giambrone, Robert Gildersleeve, Willa Mae Gildersleeve, Gordon C Gill, Nancy Gill, Charles Hart, William Bruce Johnson, Dennis Kirby, Kerry Kling, Daniel P Landry, Merrill Laplante, Laura Lee, Troy Lillie, Gary Magee, Claude Marquette, Ronald R Marston, Charlie L Massey, Jeanne Anne Mayhall, Bille Ruth McMorris, Ronald McMorris, Virginia McMorris, Lynn Gildersleeve Michelli, Kathleen Mier, Louis Mier, Jacqueline Millett, Bobby Nix, Margaret S Nix, Benny O'Rear, Claudia O'Rear, Arthur Ordoyne, Lonnie Ordoyne, Larry Perkins, Monty Perkins, Lynn J. Phillipe, William Phillips, James Roland, Susan Roland, Charles Sanchez, Mamie Sanchez, Julie Savoy, Robert Schwendimann, Lisa Scrantz, Thomas Slaughter, Larry Smith, Robert Smith, Rodney P Starkey, Carol Stegall, James Stegall, Walter Stone, Terry Tarver, Terry Tullis, Ronald Valentine, Anthony Ventrella, John Wade, Olivia Sue Warnock, Arthur Waxley, Charles White, Kenneth Wilkewitz, Stephen Wilson, Martha Jean Witmer, Sharon Witmer (Preis, Phillip) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 3/8/2019.]
May 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 201 ORDER: The Court denies #182 SEI's motion and adopts as an order of this Court the state court's order certifying a plaintiff class. The Court amends the state court order and certifies a class under Rule 23. The Court appoints Pries Gordon, APLC as class counsel. The Court further orders that the parties confer regarding the notice to be provided to class members and provide a status report to the Court regarding the same within twenty-one (21) days of this Order. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 5/2/2016) (trk) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 3/8/2019.]
April 13, 2016 Filing 200 LONG FORM NOTICE OF PROPOSED SETTLEMENT, BAR ORDER AND JUDGMENT, AND HEARING BY ORDER THE UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT, NORTHERN DISTRICT OF TEXAS. Objections due by May 18, 2016. Hearing scheduled to be held before the Honorable David C. Godbey in the United States District Court for the Northern District of Texas, United States Courthouse, 1100 Commerce Street, Dallas, Texas 75242, in Courtroom 1505, at 10:00 a.m. on July 8, 2016. (gmg) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 3/8/2019.]
November 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 199 ORDER re: #178 Motion for Summary Judgment. Plaintiffs have not stated a claim for relief under LSL 712(D) because the statute does not provide a private right of action for a violation of that section. Accordingly, the Court grants SEI's motion for partial judgment on the pleadings. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 11/4/2015) (sss) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 3/8/2019.]
September 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 198 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #180 Motion for Reconsideration or, in the Alternative, Certification for Interlocutory Appeal. The Court grants the motion to reconsider, vacates its previous order in part, and dismisses Plaintiffs' claims regarding primary liability under the LSL. The Court denies the motion to reconsider and denies certification for interlocutory appeal regarding Plaintiffs' secondary liability claims under the LSL. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 9/22/2015) (tln) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 3/8/2019.]
August 19, 2015 Filing 197 REPLY filed by SEI Investments Company, SEI Private Trust Company re: #182 Renewed MOTION of SEI Investments Company and SEI Private Trust Company that the Court Decline to Accept the State Court's Order Regarding Class Certification (Jackson, T) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 3/8/2019.]
August 19, 2015 Filing 196 REPLY filed by SEI Investments Company, SEI Private Trust Company re: #180 MOTION for Reconsideration or, in the Alternative, Certification for Interlocutory Appeal (Jackson, T) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 3/8/2019.]
August 19, 2015 Filing 195 REPLY filed by SEI Investments Company, SEI Private Trust Company re: #178 MOTION for Partial Judgment on the Pleadings (Jackson, T) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 3/8/2019.]
August 10, 2015 Filing 194 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Kirstin Donahue Dietel on behalf of SEI Investments Company, SEI Private Trust Company. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Dietel, Kirstin) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 3/8/2019.]
August 10, 2015 Filing 193 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by T Gregory Jackson on behalf of SEI Investments Company, SEI Private Trust Company. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Jackson, T) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 3/8/2019.]
August 5, 2015 Filing 192 Appendix in Support filed by Mamie Baumann, Terence Beven, MD, Wanda Bevis, Thomas E Bowden, Linda Boyd, James Brown, Murphy Buell, Jerry Burris, John Buscheme, Virginia Buscheme, Robert Bush, Anita Ellen Carter, Ira Causey, Clyde J Chisholm, Joseph Chustz, Jr., Darrell Courville, Ralph D D'Amore, William Dawson, Fred Demarest, Kenneth Doughtery, Marcel Dumestre, Margaret Dumestre, Gwen Fabre, Leah Farr, Joan Feucht, Richard Feucht, Deborah S Forbes, Kendall Forbes, Michael J Giambrone, Robert Gildersleeve, Willa Mae Gildersleeve, Gordon C Gill, Nancy Gill, Charles Hart, William Bruce Johnson, Dennis Kirby, Kerry Kling, Daniel P Landry, Merrill Laplante, Laura Lee, Troy Lillie, Gary Magee, Claude Marquette, Ronald R Marston, Charlie L Massey, Jeanne Anne Mayhall, Bille Ruth McMorris, Ronald McMorris, Virginia McMorris, Lynn Gildersleeve Michelli, Kathleen Mier, Louis Mier, Jacqueline Millett, Bobby Nix, Margaret S Nix, Benny O'Rear, Claudia O'Rear, Arthur Ordoyne, Lonnie Ordoyne, Larry Perkins, Monty Perkins, Lynn J. Phillipe, William Phillips, James Roland, Susan Roland, Charles Sanchez, Mamie Sanchez, Julie Savoy, Robert Schwendimann, Lisa Scrantz, Thomas Slaughter, Larry Smith, Robert Smith, Rodney P Starkey, Carol Stegall, James Stegall, Walter Stone, Terry Tarver, Terry Tullis, Ronald Valentine, Anthony Ventrella, John Wade, Olivia Sue Warnock, Arthur Waxley, Charles White, Kenneth Wilkewitz, Stephen Wilson, Martha Jean Witmer, Sharon Witmer re #191 Response/Objection,,,,,, to SEI Defendants' Motion for Partial Judgment on the Pleadings (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1, #2 Exhibit(s) 2, #3 Exhibit(s) 3, #4 Exhibit(s) 4, #5 Exhibit(s) 5 (Part A), #6 Exhibit(s) 5 (Part B)) (Preis, Phillip) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 3/8/2019.]
August 5, 2015 Filing 191 RESPONSE AND OBJECTION filed by Mamie Baumann, Terence Beven, MD, Wanda Bevis, Thomas E Bowden, Linda Boyd, James Brown, Murphy Buell, Jerry Burris, John Buscheme, Virginia Buscheme, Robert Bush, Anita Ellen Carter, Ira Causey, Clyde J Chisholm, Joseph Chustz, Jr., Darrell Courville, Ralph D D'Amore, William Dawson, Fred Demarest, Kenneth Doughtery, Marcel Dumestre, Margaret Dumestre, Gwen Fabre, Leah Farr, Joan Feucht, Richard Feucht, Deborah S Forbes, Kendall Forbes, Michael J Giambrone, Robert Gildersleeve, Willa Mae Gildersleeve, Gordon C Gill, Nancy Gill, Charles Hart, William Bruce Johnson, Dennis Kirby, Kerry Kling, Daniel P Landry, Merrill Laplante, Laura Lee, Troy Lillie, Gary Magee, Claude Marquette, Ronald R Marston, Charlie L Massey, Jeanne Anne Mayhall, Bille Ruth McMorris, Ronald McMorris, Virginia McMorris, Lynn Gildersleeve Michelli, Kathleen Mier, Louis Mier, Jacqueline Millett, Bobby Nix, Margaret S Nix, Benny O'Rear, Claudia O'Rear, Arthur Ordoyne, Lonnie Ordoyne, Larry Perkins, Monty Perkins, Lynn J. Phillipe, William Phillips, James Roland, Susan Roland, Charles Sanchez, Mamie Sanchez, Julie Savoy, Robert Schwendimann, Lisa Scrantz, Thomas Slaughter, Larry Smith, Robert Smith, Rodney P Starkey, Carol Stegall, James Stegall, Walter Stone, Terry Tarver, Terry Tullis, Ronald Valentine, Anthony Ventrella, John Wade, Olivia Sue Warnock, Arthur Waxley, Charles White, Kenneth Wilkewitz, Stephen Wilson, Martha Jean Witmer, Sharon Witmer re: #178 MOTION for Partial Judgment on the Pleadings (Preis, Phillip) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 3/8/2019.]
August 5, 2015 Filing 190 RESPONSE AND OBJECTION filed by Mamie Baumann, Terence Beven, MD, Wanda Bevis, Thomas E Bowden, Linda Boyd, James Brown, Murphy Buell, Jerry Burris, John Buscheme, Virginia Buscheme, Robert Bush, Anita Ellen Carter, Ira Causey, Clyde J Chisholm, Joseph Chustz, Jr., Darrell Courville, Ralph D D'Amore, William Dawson, Fred Demarest, Kenneth Doughtery, Marcel Dumestre, Margaret Dumestre, Gwen Fabre, Leah Farr, Joan Feucht, Richard Feucht, Deborah S Forbes, Kendall Forbes, Michael J Giambrone, Robert Gildersleeve, Willa Mae Gildersleeve, Gordon C Gill, Nancy Gill, Charles Hart, William Bruce Johnson, Dennis Kirby, Kerry Kling, Daniel P Landry, Merrill Laplante, Laura Lee, Troy Lillie, Gary Magee, Claude Marquette, Ronald R Marston, Charlie L Massey, Jeanne Anne Mayhall, Bille Ruth McMorris, Ronald McMorris, Virginia McMorris, Lynn Gildersleeve Michelli, Kathleen Mier, Louis Mier, Jacqueline Millett, Bobby Nix, Margaret S Nix, Benny O'Rear, Claudia O'Rear, Arthur Ordoyne, Lonnie Ordoyne, Larry Perkins, Monty Perkins, Lynn J. Phillipe, William Phillips, James Roland, Susan Roland, Charles Sanchez, Mamie Sanchez, Julie Savoy, Robert Schwendimann, Lisa Scrantz, Thomas Slaughter, Larry Smith, Robert Smith, Rodney P Starkey, Carol Stegall, James Stegall, Walter Stone, Terry Tarver, Terry Tullis, Ronald Valentine, Anthony Ventrella, John Wade, Olivia Sue Warnock, Arthur Waxley, Charles White, Kenneth Wilkewitz, Stephen Wilson, Martha Jean Witmer, Sharon Witmer re: #180 MOTION for Reconsideration or, in the Alternative, Certification for Interlocutory Appeal (Preis, Phillip) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 3/8/2019.]
August 5, 2015 Filing 189 (Document Restricted) Motion for Leave to File Under Seal Certain Exhibits to IRA Plaintiffs' "Memorandum in Opposition to SEI's Renewed Motion that the Court Decline to Accept the State Court's Order Regarding Class Certification" (Sealed pursuant to motion to seal) filed by Mamie Baumann, Terence Beven, MD, Wanda Bevis, Thomas E Bowden, Linda Boyd, James Brown, Murphy Buell, Jerry Burris, John Buscheme, Virginia Buscheme, Robert Bush, Anita Ellen Carter, Ira Causey, Clyde J Chisholm, Joseph Chustz, Jr., Darrell Courville, Ralph D D'Amore, William Dawson, Fred Demarest, Kenneth Doughtery, Marcel Dumestre, Margaret Dumestre, Gwen Fabre, Leah Farr, Joan Feucht, Richard Feucht, Deborah S Forbes, Kendall Forbes, Michael J Giambrone, Robert Gildersleeve, Willa Mae Gildersleeve, Gordon C Gill, Nancy Gill, Charles Hart, William Bruce Johnson, Dennis Kirby, Kerry Kling, Daniel P Landry, Merrill Laplante, Laura Lee, Troy Lillie, Gary Magee, Claude Marquette, Ronald R Marston, Charlie L Massey, Jeanne Anne Mayhall, Bille Ruth McMorris, Ronald McMorris, Virginia McMorris, Lynn Gildersleeve Michelli, Kathleen Mier, Louis Mier, Jacqueline Millett, Bobby Nix, Margaret S Nix, Benny O'Rear, Claudia O'Rear, Arthur Ordoyne, Lonnie Ordoyne, Larry Perkins, Monty Perkins, Lynn J. Phillipe, William Phillips, James Roland, Susan Roland, Charles Sanchez, Mamie Sanchez, Julie Savoy, Robert Schwendimann, Lisa Scrantz, Thomas Slaughter, Larry Smith, Robert Smith, Rodney P Starkey, Carol Stegall, James Stegall, Walter Stone, Terry Tarver, Terry Tullis, Ronald Valentine, Anthony Ventrella, John Wade, Olivia Sue Warnock, Arthur Waxley, Charles White, Kenneth Wilkewitz, Stephen Wilson, Martha Jean Witmer, Sharon Witmer (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Appendix to IRA Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File Under Seal Certain Exhibits, #2 Exhibit(s) A, #3 Exhibit(s) B, #4 Exhibit(s) 7, #5 Exhibit(s) 8, #6 Exhibit(s) 9, #7 Exhibit(s) 10, #8 Exhibit(s) 16 (Part A), #9 Exhibit(s) 16 (Part B)) (Preis, Phillip) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 3/8/2019.]
August 5, 2015 Filing 188 Appendix in Support filed by Mamie Baumann, Terence Beven, MD, Wanda Bevis, Thomas E Bowden, Linda Boyd, James Brown, Murphy Buell, Jerry Burris, John Buscheme, Virginia Buscheme, Robert Bush, Anita Ellen Carter, Ira Causey, Clyde J Chisholm, Joseph Chustz, Jr., Darrell Courville, Ralph D D'Amore, William Dawson, Fred Demarest, Kenneth Doughtery, Marcel Dumestre, Margaret Dumestre, Gwen Fabre, Leah Farr, Joan Feucht, Richard Feucht, Deborah S Forbes, Kendall Forbes, Michael J Giambrone, Robert Gildersleeve, Willa Mae Gildersleeve, Gordon C Gill, Nancy Gill, Charles Hart, William Bruce Johnson, Dennis Kirby, Kerry Kling, Daniel P Landry, Merrill Laplante, Laura Lee, Troy Lillie, Gary Magee, Claude Marquette, Ronald R Marston, Charlie L Massey, Jeanne Anne Mayhall, Bille Ruth McMorris, Ronald McMorris, Virginia McMorris, Lynn Gildersleeve Michelli, Kathleen Mier, Louis Mier, Jacqueline Millett, Bobby Nix, Margaret S Nix, Benny O'Rear, Claudia O'Rear, Arthur Ordoyne, Lonnie Ordoyne, Larry Perkins, Monty Perkins, Lynn J. Phillipe, William Phillips, James Roland, Susan Roland, Charles Sanchez, Mamie Sanchez, Julie Savoy, Robert Schwendimann, Lisa Scrantz, Thomas Slaughter, Larry Smith, Robert Smith, Rodney P Starkey, Carol Stegall, James Stegall, Walter Stone, Terry Tarver, Terry Tullis, Ronald Valentine, Anthony Ventrella, John Wade, Olivia Sue Warnock, Arthur Waxley, Charles White, Kenneth Wilkewitz, Stephen Wilson, Martha Jean Witmer, Sharon Witmer re #187 Memorandum in Opposition (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1, #2 Exhibit(s) 2, #3 Exhibit(s) 3, #4 Exhibit(s) 4, #5 Exhibit(s) 5A, #6 Exhibit(s) 5B, #7 Exhibit(s) 6, #8 Exhibit(s) 7, #9 Exhibit(s) 8, #10 Exhibit(s) 9, #11 Exhibit(s) 10, #12 Exhibit(s) 11, #13 Exhibit(s) 12, #14 Exhibit(s) 13, #15 Exhibit(s) 14, #16 Exhibit(s) 15, #17 Exhibit(s) 16) (Preis, Phillip) Modified on 8/6/2015 (skt). [Transferred from Texas Northern on 3/8/2019.]
August 5, 2015 Filing 187 Memorandum in Opposition filed by Mamie Baumann, Terence Beven, MD, Wanda Bevis, Thomas E Bowden, Linda Boyd, James Brown, Murphy Buell, Jerry Burris, John Buscheme, Virginia Buscheme, Robert Bush, Anita Ellen Carter, Ira Causey, Clyde J Chisholm, Joseph Chustz, Jr., Darrell Courville, Ralph D D'Amore, William Dawson, Fred Demarest, Kenneth Doughtery, Marcel Dumestre, Margaret Dumestre, Gwen Fabre, Leah Farr, Joan Feucht, Richard Feucht, Deborah S Forbes, Kendall Forbes, Michael J Giambrone, Robert Gildersleeve, Willa Mae Gildersleeve, Gordon C Gill, Nancy Gill, Charles Hart, William Bruce Johnson, Dennis Kirby, Kerry Kling, Daniel P Landry, Merrill Laplante, Laura Lee, Troy Lillie, Gary Magee, Claude Marquette, Ronald R Marston, Charlie L Massey, Jeanne Anne Mayhall, Bille Ruth McMorris, Ronald McMorris, Virginia McMorris, Lynn Gildersleeve Michelli, Kathleen Mier, Louis Mier, Jacqueline Millett, Bobby Nix, Margaret S Nix, Benny O'Rear, Claudia O'Rear, Arthur Ordoyne, Lonnie Ordoyne, Larry Perkins, Monty Perkins, Lynn J. Phillipe, William Phillips, James Roland, Susan Roland, Charles Sanchez, Mamie Sanchez, Julie Savoy, Robert Schwendimann, Lisa Scrantz, Thomas Slaughter, Larry Smith, Robert Smith, Rodney P Starkey, Carol Stegall, James Stegall, Walter Stone, Terry Tarver, Terry Tullis, Ronald Valentine, Anthony Ventrella, John Wade, Olivia Sue Warnock, Arthur Waxley, Charles White, Kenneth Wilkewitz, Stephen Wilson, Martha Jean Witmer, Sharon Witmer re: #182 Renewed MOTION of SEI Investments Company and SEI Private Trust Company that the Court Decline to Accept the State Court's Order Regarding Class Certification (Preis, Phillip) Modified on 8/6/2015 (skt). [Transferred from Texas Northern on 3/8/2019.]
July 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 186 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #185 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Parker Lavin. If not already done, Applicant must register as an ECF User within 14 days (LR 5.1(f)). (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 7/24/2015) (chmb) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 3/8/2019.]
July 21, 2015 Filing 185 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing for Attorney Parker Lavin (Filing fee $25; Receipt number 0539-6943151) filed by Indian Harbor Insurance Company (Arnold, John) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 3/8/2019.]
July 15, 2015 Filing 184 Appendix in Support filed by SEI Investments Company, SEI Private Trust Company re #183 Brief/Memorandum in Support of Motion, #182 Renewed Motion of SEI Investments Company and SEI Private Trust Company that the Court Decline to Accept the State Court's Order Regarding Class Certification (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Exhibit(s), #3 Exhibit(s), #4 Exhibit(s), #5 Exhibit(s), #6 Exhibit(s), #7 Exhibit(s), #8 Exhibit(s), #9 Exhibit(s), #10 Exhibit(s), #11 Exhibit(s), #12 Exhibit(s), #13 Exhibit(s), #14 Exhibit(s)) (Laster, Kristen) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 3/8/2019.]
July 15, 2015 Filing 183 Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by SEI Investments Company, SEI Private Trust Company re #182 Renewed Motion of SEI Investments Company and SEI Private Trust Company that the Court Decline to Accept the State Court's Order Regarding Class Certification (Laster, Kristen) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 3/8/2019.]
July 15, 2015 Filing 182 Renewed MOTION of SEI Investments Company and SEI Private Trust Company that the Court Decline to Accept the State Court's Order Regarding Class Certification filed by SEI Investments Company, SEI Private Trust Company (Laster, Kristen) Modified typo on 7/16/2015 (awc). [Transferred from Texas Northern on 3/8/2019.]
July 15, 2015 Filing 181 Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by SEI Investments Company, SEI Private Trust Company re #180 MOTION for Reconsideration or, in the Alternative, Certification for Interlocutory Appeal. (Laster, Kristen) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 3/8/2019.]
July 15, 2015 Filing 180 MOTION for Reconsideration or, in the Alternative, Certification for Interlocutory Appeal filed by SEI Investments Company, SEI Private Trust Company re #174 Order on Motion to Dismiss. (Laster, Kristen) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 3/8/2019.]
July 15, 2015 Filing 179 Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by SEI Investments Company, SEI Private Trust Company re #178 MOTION for Partial Judgment on the Pleadings (Laster, Kristen) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 3/8/2019.]
July 15, 2015 Filing 178 MOTION for Partial Judgment on the Pleadings filed by SEI Investments Company, SEI Private Trust Company (Laster, Kristen) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 3/8/2019.]
July 1, 2015 Filing 177 ANSWER to Complaint filed by SEI Investments Company, SEI Private Trust Company. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Laster, Kristen) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 3/8/2019.]
June 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 176 ORDER: This Court orders Defendants to file motions, if any, challenging the Louisiana state court's decision to certify a class action in this case by 7/15/2015. Response and reply briefs may be filed in accordance with Local Rule 7.1. See N.D. TEX. L.R. 7.1. Because the class certification issues have already been briefed once in state court, the Court is unlikely to grant extensions to this briefing schedule. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 6/24/2015) (twd) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 3/8/2019.]
June 17, 2015 Filing 175 Amendment by Plaintiffs re: #173 Joint Report of Rule 26(F) Conference filed by Mamie Baumann, Terence Beven, MD, Wanda Bevis, Thomas E Bowden, Linda Boyd, James Brown, Murphy Buell, Jerry Burris, John Buscheme, Virginia Buscheme, Robert Bush, Anita Ellen Carter, Ira Causey, Clyde J Chisholm, Joseph Chustz, Jr., Darrell Courville, Ralph D D'Amore, William Dawson, Fred Demarest, Kenneth Doughtery, Marcel Dumestre, Margaret Dumestre, Gwen Fabre, Leah Farr, Joan Feucht, Richard Feucht, Deborah S Forbes, Kendall Forbes, Michael J Giambrone, Robert Gildersleeve, Willa Mae Gildersleeve, Gordon C Gill, Nancy Gill, Charles Hart, William Bruce Johnson, Dennis Kirby, Kerry Kling, Daniel P Landry, Merrill Laplante, Laura Lee, Troy Lillie, Gary Magee, Claude Marquette, Ronald R Marston, Charlie L Massey, Jeanne Anne Mayhall, Bille Ruth McMorris, Ronald McMorris, Virginia McMorris, Lynn Gildersleeve Michelli, Kathleen Mier, Louis Mier, Jacqueline Millett, Bobby Nix, Margaret S Nix, Benny O'Rear, Claudia O'Rear, Arthur Ordoyne, Lonnie Ordoyne, Larry Perkins, Monty Perkins, Lynn J. Phillipe, William Phillips, James Roland, Susan Roland, Charles Sanchez, Mamie Sanchez, Julie Savoy, Robert Schwendimann, Lisa Scrantz, Thomas Slaughter, Larry Smith, Robert Smith, Rodney P Starkey, Carol Stegall, James Stegall, Walter Stone, Terry Tarver, Terry Tullis, Ronald Valentine, Anthony Ventrella, John Wade, Olivia Sue Warnock, Arthur Waxley, Charles White, Kenneth Wilkewitz, Stephen Wilson, Martha Jean Witmer, Sharon Witmer (Preis, Phillip) Modified on 6/17/2015 (twd). [Transferred from Texas Northern on 3/8/2019.]
June 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 174 ***VACATED IN PART PER #198 ORDER*** ORDER denying #134 Amended Motion to Dismiss. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 6/17/2015) (twd) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 3/8/2019.]
June 16, 2015 Filing 173 Joint Report of Rule 26(F) Conference re: #172 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief filed by Allied World Assurance Company (U.S.), Inc., Arch Insurance Company, Mamie Baumann, Terence Beven, MD, Wanda Bevis, Thomas E Bowden, Linda Boyd, James Brown, Murphy Buell, Jerry Burris, John Buscheme, Virginia Buscheme, Robert Bush, Anita Ellen Carter, Ira Causey, Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's of London, Clyde J Chisholm, Joseph Chustz, Jr., Continental Casualty Company, Darrell Courville, Ralph D D'Amore, William Dawson, Fred Demarest, Kenneth Doughtery, Marcel Dumestre, Margaret Dumestre, Gwen Fabre, Leah Farr, Joan Feucht, Richard Feucht, Deborah S Forbes, Kendall Forbes, Michael J Giambrone, Robert Gildersleeve, Willa Mae Gildersleeve, Gordon C Gill, Nancy Gill, Charles Hart, Indian Harbor Insurance Company, William Bruce Johnson, Dennis Kirby, Kerry Kling, Daniel P Landry, Merrill Laplante, Laura Lee, Troy Lillie, Gary Magee, Claude Marquette, Ronald R Marston, Charlie L Massey, Jeanne Anne Mayhall, Bille Ruth McMorris, Ronald McMorris, Virginia McMorris, Lynn Gildersleeve Michelli, Kathleen Mier, Louis Mier, Jacqueline Millett, Bobby Nix, Margaret S Nix, Nutmeg Insurance Company, Benny O'Rear, Claudia O'Rear, Arthur Ordoyne, Lonnie Ordoyne, Larry Perkins, Monty Perkins, Lynn J. Phillipe, William Phillips, James Roland, Susan Roland, SEI Investments Company, SEI Private Trust Company, Charles Sanchez, Mamie Sanchez, Julie Savoy, Robert Schwendimann, Lisa Scrantz, Thomas Slaughter, Larry Smith, Robert Smith, Rodney P Starkey, Carol Stegall, James Stegall, Walter Stone, Terry Tarver, Terry Tullis, Ronald Valentine, Anthony Ventrella, John Wade, Olivia Sue Warnock, Arthur Waxley, Charles White, Kenneth Wilkewitz, Stephen Wilson, Martha Jean Witmer, Sharon Witmer (Preis, Phillip) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 3/8/2019.]
May 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 172 ORDER GRANTING #165 MOTION AND REQUIRING RULE 26(f) CONFERENCE: The parties are hereby ORDERED to hold a Rule 26(f) scheduling conference within 21 days after entry of this order. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Nancy M Koenig on 5/12/2015) (ctf) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 3/8/2019.]
April 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 171 ORDER: This Order addresses Defendant Endurance Specialty Insurance Ltd.'s ("Endurance") motion to dismiss #155 . Because Endurance is not subject to personal jurisdiction in Louisiana, the Court grants Endurance's motion. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 4/7/2015) (ctf) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 3/8/2019.]
April 3, 2015 Filing 170 Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Allied World Assurance Company (U.S.), Inc., Arch Insurance Company, Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's of London, Continental Casualty Company, Endurance Specialty Insurance, Ltd., Indian Harbor Insurance Company, Nutmeg Insurance Company, SEI Investments Company, SEI Private Trust Company re #169 Response/Objection, (Laster, Kristen) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 3/8/2019.]
April 3, 2015 Filing 169 RESPONSE AND OBJECTION filed by Allied World Assurance Company (U.S.), Inc., Arch Insurance Company, Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's of London, Continental Casualty Company, Endurance Specialty Insurance, Ltd., Indian Harbor Insurance Company, Nutmeg Insurance Company, SEI Investments Company, SEI Private Trust Company re: #165 MOTION for a Rule 26(f) Scheduling Conference and Request for Entry of a Scheduling Order (Laster, Kristen) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 3/8/2019.]
March 16, 2015 Filing 168 ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to #165 MOTION for a Rule 26(f) Scheduling Conference and Request for Entry of a Scheduling Order by Plaintiffs Mamie Baumann, Terence Beven, MD, Wanda Bevis, Thomas E Bowden, Linda Boyd, James Brown, Murphy Buell, Jerry Burris, John Buscheme, Virginia Buscheme, Robert Bush, Anita Ellen Carter, Ira Causey, Clyde J Chisholm, Joseph Chustz, Jr., Darrell Courville, Ralph D D'Amore, William Dawson, Fred Demarest, Kenneth Doughtery, Marcel Dumestre, Margaret Dumestre, Gwen Fabre, Leah Farr, Joan Feucht, Richard Feucht, Deborah S Forbes, Kendall Forbes, Michael J Giambrone, Robert Gildersleeve, Willa Mae Gildersleeve, Gordon C Gill, Nancy Gill, Charles Hart, William Bruce Johnson, Dennis Kirby, Kerry Kling, Daniel P Landry, Merrill Laplante, Laura Lee, Troy Lillie, Gary Magee, Claude Marquette, Ronald R Marston, Charlie L Massey, Jeanne Anne Mayhall, Bille Ruth McMorris, Ronald McMorris, Virginia McMorris, Lynn Gildersleeve Michelli, Kathleen Mier, Louis Mier, Jacqueline Millett, Bobby Nix, Margaret S Nix, Benny O'Rear, Claudia O'Rear, Arthur Ordoyne, Lonnie Ordoyne, Larry Perkins, Monty Perkins, Lynn J. Phillipe, William Phillips, James Roland, Susan Roland, Charles Sanchez, Mamie Sanchez, Julie Savoy, Robert Schwendimann, Lisa Scrantz, Thomas Slaughter, Larry Smith, Robert Smith, Rodney P Starkey, Carol Stegall, James Stegall, Walter Stone, Terry Tarver, Terry Tullis, Ronald Valentine, Anthony Ventrella, John Wade, Olivia Sue Warnock, Arthur Waxley, Charles White, Kenneth Wilkewitz, Stephen Wilson, Martha Jean Witmer, Sharon Witmer. (Preis, Phillip) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 3/8/2019.]
March 13, 2015 Filing 167 Appendix in Support filed by Mamie Baumann, Terence Beven, MD, Wanda Bevis, Thomas E Bowden, Linda Boyd, James Brown, Murphy Buell, Jerry Burris, John Buscheme, Virginia Buscheme, Robert Bush, Anita Ellen Carter, Ira Causey, Clyde J Chisholm, Joseph Chustz, Jr., Darrell Courville, Ralph D D'Amore, William Dawson, Fred Demarest, Kenneth Doughtery, Marcel Dumestre, Margaret Dumestre, Gwen Fabre, Leah Farr, Joan Feucht, Richard Feucht, Deborah S Forbes, Kendall Forbes, Michael J Giambrone, Robert Gildersleeve, Willa Mae Gildersleeve, Gordon C Gill, Nancy Gill, Charles Hart, William Bruce Johnson, Dennis Kirby, Kerry Kling, Daniel P Landry, Merrill Laplante, Laura Lee, Troy Lillie, Gary Magee, Claude Marquette, Ronald R Marston, Charlie L Massey, Jeanne Anne Mayhall, Bille Ruth McMorris, Ronald McMorris, Virginia McMorris, Lynn Gildersleeve Michelli, Kathleen Mier, Louis Mier, Jacqueline Millett, Bobby Nix, Margaret S Nix, Benny O'Rear, Claudia O'Rear, Arthur Ordoyne, Lonnie Ordoyne, Larry Perkins, Monty Perkins, Lynn J. Phillipe, William Phillips, James Roland, Susan Roland, Charles Sanchez, Mamie Sanchez, Julie Savoy, Robert Schwendimann, Lisa Scrantz, Thomas Slaughter, Larry Smith, Robert Smith, Rodney P Starkey, Carol Stegall, James Stegall, Walter Stone, Terry Tarver, Terry Tullis, Ronald Valentine, Anthony Ventrella, John Wade, Olivia Sue Warnock, Arthur Waxley, Charles White, Kenneth Wilkewitz, Stephen Wilson, Martha Jean Witmer, Sharon Witmer re #165 MOTION for a Rule 26(f) Scheduling Conference and Request for Entry of a Scheduling Order (Preis, Phillip) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 3/8/2019.]
March 13, 2015 Filing 166 Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Mamie Baumann, Terence Beven, MD, Wanda Bevis, Thomas E Bowden, Linda Boyd, James Brown, Murphy Buell, Jerry Burris, John Buscheme, Virginia Buscheme, Robert Bush, Anita Ellen Carter, Ira Causey, Clyde J Chisholm, Joseph Chustz, Jr., Darrell Courville, Ralph D D'Amore, William Dawson, Fred Demarest, Kenneth Doughtery, Marcel Dumestre, Margaret Dumestre, Gwen Fabre, Leah Farr, Joan Feucht, Richard Feucht, Deborah S Forbes, Kendall Forbes, Michael J Giambrone, Robert Gildersleeve, Willa Mae Gildersleeve, Gordon C Gill, Nancy Gill, Charles Hart, William Bruce Johnson, Dennis Kirby, Kerry Kling, Daniel P Landry, Merrill Laplante, Laura Lee, Troy Lillie, Gary Magee, Claude Marquette, Ronald R Marston, Charlie L Massey, Jeanne Anne Mayhall, Bille Ruth McMorris, Ronald McMorris, Virginia McMorris, Lynn Gildersleeve Michelli, Kathleen Mier, Louis Mier, Jacqueline Millett, Bobby Nix, Margaret S Nix, Benny O'Rear, Claudia O'Rear, Arthur Ordoyne, Lonnie Ordoyne, Larry Perkins, Monty Perkins, Lynn J. Phillipe, William Phillips, James Roland, Susan Roland, Charles Sanchez, Mamie Sanchez, Julie Savoy, Robert Schwendimann, Lisa Scrantz, Thomas Slaughter, Larry Smith, Robert Smith, Rodney P Starkey, Carol Stegall, James Stegall, Walter Stone, Terry Tarver, Terry Tullis, Ronald Valentine, Anthony Ventrella, John Wade, Olivia Sue Warnock, Arthur Waxley, Charles White, Kenneth Wilkewitz, Stephen Wilson, Martha Jean Witmer, Sharon Witmer re #165 MOTION for a Rule 26(f) Scheduling Conference and Request for Entry of a Scheduling Order (Preis, Phillip) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 3/8/2019.]
March 13, 2015 Filing 165 MOTION for a Rule 26(f) Scheduling Conference and Request for Entry of a Scheduling Order filed by Mamie Baumann, Terence Beven, MD, Wanda Bevis, Thomas E Bowden, Linda Boyd, James Brown, Murphy Buell, Jerry Burris, John Buscheme, Virginia Buscheme, Robert Bush, Anita Ellen Carter, Ira Causey, Clyde J Chisholm, Joseph Chustz, Jr., Darrell Courville, Ralph D D'Amore, William Dawson, Fred Demarest, Kenneth Doughtery, Marcel Dumestre, Margaret Dumestre, Gwen Fabre, Leah Farr, Joan Feucht, Richard Feucht, Deborah S Forbes, Kendall Forbes, Michael J Giambrone, Robert Gildersleeve, Willa Mae Gildersleeve, Gordon C Gill, Nancy Gill, Charles Hart, William Bruce Johnson, Dennis Kirby, Kerry Kling, Daniel P Landry, Merrill Laplante, Laura Lee, Troy Lillie, Gary Magee, Claude Marquette, Ronald R Marston, Charlie L Massey, Jeanne Anne Mayhall, Bille Ruth McMorris, Ronald McMorris, Virginia McMorris, Lynn Gildersleeve Michelli, Kathleen Mier, Louis Mier, Jacqueline Millett, Bobby Nix, Margaret S Nix, Benny O'Rear, Claudia O'Rear, Arthur Ordoyne, Lonnie Ordoyne, Larry Perkins, Monty Perkins, Lynn J. Phillipe, William Phillips, James Roland, Susan Roland, Charles Sanchez, Mamie Sanchez, Julie Savoy, Robert Schwendimann, Lisa Scrantz, Thomas Slaughter, Larry Smith, Robert Smith, Rodney P Starkey, Carol Stegall, James Stegall, Walter Stone, Terry Tarver, Terry Tullis, Ronald Valentine, Anthony Ventrella, John Wade, Olivia Sue Warnock, Arthur Waxley, Charles White, Kenneth Wilkewitz, Stephen Wilson, Martha Jean Witmer, Sharon Witmer (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Preis, Phillip) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 3/8/2019.]
January 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 164 ORDER STRIKING AND UNFILING DOCUMENT re: #160 Ex Parte Motion to Withdraw as Attorney and Substitute Counsel of Record due to the following deficiency: The motion must include a certificate of conference or inability to confer. See LR 7.1(b) or LCrR 47.1(b). (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 1/20/2015) (ctf) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 3/8/2019.]
December 23, 2014 Filing 163 REPLY filed by Endurance Specialty Insurance, Ltd. re: #155 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Endurance Specialty Insurance Ltd. (Force, Joshua) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 3/8/2019.]
December 10, 2014 Filing 162 Appendix in Support filed by Mamie Baumann, Terence Beven, MD, Wanda Bevis, Thomas E Bowden, Linda Boyd, James Brown, Murphy Buell, Jerry Burris, John Buscheme, Virginia Buscheme, Robert Bush, Anita Ellen Carter, Ira Causey, Clyde J Chisholm, Joseph Chustz, Jr., Darrell Courville, Ralph D D'Amore, William Dawson, Fred Demarest, Kenneth Doughtery, Marcel Dumestre, Margaret Dumestre, Gwen Fabre, Leah Farr, Joan Feucht, Richard Feucht, Deborah S Forbes, Kendall Forbes, Michael J Giambrone, Robert Gildersleeve, Willa Mae Gildersleeve, Gordon C Gill, Nancy Gill, Charles Hart, William Bruce Johnson, Dennis Kirby, Kerry Kling, Daniel P Landry, Merrill Laplante, Laura Lee, Troy Lillie, Gary Magee, Claude Marquette, Ronald R Marston, Charlie L Massey, Jeanne Anne Mayhall, Bille Ruth McMorris, Ronald McMorris, Virginia McMorris, Lynn Gildersleeve Michelli, Kathleen Mier, Louis Mier, Jacqueline Millett, Bobby Nix, Margaret S Nix, Nutmeg Insurance Company, Benny O'Rear, Claudia O'Rear, Arthur Ordoyne, Lonnie Ordoyne, Larry Perkins, Monty Perkins, Lynn J. Phillipe, William Phillips, James Roland, Susan Roland, Charles Sanchez, Mamie Sanchez, Julie Savoy, Robert Schwendimann, Lisa Scrantz, Thomas Slaughter, Larry Smith, Robert Smith, Rodney P Starkey, Carol Stegall, James Stegall, Walter Stone, Terry Tarver, Terry Tullis, Ronald Valentine, Anthony Ventrella, John Wade, Olivia Sue Warnock, Arthur Waxley, Charles White, Kenneth Wilkewitz, Stephen Wilson, Martha Jean Witmer, Sharon Witmer re #161 Response/Objection,,,,,, To Defendant Endurance Specialty Insurance Ltd.'s Motion to Dismiss (Preis, Phillip) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 3/8/2019.]
December 10, 2014 Filing 161 RESPONSE AND OBJECTION filed by Mamie Baumann, Terence Beven, MD, Wanda Bevis, Thomas E Bowden, Linda Boyd, James Brown, Murphy Buell, Jerry Burris, John Buscheme, Virginia Buscheme, Robert Bush, Anita Ellen Carter, Ira Causey, Clyde J Chisholm, Joseph Chustz, Jr., Continental Casualty Company, Darrell Courville, Ralph D D'Amore, William Dawson, Fred Demarest, Kenneth Doughtery, Marcel Dumestre, Margaret Dumestre, Gwen Fabre, Leah Farr, Joan Feucht, Richard Feucht, Deborah S Forbes, Kendall Forbes, Michael J Giambrone, Robert Gildersleeve, Willa Mae Gildersleeve, Gordon C Gill, Nancy Gill, Charles Hart, William Bruce Johnson, Dennis Kirby, Kerry Kling, Daniel P Landry, Merrill Laplante, Laura Lee, Troy Lillie, Gary Magee, Claude Marquette, Ronald R Marston, Charlie L Massey, Jeanne Anne Mayhall, Bille Ruth McMorris, Ronald McMorris, Virginia McMorris, Lynn Gildersleeve Michelli, Kathleen Mier, Louis Mier, Jacqueline Millett, Bobby Nix, Margaret S Nix, Benny O'Rear, Claudia O'Rear, Arthur Ordoyne, Lonnie Ordoyne, Larry Perkins, Monty Perkins, Lynn J. Phillipe, William Phillips, James Roland, Susan Roland, Charles Sanchez, Mamie Sanchez, Julie Savoy, Robert Schwendimann, Lisa Scrantz, Thomas Slaughter, Larry Smith, Robert Smith, Rodney P Starkey, Carol Stegall, James Stegall, Walter Stone, Terry Tarver, Terry Tullis, Ronald Valentine, Anthony Ventrella, John Wade, Olivia Sue Warnock, Arthur Waxley, Charles White, Kenneth Wilkewitz, Stephen Wilson, Martha Jean Witmer, Sharon Witmer re: #155 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Endurance Specialty Insurance Ltd. (Preis, Phillip) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 3/8/2019.]
December 3, 2014 Filing 160 ***UNFILED PER #164 ORDER***Ex Parte MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney and Substitute Counsel of Record filed by Allied World Assurance Company (U.S.), Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Barrasso, Judy) Modified on 1/20/2015 (ctf). [Transferred from Texas Northern on 3/8/2019.]
November 26, 2014 Filing 159 RESPONSE filed by SEI Investments Company, SEI Private Trust Company re: #158 MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply Memorandum in Opposition to SEI Defendants' Amended Motion to Dismiss (Laster, Kristen) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 3/8/2019.]
November 24, 2014 Filing 158 MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply Memorandum in Opposition to SEI Defendants' Amended Motion to Dismiss filed by all Plaintiffs with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit(s) 1 - Sur-Reply Memorandum in Opposition to SEI Defendants' Amended Motion to Dismiss, #3 Exhibit(s) Appendix A - Plaintiffs' Appendix to Sur-Reply Memorandum in Opposition to SEI Defendants' Amended Motion to Dismiss) (Preis, Phillip) Modified to reduce text on 11/25/2014 (skt). [Transferred from Texas Northern on 3/8/2019.]
November 19, 2014 Filing 157 Appendix in Support filed by Endurance Specialty Insurance, Ltd. re #155 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Endurance Specialty Insurance Ltd. (Force, Joshua) Modified linkage on 11/20/2014 (skt). [Transferred from Texas Northern on 3/8/2019.]
November 19, 2014 Filing 156 Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Endurance Specialty Insurance, Ltd. re #155 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Endurance Specialty Insurance Ltd. (Force, Joshua) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 3/8/2019.]
November 19, 2014 Filing 155 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Endurance Specialty Insurance Ltd. filed by Endurance Specialty Insurance, Ltd. (Force, Joshua) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 3/8/2019.]
November 18, 2014 Filing 154 USCA5 Order...Motion for leave to appeal under 28 U.S.C. 1453 is denied. (svc) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 3/8/2019.]
November 14, 2014 Filing 153 Appendix in Support filed by SEI Investments Company, SEI Private Trust Company re 152 Sealed and/or Ex Parte Reply/Sur-reply, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Uniform Securities Act 1985 Section 605 APP79-84) (Laster, Kristen) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 3/8/2019.]
October 31, 2014 Filing 144 (Document Restricted) SEALED IRA Plaintiffs' Memorandum in Opposition to SEI Defendants' Amended Motion to Dismiss (Sealed pursuant to motion to seal) filed by Mamie Baumann, Terence Beven, MD, Wanda Bevis, Thomas E Bowden, Linda Boyd, James Brown, Murphy Buell, Jerry Burris, John Buscheme, Virginia Buscheme, Robert Bush, Anita Ellen Carter, Ira Causey, Clyde J Chisholm, Joseph Chustz, Jr., Darrell Courville, Ralph D D'Amore, William Dawson, Fred Demarest, Kenneth Doughtery, Marcel Dumestre, Margaret Dumestre, Gwen Fabre, Leah Farr, Joan Feucht, Richard Feucht, Deborah S Forbes, Kendall Forbes, Michael J Giambrone, Robert Gildersleeve, Willa Mae Gildersleeve, Gordon C Gill, Nancy Gill, Charles Hart, William Bruce Johnson, Dennis Kirby, Kerry Kling, Daniel P Landry, Merrill Laplante, Laura Lee, Troy Lillie, Gary Magee, Claude Marquette, Ronald R Marston, Charlie L Massey, Jeanne Anne Mayhall, Bille Ruth McMorris, Ronald McMorris, Virginia McMorris, Lynn Gildersleeve Michelli, Kathleen Mier, Louis Mier, Jacqueline Millett, Bobby Nix, Margaret S Nix, Benny O'Rear, Claudia O'Rear, Arthur Ordoyne, Lonnie Ordoyne, Larry Perkins, Monty Perkins, Lynn J. Phillipe, William Phillips, James Roland, Susan Roland, Charles Sanchez, Mamie Sanchez, Julie Savoy, Robert Schwendimann, Lisa Scrantz, Thomas Slaughter, Larry Smith, Robert Smith, Rodney P Starkey, Carol Stegall, James Stegall, Walter Stone, Terry Tarver, Terry Tullis, Ronald Valentine, Anthony Ventrella, John Wade, Olivia Sue Warnock, Arthur Waxley, Charles White, Kenneth Wilkewitz, Stephen Wilson, Martha Jean Witmer, Sharon Witmer (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) SEALED IRA Plaintiffs' Memorandum in Opposition to SEI Defendants' Amended Motion to Dismiss, #2 Proposed Order) (Preis, Phillip) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 3/8/2019.]
October 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 143 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #140 Motion to Expedite and for Extension of Time. Responses due by 10/31/2014. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 10/21/2014) (chmb) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 3/8/2019.]
October 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 142 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #139 Motion to Extend Time to File Response/Reply. Responses due by 11/19/2014 (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 10/17/2014) (chmb) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 3/8/2019.]
October 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 141 ELECTRONIC ORDER: Responses re: #140 MOTION to Expedite and MOTION to Extend Time to File Opposition to SEI's Amended Motion to Dismiss due by 12:00 p.m on Monday, October 20, 2014. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 10/16/2014) (gmg) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 3/8/2019.]
October 15, 2014 Filing 140 MOTION to Expedite , MOTION to Extend Time to File Opposition to SEI's Amended Motion to Dismiss() filed by Mamie Baumann, Terence Beven, MD, Wanda Bevis, Thomas E Bowden, Linda Boyd, James Brown, Murphy Buell, Jerry Burris, John Buscheme, Virginia Buscheme, Robert Bush, Anita Ellen Carter, Ira Causey, Clyde J Chisholm, Joseph Chustz, Jr., Darrell Courville, Ralph D D'Amore, William Dawson, Fred Demarest, Kenneth Doughtery, Marcel Dumestre, Margaret Dumestre, Gwen Fabre, Leah Farr, Joan Feucht, Richard Feucht, Deborah S Forbes, Kendall Forbes, Michael J Giambrone, Robert Gildersleeve, Willa Mae Gildersleeve, Gordon C Gill, Nancy Gill, Charles Hart, William Bruce Johnson, Dennis Kirby, Kerry Kling, Daniel P Landry, Merrill Laplante, Laura Lee, Troy Lillie, Gary Magee, Claude Marquette, Ronald R Marston, Charlie L Massey, Jeanne Anne Mayhall, Bille Ruth McMorris, Ronald McMorris, Virginia McMorris, Lynn Gildersleeve Michelli, Kathleen Mier, Louis Mier, Jacqueline Millett, Bobby Nix, Margaret S Nix, Benny O'Rear, Claudia O'Rear, Arthur Ordoyne, Lonnie Ordoyne, Larry Perkins, Monty Perkins, Lynn J. Phillipe, William Phillips, James Roland, Susan Roland, Charles Sanchez, Mamie Sanchez, Julie Savoy, Robert Schwendimann, Lisa Scrantz, Thomas Slaughter, Larry Smith, Robert Smith, Rodney P Starkey, Carol Stegall, James Stegall, Walter Stone, Terry Tarver, Terry Tullis, Ronald Valentine, Anthony Ventrella, John Wade, Olivia Sue Warnock, Arthur Waxley, Charles White, Kenneth Wilkewitz, Stephen Wilson, Martha Jean Witmer, Sharon Witmer (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Preis, Phillip) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 3/8/2019.]
October 14, 2014 Filing 139 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to #81 Remark filed by Endurance Specialty Insurance, Ltd. with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Force, Joshua) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 3/8/2019.]
October 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 138 ORDER: This Order addresses Plaintiffs' motion to remand [Doc. #24 ]. Because jurisdiction is proper in this Court under the Class Action Fairness Act of 2005 ("CAFA"), and because the Rooker-Feldman doctrine does not apply, the Court denies Plaintiffs' motion and declines to remand the case. The Court also denies Defendants' motion for a Rule 16 conference #109 and Plaintiffs' motion for a status conference #118 as moot. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 10/6/2014) (ctf) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 3/8/2019.]
October 1, 2014 Filing 137 Appendix in Support filed by SEI Investments Company, SEI Private Trust Company re #136 (Document Restricted) Brief in Support of The SEI Defendants' Amended Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended and Restated Class Action Petition (Sealed pursuant to motion to seal) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A-Protective and Confidentiality Order-APP 1-4, #2 Exhibit(s) B-Excerpts of Transcript-APP5-10) (Laster, Kristen) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 3/8/2019.]
October 1, 2014 Filing 136 (Document Restricted) Unopposed Motion to File Under Seal their Brief in Support of The SEI Defendants' Amended Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended and Restated Class Action Petition (Sealed pursuant to motion to seal) filed by SEI Investments Company, SEI Private Trust Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1-Brief in Support of SEI Defendants' Amended Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended and Restated Class Action Petition) (Laster, Kristen) Expanded text on 10/2/2014 (dsr). [Transferred from Texas Northern on 3/8/2019.]
October 1, 2014 Filing 135 Appendix in Support filed by SEI Investments Company, SEI Private Trust Company re #134 Amended MOTION to Dismiss [Amended Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended and Restated Class Action Petition] (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A-Trust Svcs & Custody Agreement between Stanford Trust and SEI Private Trust- APP1-66, #2 Exhibit(s) B-Demaraest IRA Account Statement-APP67-72, #3 Exhibit(s) C-Excerpts of Transcript-APP73-78) (Laster, Kristen) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 3/8/2019.]
October 1, 2014 Filing 134 Amended MOTION to Dismiss [Amended Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended and Restated Class Action Petition] filed by SEI Investments Company, SEI Private Trust Company (Laster, Kristen) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 3/8/2019.]
September 29, 2014 Filing 133 Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Allied World Assurance Company (U.S.), Inc., Arch Insurance Company, Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's of London, Continental Casualty Company, Endurance Specialty Insurance, Ltd., Indian Harbor Insurance Company, Nutmeg Insurance Company re #24 , #131 Order, in Response to Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand (Torian, Robert) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 3/8/2019.]
September 29, 2014 Filing 132 REPLY filed by Mamie Baumann, Terence Beven, MD, Wanda Bevis, Thomas E Bowden, Linda Boyd, James Brown, Murphy Buell, Jerry Burris, John Buscheme, Virginia Buscheme, Robert Bush, Anita Ellen Carter, Ira Causey, Clyde J Chisholm, Joseph Chustz, Jr., Darrell Courville, Ralph D D'Amore, William Dawson, Fred Demarest, Kenneth Doughtery, Marcel Dumestre, Margaret Dumestre, Gwen Fabre, Leah Farr, Joan Feucht, Richard Feucht, Deborah S Forbes, Kendall Forbes, Michael J Giambrone, Robert Gildersleeve, Willa Mae Gildersleeve, Gordon C Gill, Nancy Gill, Charles Hart, William Bruce Johnson, Dennis Kirby, Kerry Kling, Daniel P Landry, Merrill Laplante, Laura Lee, Troy Lillie, Gary Magee, Claude Marquette, Ronald R Marston, Charlie L Massey, Jeanne Anne Mayhall, Bille Ruth McMorris, Ronald McMorris, Virginia McMorris, Lynn Gildersleeve Michelli, Kathleen Mier, Louis Mier, Jacqueline Millett, Bobby Nix, Margaret S Nix, Benny O'Rear, Claudia O'Rear, Arthur Ordoyne, Lonnie Ordoyne, Larry Perkins, Monty Perkins, Lynn J. Phillipe, William Phillips, James Roland, Susan Roland, Charles Sanchez, Mamie Sanchez, Julie Savoy, Robert Schwendimann, Lisa Scrantz, Thomas Slaughter, Larry Smith, Robert Smith, Rodney P Starkey, Carol Stegall, James Stegall, Walter Stone, Terry Tarver, Terry Tullis, Ronald Valentine, Anthony Ventrella, John Wade, Olivia Sue Warnock, Arthur Waxley, Charles White, Kenneth Wilkewitz, Stephen Wilson, Martha Jean Witmer, Sharon Witmer re: #131 Order, (Preis, Phillip) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 3/8/2019.]
September 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 131 ORDER: This Order addresses Plaintiffs' motion to remand [Doc. #24 ]. Both parties request the opportunity to update briefing. Accordingly, the Court orders that both parties file any supplemental briefing to Plaintiffs' motion to remand within fourteen (14) days of this Order. Briefing shall not exceed five pages, and neither party will be given the opportunity to reply. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 9/15/2014) (tln) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 3/8/2019.]
August 29, 2014 Filing 130 REPLY filed by SEI Investments Company, SEI Private Trust Company re: #129 Status Report,,,,,, (Laster, Kristen) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 3/8/2019.]
August 22, 2014 Filing 129 STATUS REPORT Supplemental Response to Question Posed At Court Ordered Status Conference filed by Mamie Baumann, Terence Beven, MD, Wanda Bevis, Thomas E Bowden, Linda Boyd, James Brown, Murphy Buell, Jerry Burris, John Buscheme, Virginia Buscheme, Robert Bush, Anita Ellen Carter, Ira Causey, Clyde J Chisholm, Joseph Chustz, Jr., Darrell Courville, Ralph D D'Amore, William Dawson, Fred Demarest, Kenneth Doughtery, Marcel Dumestre, Margaret Dumestre, Gwen Fabre, Leah Farr, Joan Feucht, Richard Feucht, Deborah S Forbes, Kendall Forbes, Michael J Giambrone, Robert Gildersleeve, Willa Mae Gildersleeve, Gordon C Gill, Nancy Gill, Charles Hart, William Bruce Johnson, Dennis Kirby, Kerry Kling, Daniel P Landry, Merrill Laplante, Laura Lee, Troy Lillie, Gary Magee, Claude Marquette, Ronald R Marston, Charlie L Massey, Jeanne Anne Mayhall, Bille Ruth McMorris, Ronald McMorris, Virginia McMorris, Lynn Gildersleeve Michelli, Kathleen Mier, Louis Mier, Jacqueline Millett, Bobby Nix, Margaret S Nix, Benny O'Rear, Claudia O'Rear, Arthur Ordoyne, Lonnie Ordoyne, Larry Perkins, Monty Perkins, Lynn J. Phillipe, William Phillips, James Roland, Susan Roland, Charles Sanchez, Mamie Sanchez, Julie Savoy, Robert Schwendimann, Lisa Scrantz, Thomas Slaughter, Larry Smith, Robert Smith, Rodney P Starkey, Carol Stegall, James Stegall, Walter Stone, Terry Tarver, Terry Tullis, Ronald Valentine, Anthony Ventrella, John Wade, Olivia Sue Warnock, Arthur Waxley, Charles White, Kenneth Wilkewitz, Stephen Wilson, Martha Jean Witmer, Sharon Witmer. (Preis, Phillip) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 3/8/2019.]
August 21, 2014 Filing 128 ELECTRONIC Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge David C Godbey: Status Conference held on 8/21/2014. Attorney Appearances: SEC - David Reece; Receiver- Kevin Sadler, Michael Kuckelman, Douglas Buncher; Examiner- John Little; Defense - Jonathan Polkes, Ashley Kleber, Brian Tagtmeier, Robert Plotkin, Phil Preis, Jesse Castillo, Edward Valdepino, and Randy Pulman. (Court Reporter: Linda Langford) (No exhibits) Time in Court - 01:11. (chmb) (jkm) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 3/8/2019.]
August 20, 2014 Filing 127 RESPONSE filed by Allied World Assurance Company (U.S.), Inc., Arch Insurance Company, Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's of London, Continental Casualty Company, Endurance Specialty Insurance, Ltd., Indian Harbor Insurance Company, Nutmeg Insurance Company, SEI Investments Company, SEI Private Trust Company re: #125 Status Report,,,,,, (Schmeeckle, Seth) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 3/8/2019.]
August 19, 2014 Filing 126 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Zachary I Rosenberg on behalf of Allied World Assurance Company (U.S.), Inc.. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Rosenberg, Zachary) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 3/8/2019.]
August 18, 2014 Filing 125 IRA Class Plaintiffs' Memorandum Based Upon Court Ordered Status Conference filed by Mamie Baumann, Terence Beven, MD, Wanda Bevis, Thomas E Bowden, Linda Boyd, James Brown, Murphy Buell, Jerry Burris, John Buscheme, Virginia Buscheme, Robert Bush, Anita Ellen Carter, Ira Causey, Clyde J Chisholm, Joseph Chustz, Jr., Darrell Courville, Ralph D D'Amore, William Dawson, Fred Demarest, Kenneth Doughtery, Marcel Dumestre, Margaret Dumestre, Gwen Fabre, Leah Farr, Joan Feucht, Richard Feucht, Deborah S Forbes, Kendall Forbes, Michael J Giambrone, Robert Gildersleeve, Willa Mae Gildersleeve, Gordon C Gill, Nancy Gill, Charles Hart, William Bruce Johnson, Dennis Kirby, Kerry Kling, Daniel P Landry, Merrill Laplante, Laura Lee, Troy Lillie, Gary Magee, Claude Marquette, Ronald R Marston, Charlie L Massey, Jeanne Anne Mayhall, Bille Ruth McMorris, Ronald McMorris, Virginia McMorris, Lynn Gildersleeve Michelli, Kathleen Mier, Louis Mier, Jacqueline Millett, Bobby Nix, Margaret S Nix, Benny O'Rear, Claudia O'Rear, Arthur Ordoyne, Lonnie Ordoyne, Larry Perkins, Monty Perkins, Lynn J. Phillipe, William Phillips, James Roland, Susan Roland, Charles Sanchez, Mamie Sanchez, Julie Savoy, Robert Schwendimann, Lisa Scrantz, Thomas Slaughter, Larry Smith, Robert Smith, Rodney P Starkey, Carol Stegall, James Stegall, Walter Stone, Terry Tarver, Terry Tullis, Ronald Valentine, Anthony Ventrella, John Wade, Olivia Sue Warnock, Arthur Waxley, Charles White, Kenneth Wilkewitz, Stephen Wilson, Martha Jean Witmer, Sharon Witmer. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A-F to IRA Class Plaintiffs' Memorandum Based Upon Court Ordered Status Conference) (Preis, Phillip) Modified text on 8/20/2014 (skt). [Transferred from Texas Northern on 3/8/2019.]
July 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 124 The Court will hold a status hearing for all parties to the Stanford MDL proceeding on 8/21/2014 10:00 AM in US Courthouse, Courtroom 1505, 1100 Commerce St., Dallas, TX 75242-1310 before Judge David C Godbey. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 7/22/2014) (jkm) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 3/8/2019.]
April 11, 2014 Filing 123 RESPONSE filed by Endurance Specialty Insurance, Ltd. re: #118 MOTION for Status Conference By Universal IRA Plaintiffs (Force, Joshua) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 3/8/2019.]
April 10, 2014 Filing 122 RESPONSE filed by SEI Investments Company, SEI Private Trust Company re: #118 MOTION for Status Conference By Universal IRA Plaintiffs (Laster, Kristen) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 3/8/2019.]
April 10, 2014 Filing 121 RESPONSE filed by Allied World Assurance Company (U.S.), Inc., Arch Insurance Company, Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's of London, Continental Casualty Company, Indian Harbor Insurance Company, Nutmeg Insurance Company re: #118 MOTION for Status Conference By Universal IRA Plaintiffs (Barrasso, Judy) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 3/8/2019.]
April 2, 2014 Filing 120 Appendix in Support filed by Mamie Baumann, Terence Beven, MD, Wanda Bevis, Thomas E Bowden, Linda Boyd, James Brown, Murphy Buell, Jerry Burris, John Buscheme, Virginia Buscheme, Robert Bush, Anita Ellen Carter, Ira Causey, Clyde J Chisholm, Joseph Chustz, Jr., Darrell Courville, Ralph D D'Amore, William Dawson, Fred Demarest, Kenneth Doughtery, Marcel Dumestre, Margaret Dumestre, Gwen Fabre, Leah Farr, Joan Feucht, Richard Feucht, Deborah S Forbes, Kendall Forbes, Michael J Giambrone, Robert Gildersleeve, Willa Mae Gildersleeve, Gordon C Gill, Nancy Gill, Charles Hart, William Bruce Johnson, Dennis Kirby, Kerry Kling, Daniel P Landry, Merrill Laplante, Laura Lee, Troy Lillie, Gary Magee, Claude Marquette, Ronald R Marston, Charlie L Massey, Jeanne Anne Mayhall, Bille Ruth McMorris, Ronald McMorris, Virginia McMorris, Lynn Gildersleeve Michelli, Kathleen Mier, Louis Mier, Jacqueline Millett, Bobby Nix, Margaret S Nix, Benny O'Rear, Claudia O'Rear, Arthur Ordoyne, Lonnie Ordoyne, Larry Perkins, Monty Perkins, Lynn J. Phillipe, William Phillips, James Roland, Susan Roland, Charles Sanchez, Mamie Sanchez, Julie Savoy, Robert Schwendimann, Lisa Scrantz, Thomas Slaughter, Larry Smith, Robert Smith, Rodney P Starkey, Carol Stegall, James Stegall, Walter Stone, Terry Tarver, Terry Tullis, Ronald Valentine, Anthony Ventrella, John Wade, Olivia Sue Warnock, Arthur Waxley, Charles White, Kenneth Wilkewitz, Stephen Wilson, Martha Jean Witmer, Sharon Witmer re #119 Brief/Memorandum in Support of Motion,,,,,, #118 MOTION for Status Conference By Universal IRA Plaintiffs (Preis, Phillip) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 3/8/2019.]
April 2, 2014 Filing 119 Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Mamie Baumann, Terence Beven, MD, Wanda Bevis, Thomas E Bowden, Linda Boyd, James Brown, Murphy Buell, Jerry Burris, John Buscheme, Virginia Buscheme, Robert Bush, Anita Ellen Carter, Ira Causey, Clyde J Chisholm, Joseph Chustz, Jr., Darrell Courville, Ralph D D'Amore, William Dawson, Fred Demarest, Kenneth Doughtery, Marcel Dumestre, Margaret Dumestre, Gwen Fabre, Leah Farr, Joan Feucht, Richard Feucht, Deborah S Forbes, Kendall Forbes, Michael J Giambrone, Robert Gildersleeve, Willa Mae Gildersleeve, Gordon C Gill, Nancy Gill, Charles Hart, William Bruce Johnson, Dennis Kirby, Kerry Kling, Daniel P Landry, Merrill Laplante, Laura Lee, Troy Lillie, Gary Magee, Claude Marquette, Ronald R Marston, Charlie L Massey, Jeanne Anne Mayhall, Bille Ruth McMorris, Ronald McMorris, Virginia McMorris, Lynn Gildersleeve Michelli, Kathleen Mier, Louis Mier, Jacqueline Millett, Bobby Nix, Margaret S Nix, Benny O'Rear, Claudia O'Rear, Arthur Ordoyne, Lonnie Ordoyne, Larry Perkins, Monty Perkins, Lynn J. Phillipe, William Phillips, James Roland, Susan Roland, Charles Sanchez, Mamie Sanchez, Julie Savoy, Robert Schwendimann, Lisa Scrantz, Thomas Slaughter, Larry Smith, Robert Smith, Rodney P Starkey, Carol Stegall, James Stegall, Walter Stone, Terry Tarver, Terry Tullis, Ronald Valentine, Anthony Ventrella, John Wade, Olivia Sue Warnock, Arthur Waxley, Charles White, Kenneth Wilkewitz, Stephen Wilson, Martha Jean Witmer, Sharon Witmer re #118 MOTION for Status Conference By Universal IRA Plaintiffs (Preis, Phillip) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 3/8/2019.]
April 2, 2014 Filing 118 MOTION for Status Conference By Universal IRA Plaintiffs filed by Mamie Baumann, Terence Beven, MD, Wanda Bevis, Thomas E Bowden, Linda Boyd, James Brown, Murphy Buell, Jerry Burris, John Buscheme, Virginia Buscheme, Robert Bush, Anita Ellen Carter, Ira Causey, Clyde J Chisholm, Joseph Chustz, Jr., Darrell Courville, Ralph D D'Amore, William Dawson, Fred Demarest, Kenneth Doughtery, Marcel Dumestre, Margaret Dumestre, Gwen Fabre, Leah Farr, Joan Feucht, Richard Feucht, Deborah S Forbes, Kendall Forbes, Michael J Giambrone, Robert Gildersleeve, Willa Mae Gildersleeve, Gordon C Gill, Nancy Gill, Charles Hart, William Bruce Johnson, Dennis Kirby, Kerry Kling, Daniel P Landry, Merrill Laplante, Laura Lee, Troy Lillie, Gary Magee, Claude Marquette, Ronald R Marston, Charlie L Massey, Jeanne Anne Mayhall, Bille Ruth McMorris, Ronald McMorris, Virginia McMorris, Lynn Gildersleeve Michelli, Kathleen Mier, Louis Mier, Jacqueline Millett, Bobby Nix, Margaret S Nix, Benny O'Rear, Claudia O'Rear, Arthur Ordoyne, Lonnie Ordoyne, Larry Perkins, Monty Perkins, Lynn J. Phillipe, William Phillips, James Roland, Susan Roland, Charles Sanchez, Mamie Sanchez, Julie Savoy, Robert Schwendimann, Lisa Scrantz, Thomas Slaughter, Larry Smith, Robert Smith, Rodney P Starkey, Carol Stegall, James Stegall, Walter Stone, Terry Tarver, Terry Tullis, Ronald Valentine, Anthony Ventrella, John Wade, Olivia Sue Warnock, Arthur Waxley, Charles White, Kenneth Wilkewitz, Stephen Wilson, Martha Jean Witmer, Sharon Witmer (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Preis, Phillip) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 3/8/2019.]
February 24, 2014 Filing 117 USCA5 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that the petition for writ of mandamus is DENIED. #13-11084 (svc) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 3/8/2019.]
February 13, 2014 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Nancy M. Koenig per Order entered on 2/13/14 (gmg) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 3/8/2019.]
February 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 116 It is ordered that all matters and motions previously referred to the Honorable E. Scott Frost, United States Magistrate Judge, in the In re Stanford Entities Securities Litigation multidistrict litigation, are now hereby referred to the Honorable Nancy M. Koenig, United States Magistrate Judge, except for two matters outlined in the order. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 2/13/2014) (gmg) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 3/8/2019.]
December 23, 2013 Filing 115 RESPONSE filed by Mamie Baumann, Terence Beven, MD, Wanda Bevis, Thomas E Bowden, Linda Boyd, James Brown, Murphy Buell, Jerry Burris, John Buscheme, Virginia Buscheme, Robert Bush, Anita Ellen Carter, Ira Causey, Clyde J Chisholm, Joseph Chustz, Jr., Darrell Courville, Ralph D D'Amore, William Dawson, Fred Demarest, Kenneth Doughtery, Marcel Dumestre, Margaret Dumestre, Gwen Fabre, Leah Farr, Joan Feucht, Richard Feucht, Deborah S Forbes, Kendall Forbes, Michael J Giambrone, Robert Gildersleeve, Willa Mae Gildersleeve, Gordon C Gill, Nancy Gill, Charles Hart, William Bruce Johnson, Dennis Kirby, Kerry Kling, Daniel P Landry, Merrill Laplante, Laura Lee, Troy Lillie, Gary Magee, Claude Marquette, Ronald R Marston, Charlie L Massey, Jeanne Anne Mayhall, Bille Ruth McMorris, Ronald McMorris, Virginia McMorris, Lynn Gildersleeve Michelli, Kathleen Mier, Louis Mier, Jacqueline Millett, Bobby Nix, Margaret S Nix, Benny O'Rear, Claudia O'Rear, Arthur Ordoyne, Lonnie Ordoyne, Larry Perkins, Monty Perkins, Lynn J. Phillipe, William Phillips, James Roland, Susan Roland, Charles Sanchez, Mamie Sanchez, Julie Savoy, Robert Schwendimann, Lisa Scrantz, Thomas Slaughter, Larry Smith, Robert Smith, Rodney P Starkey, Carol Stegall, James Stegall, Walter Stone, Terry Tarver, Terry Tullis, Ronald Valentine, Anthony Ventrella, John Wade, Olivia Sue Warnock, Arthur Waxley, Charles White, Kenneth Wilkewitz, Stephen Wilson, Martha Jean Witmer, Sharon Witmer re: #113 Order, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A--Lillie Plaintiffs' Mandamus Petition at U.S. Fifth Circuit Court of Appeals) (Preis, Phillip) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 3/8/2019.]
December 23, 2013 Filing 114 RESPONSE filed by SEI Investments Company, SEI Private Trust Company re: #113 Order, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Ex A - Def Memo re Mtn Requesting Rule 16 Conf) (Laster, Kristen) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 3/8/2019.]
December 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 113 ORDER requesting input regarding the priority of decision in various matters pending in all cases within the In re Stanford Entities Securities Litigation. Input must be filed with the Court within twenty-one (21) days of the date of this Order. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 12/3/2013) (gmg) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 3/8/2019.]
December 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 112 ORDER: Status Hearing for all parties to the Stanford MDL proceeding set for 1/16/2014 10:00 AM in US Courthouse, Courtroom 1505, 1100 Commerce St., Dallas, TX 75242-1310 before Judge David C Godbey. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 12/2/2013) (gmg) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 3/8/2019.]
September 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 111 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #104 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of J. Gordon Cooney, Jr.. If not already done, Applicant must register as an ECF User within 14 days (LR 5.1(f)). (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 9/13/2013) (chmb) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 3/8/2019.]
September 11, 2013 Filing 110 Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Allied World Assurance Company (U.S.), Inc., Arch Insurance Company, Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's of London, Continental Casualty Company, Endurance Specialty Insurance, Ltd., Nutmeg Insurance Company, SEI Investments Company, SEI Private Trust Company re #109 MOTION Requesting a Rule 16 Conference (Laster, Kristen) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 3/8/2019.]
September 11, 2013 Filing 109 MOTION Requesting a Rule 16 Conference filed by Allied World Assurance Company (U.S.), Inc., Arch Insurance Company, Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's of London, Continental Casualty Company, Endurance Specialty Insurance, Ltd., Indian Harbor Insurance Company, Nutmeg Insurance Company, SEI Investments Company, SEI Private Trust Company (Laster, Kristen) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 3/8/2019.]
September 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #100 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Elizabeth Hoop Fay. If not already done, Applicant must register as an ECF User within 14 days (LR 5.1(f)). (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 9/6/2013) (chmb) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 3/8/2019.]
September 5, 2013 Filing 107 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Defendants SEI Investment Company and SEI Private Trust Company's Motion for New Trial filed by SEI Investments Company, SEI Private Trust Company (Laster, Kristen) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 3/8/2019.]
September 5, 2013 Filing 106 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Defendants SEI Investment Company and SEI Private Trust Company's Motion to Reduce the Estimated Costs of Appeal filed by SEI Investments Company, SEI Private Trust Company (Laster, Kristen) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 3/8/2019.]
September 5, 2013 Filing 105 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Joshua Simon Force on behalf of Endurance Specialty Insurance, Ltd.. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Force, Joshua) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 3/8/2019.]
September 5, 2013 Filing 104 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing for Attorney J. Gordon Cooney, Jr. (Filing fee $25; Receipt number 0539-5536737) filed by SEI Investments Company, SEI Private Trust Company with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order) (Laster, Kristen) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 3/8/2019.]
September 4, 2013 Filing 103 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Robert E Torian on behalf of Continental Casualty Company. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Torian, Robert) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 3/8/2019.]
September 4, 2013 Filing 102 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Seth A Schmeeckle on behalf of Nutmeg Insurance Company. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Schmeeckle, Seth) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 3/8/2019.]
September 4, 2013 Filing 101 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Judy Y Barrasso on behalf of Allied World Assurance Company (U.S.), Inc.. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Barrasso, Judy) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 3/8/2019.]
September 3, 2013 Filing 100 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing for Attorney Elizabeth Hoop Fay (Filing fee $25; Receipt number 0539-5530979) filed by SEI Investments Company, SEI Private Trust Company with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order) (Laster, Kristen) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 3/8/2019.]
September 3, 2013 Filing 99 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Kristen Ann Laster on behalf of SEI Investments Company, SEI Private Trust Company. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Laster, Kristen) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 3/8/2019.]
August 30, 2013 Filing 98 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by David W Crowe on behalf of Arch Insurance Company, Indian Harbor Insurance Company. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Crowe, David) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 3/8/2019.]
August 30, 2013 Filing 97 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Stefan Roane Dandelles on behalf of Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's of London. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Dandelles, Stefan) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 3/8/2019.]
August 8, 2013 Filing 96 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. File to Judge Godbey. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Frost). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (cea) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 3/8/2019.]
August 8, 2013 Filing 95 Case electronically transferred in from District of Louisiana Middle; Case Number 3:13-cv-00150. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas should seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. Copy of NEF to be sent US Mail to parties not electronically noticed. [Transferred from Texas Northern on 3/8/2019.]
August 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 94 Order Transferring Case to JPML Court. Electronic letter sent. (LLH) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 8/9/2013.] [Transferred from Texas Northern on 3/8/2019.]
August 8, 2013 Filing 93 Initial Conditional Transfer Order from the JPML Panel. (Attachments: #1 MinuteEntry NEF) (LLH) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 8/9/2013.] [Transferred from Texas Northern on 3/8/2019.]
August 8, 2013 Filing 92 Letter dated 8/08/13 from Juston M. O'Brien to Judge James J. Brady Re: Transfer Order issued in MDL No. 2099 on August 7, 2013. (Attachments: #1 Attachment)(O'Brien, Juston) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 8/9/2013.] [Transferred from Texas Northern on 3/8/2019.]
June 17, 2013 Filing 91 Letter dated 6/17/13 from Juston M. O'Brien to Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. Re: CTO 8 in MDL No. 2099. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Notice of Hearing Session from MDL)(O'Brien, Juston) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 8/9/2013.] [Transferred from Texas Northern on 3/8/2019.]
June 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER granting #77 Second Ex Parte Motion for Extension of Time to Plead. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr on 06/12/2013. (SMG) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 8/9/2013.] [Transferred from Texas Northern on 3/8/2019.]
June 5, 2013 Filing 89 Surreply MEMORANDUM in Further Support of #64 Memorandum in Opposition to #24 MOTION to Remand filed by Allied World Assurance Company (U.S.), Inc., Arch Insurance Company, Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's of London, Continental Casualty Company, Indian Harbor Insurance Company, Nutmeg Insurance Company. (SMG) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 8/9/2013.] [Transferred from Texas Northern on 3/8/2019.]
June 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER granting #78 MOTION for Leave to File Surreply filed by Indian Harbor Insurance Company, Nutmeg Insurance Company, Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's of London, Allied World Assurance Company (U.S.), Inc., Continental Casualty Company, Arch Insurance Company. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr on 06/04/2013. (SMG) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 8/9/2013.] [Transferred from Texas Northern on 3/8/2019.]
June 5, 2013 Filing 87 Plaintiff's REPLY Memorandum in Response to #64 Response Memorandum to #24 MOTION to Remand and in Support of Motion to Remand filed by All Plaintiffs. (SMG) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 8/9/2013.] [Transferred from Texas Northern on 3/8/2019.]
June 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER granting #70 MOTION for Leave to File Reply Memorandum in Response to Insurer Defendants' "Response to Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand and Memorandum of Law in Support" filed by All Plaintiffs. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr on 06/04/2013. (SMG) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 8/9/2013.] [Transferred from Texas Northern on 3/8/2019.]
June 5, 2013 Filing 85 Supplemental MEMORANDUM in Support of #27 MOTION for Expedited Briefing Schedule, Expedited Status Conference, and Expedited Consideration of Their Motion to Remand filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(SMG) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 8/9/2013.] [Transferred from Texas Northern on 3/8/2019.]
June 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER granting #37 MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Memorandum in Support of "Plaintiffs' Motion for Expedited Briefing Schedule, Expedited Status Conference, and Expedited Consideration of Their Motion to Remand" filed by All Plaintiffs. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr on 06/04/2013. (SMG) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 8/9/2013.] [Transferred from Texas Northern on 3/8/2019.]
June 5, 2013 Filing 83 SEALED Exhibits to #24 Pltfs Motion to Remand. (JDL) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 8/9/2013.] (Main Document 83 replaced on 3/8/2019) (twd). [Transferred from Texas Northern on 3/8/2019.]
June 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER granting #28 Sealed Motion for Leave to File Exhibits to #24 Pltfs Motion to Remand Under Seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr on 6/4/2013. (JDL) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 8/9/2013.] (Main Document 82 replaced on 3/8/2019) (twd). [Transferred from Texas Northern on 3/8/2019.]
June 5, 2013 Filing 81 SEALED Pltfs First Amended and Restated Class Action Petition. (JDL) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 8/9/2013.] (Main Document 81 replaced on 3/8/2019) (twd). [Transferred from Texas Northern on 3/8/2019.]
June 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER granting #4 Sealed Motion for Leave to file Plaintiff's First Amended and Restated Class Action Petition Under Seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr on 6/4/2013. (JDL) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 8/9/2013.] (Main Document 80 replaced on 3/8/2019) (twd). [Transferred from Texas Northern on 3/8/2019.]
April 26, 2013 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #79 MOTION for Joinder with #78 MOTION for Leave to File Surreply filed by Indian Harbor Insurance Company, Nutmeg Insurance Company, Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's of London, Allied World Assurance Company (U.S.), Inc., Conti. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (SMG) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 8/9/2013.] [Transferred from Texas Northern on 3/8/2019.]
April 26, 2013 Filing 79 Defendant Endurance Specialty Insurance Ltd.'s Joinder In, and Adoption by Reference of, #78 MOTION for Leave to File Surreply and Memorandum in Further Support of Insurer Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand filed by Indian Harbor Insurance Company, Nutmeg Insurance Company, Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's of London, Allied World Assurance Company (U.S.), Inc., Continental Casualty Company, Arch Insurance Company by Endurance Specialty Insurance, Ltd. (Force, Joshua) Modified to edit text on 4/30/2013 (SMG). [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 8/9/2013.] [Transferred from Texas Northern on 3/8/2019.]
April 26, 2013 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #78 MOTION for Leave to File Surreply . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (SMG) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 8/9/2013.] [Transferred from Texas Northern on 3/8/2019.]
April 26, 2013 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #77 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to Re-File Its Responsive Pleading. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (SMG) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 8/9/2013.] [Transferred from Texas Northern on 3/8/2019.]
April 26, 2013 Filing 78 MOTION for Leave to File Surreply by Allied World Assurance Company (U.S.), Inc., Arch Insurance Company, Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's of London, Indian Harbor Insurance Company, Nutmeg Insurance Company and Continental Casualty Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading; Order, #2 Proposed Pleading; Surreply Memorandum in Further Support of Insurer Defendants' Opposition to Motion to Remand)(Barrasso, Judy) Modified on 4/26/2013 to add additional filer (DCB). [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 8/9/2013.] [Transferred from Texas Northern on 3/8/2019.]
April 26, 2013 Filing 77 Second Ex Parte MOTION for Extension of Time to Re-File Its Responsive Pleading by Endurance Specialty Insurance, Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading;)(Force, Joshua) Modified to edit text on 4/26/2013 (SMG). [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 8/9/2013.] [Transferred from Texas Northern on 3/8/2019.]
April 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER granting #63 Motion for Elizabeth Hoop Fay to Appear Pro Hac Vice as co-counsel for SEI Investments Company and SEI Private Trust Company. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr on 4/22/2013. (JDL) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 8/9/2013.] [Transferred from Texas Northern on 3/8/2019.]
April 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER granting #69 Motion for J. Gordon Cooney, Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice as co-counsel for SEI Investments Company and SEI Private Trust Company. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr on 4/22/2013. (JDL) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 8/9/2013.] [Transferred from Texas Northern on 3/8/2019.]
April 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER granting #53 Motion for Extension of Time to Plead and Endurance Specialty Insurance, Ltd. shall have an additional 21 days, or up to and including 4/16/2013, to respond to Plaintiffs First Amended and Restated Class Action Petition. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr on 4/22/2013. (JDL) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 8/9/2013.] [Transferred from Texas Northern on 3/8/2019.]
April 22, 2013 Filing 73 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to #59 MOTION to Remand and Sever Claims MOTION to Sever filed by All Plaintiffs. (Preis, Phillip) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 8/9/2013.] [Transferred from Texas Northern on 3/8/2019.]
April 22, 2013 Filing 72 JOINDER in, and Adoption by Reference of #71 Insurer Defts Response to the #59 Motion to Remand and to Sever by Endurance Specialty Insurance, Ltd.. (Force, Joshua) Modified on 4/23/2013 to edit text (JDL). [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 8/9/2013.] [Transferred from Texas Northern on 3/8/2019.]
April 22, 2013 Filing 71 RESPONSE To #59 Motion of the State of Louisiana Through The Office of Financial Institutions to Remand and to Sever Claims and Memorandum of Law in Support filed by Allied World Assurance Company (U.S.), Inc., Arch Insurance Company, Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's of London, Continental Casualty Company, Indian Harbor Insurance Company, Nutmeg Insurance Company. (Torian, Robert) Modified on 4/22/2013 to edit text (JDL). [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 8/9/2013.] [Transferred from Texas Northern on 3/8/2019.]
April 17, 2013 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #70 MOTION for Leave to File Reply Memorandum in Response to Insurer Defendants' "Response to Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand and Memorandum of Law in Support" . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (LLH) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 8/9/2013.] [Transferred from Texas Northern on 3/8/2019.]
April 17, 2013 Filing 70 MOTION for Leave to File Reply Memorandum in Response to Insurer Defendants' "Response to Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand and Memorandum of Law in Support" by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading; Order, #2 Proposed Pleading; Plaintiffs' Reply Memorandum in Response to Insuer Defendants' Response Memorandum to Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand)(Preis, Phillip) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 8/9/2013.] [Transferred from Texas Northern on 3/8/2019.]
April 15, 2013 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #69 MOTION for J. Gordon Cooney, Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (JDL) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 8/9/2013.] [Transferred from Texas Northern on 3/8/2019.]
April 15, 2013 Filing 69 MOTION for J. Gordon Cooney, Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $100.00, Receipt Number 053N-934910) by SEI Investments Company, SEI Private Trust Company. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Oath for Admission)(Holmes, Duris)[Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 8/9/2013.] [Transferred from Texas Northern on 3/8/2019.]
April 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 68 NOTICE and ORDER: Considering the pending #24 MOTION to Remand presently before the Magistrate judge for report and recommendation; IT IS ORDERED that the #51 MOTION That The Court Decline To Adopt The State Court's Order Regarding Class Certification and the #65 MOTION to Dismiss for lack of personal jurisdiction and improper venue filed by Endurance Specialty Insurance, Ltd. be and are hereby be DISMISSED from the court's docket, without prejudice to the movers renewing said motions upon a determination of removal jurisdiction. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 4/12/2013. (JDL) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 8/9/2013.] [Transferred from Texas Northern on 3/8/2019.]
April 9, 2013 Filing 67 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Endurance Specialty Insurance, Ltd.. (Force, Joshua) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 8/9/2013.] [Transferred from Texas Northern on 3/8/2019.]
April 9, 2013 Filing 66 JOINDER and Memorandum regarding Additional Basis for #1 Removal and #64 Memorandum in Opposition of #24 Motion to Remand by Endurance Specialty Insurance, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Insurance Policy)(Force, Joshua) Modified on 4/10/2013 to edit text (JDL). [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 8/9/2013.] [Transferred from Texas Northern on 3/8/2019.]
April 9, 2013 Filing 65 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Improper Venue by Endurance Specialty Insurance, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit 1- PA SECRETARY OF STATE WEBSITE, #3 Affidavit exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit A- Insurance Policy, #5 Exhibit 3- Anti-Suit Injunction, #6 Exhibit 4- Email, #7 Exhibit 5- Bermuda Authority, #8 Exhibit 6- Bermuda Authority)(Force, Joshua) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 8/9/2013.] [Transferred from Texas Northern on 3/8/2019.]
April 9, 2013 Filing 64 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to #24 MOTION to Remand filed by Allied World Assurance Company (U.S.), Inc., Arch Insurance Company, Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's of London, Continental Casualty Company, Indian Harbor Insurance Company, Nutmeg Insurance Company. (Torian, Robert) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 8/9/2013.] [Transferred from Texas Northern on 3/8/2019.]
April 8, 2013 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #63 MOTION for Elizabeth Hoop Fay to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Filing fee $100.00, Receipt Number 053N-932480). This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (JDL) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 8/9/2013.] [Transferred from Texas Northern on 3/8/2019.]
April 8, 2013 Filing 63 MOTION for Elizabeth Hoop Fay to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $100.00, Receipt Number 053N-932480) by SEI Investments Company, SEI Private Trust Company. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Elizabeth Hoop Fay, #2 Oath for Admission, #3 Proposed Order)(Holmes, Duris) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 8/9/2013.] [Transferred from Texas Northern on 3/8/2019.]
April 8, 2013 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #29 MOTION for Order Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1447(b) Requiring Removing Defendants to Supplement Federal Court Record with Certified Copy of State Court Record . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (NLT) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 8/9/2013.] [Transferred from Texas Northern on 3/8/2019.]
April 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER granting #34 Motion to Enroll Additional Counsel. Added attorney Daniel B. Centner for Nutmeg Insurance Company. Seth A. Schmeeckle is designated as trial counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr on 4/2/2013. (JDL) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 8/9/2013.] [Transferred from Texas Northern on 3/8/2019.]
April 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER granting #31 Motion to Enroll Additional Counsel. Added attorney Robert E. Kerrigan, Jr, Michael H. Rubin, Juston M. O'Brien for SEI Investments Company and SEI Private Trust Company. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr on 4/2/2013. (JDL) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 8/9/2013.] [Transferred from Texas Northern on 3/8/2019.]
April 1, 2013 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #59 MOTION to Sever. (JDL) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 8/9/2013.] [Transferred from Texas Northern on 3/8/2019.]
April 1, 2013 Filing 60 JOINDER in SEI's Opposition to #27 MOTION for Expedited Briefing Schedule, Expedited Status Conference, and Expedited Consideration of Their Motion to Remand filed by Allied World Assurance Company (U.S.) Inc., Continental Casualty Company, Arch Insurance Company, Indian Harbor Insurance Company, Nutmeg Insurance Company, and Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London. (Burns, Robert) Modified on 4/2/2013 to edit text (JDL). [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 8/9/2013.] [Transferred from Texas Northern on 3/8/2019.]
April 1, 2013 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #59 MOTION to Remand and Sever Claims. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (JDL) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 8/9/2013.] [Transferred from Texas Northern on 3/8/2019.]
April 1, 2013 Filing 59 MOTION to Remand and Sever Claims by Office of Financial Institutions State of Louisiana. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Attachment)(Latham, David). Added MOTION to Sever on 4/2/2013 (JDL). [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 8/9/2013.] [Transferred from Texas Northern on 3/8/2019.]
March 28, 2013 Filing 58 SEALED Exhibits to Class Certification Hearing. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits)(JDL) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 8/9/2013.] (Main Document 58 replaced on 3/8/2019) (twd). (Attachment 1 replaced on 3/8/2019) (twd). [Transferred from Texas Northern on 3/8/2019.]
March 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER granting #55 Sealed Motion for leave to File Exhibits to Class Certification Hearing Under Seal. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 3/28/2013. (JDL) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 8/9/2013.] (ali). [Transferred from Texas Northern on 3/8/2019.]
March 27, 2013 Filing 56 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to #29 MOTION for Order Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1447(b) Requiring Removing Defendants to Supplement Federal Court Record with Certified Copy of State Court Record filed by Allied World Assurance Company (U.S.), Inc.. (Barrasso, Judy) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 8/9/2013.] [Transferred from Texas Northern on 3/8/2019.]
March 27, 2013 Filing 55 SEALED MOTION for Leave to File Plaintiffs' Confidential Exhibits to the Class Certification Hearing Under Seal by Allied World Assurance Company (U.S.), Inc., Arch Insurance Company, Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's of London, Continental Casualty Company, Indian Harbor Insurance Company, Nutmeg Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Exhibits to Class Certification Hearing, #2 Attachment Exhibits to Class Certification Hearing Part 2, #3 Attachment Exhibits to Class Certification Hearing Part 3, #4 Attachment Exhibits to Class Certification Hearing Part 4, #5 Attachment Exhibits to Class Certification Hearing Part 5, #6 Affidavit Exhibits to Class Certification Hearing Part 6, #7 Attachment Exhibits to Class Certification Hearing Part 7, #8 Attachment Exhibits to Class Certification Hearing Part 8, #9 Attachment Exhibits to Class Certification Hearing Part 9, #10 Attachment Exhibits to Class Certification Hearing Part 10, #11 Attachment Exhibits to Class Certification Hearing Part 11, #12 Attachment Exhibits to Class Certification Hearing Part 12, #13 Attachment Exhibits to Class Certification Hearing Part 13, #14 Attachment Exhibits to Class Certification Hearing Part 14, #15 Attachment Exhibits to Class Certification Hearing Part 15, #16 Attachment Exhibits to Class Certification Hearing Part 16, #17 Attachment Exhibits to Class Certification Hearing Part 17, #18 Attachment Propsoed Order)(Barrasso, Judy) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 8/9/2013.] [Transferred from Texas Northern on 3/8/2019.]
March 27, 2013 Filing 54 Supplemental NOTICE of Filing State Court Record and Amended Exhibit A to Notice of Removal by Allied World Assurance Company (U.S.), Inc. re #42 Exhibit(s),, #41 Exhibit(s),,, #45 Exhibit(s),,, #50 Exhibit(s),,, #44 Exhibit(s),,, #38 Notice of (other),,,, #48 Exhibit(s),,,, #40 Exhibit(s),,,, #47 Exhibit(s),,,, #43 Exhibit(s),,, #39 Exhibit(s),,, #49 Exhibit(s),,, #46 Exhibit(s),,, (Barrasso, Judy) Modified on 3/27/2013 to edit docket text(CGP). [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 8/9/2013.] [Transferred from Texas Northern on 3/8/2019.]
March 26, 2013 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #53 Ex Parte MOTION for Extension of Time to Plead to Plaintiffs' First Amended and Restated Class Action Petition. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (SMG) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 8/9/2013.] [Transferred from Texas Northern on 3/8/2019.]
March 26, 2013 Filing 53 Ex Parte MOTION for Extension of Time to Plead to Plaintiffs' First Amended and Restated Class Action Petition by Endurance Specialty Insurance, Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Force, Joshua) Modified to edit text on 3/27/2013 (SMG). [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 8/9/2013.] [Transferred from Texas Northern on 3/8/2019.]
March 25, 2013 Filing 52 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to #27 MOTION for Expedited Briefing Schedule, Expedited Status Conference, and Expedited Consideration of Their Motion to Remand filed by SEI Investments Company, SEI Private Trust Company. (Holmes, Duris) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 8/9/2013.] [Transferred from Texas Northern on 3/8/2019.]
March 25, 2013 Filing 51 MOTION That The Court Decline To Adopt The State Court's Order Regarding Class Certification by SEI Investments Company, SEI Private Trust Company. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit A to Memorandum, #3 Exhibit B to Memorandum, #4 Proposed Order)(Holmes, Duris) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 8/9/2013.] [Transferred from Texas Northern on 3/8/2019.]
March 25, 2013 Filing 50 NOTICE of Filing State Court Record and Amended Exhibit A to Notice of Removal. (Attachments: #1 Attachment State Court Pleadings Part 196, #2 Attachment State Court Pleadings Part 197, #3 Attachment State Court Pleadings Part 198, #4 Attachment State Court Pleadings Part 199, #5 Attachment State Court Pleadings Part 200, #6 Attachment State Court Pleadings Part 201, #7 Attachment State Court Pleadings Part 202, #8 Attachment State Court Pleadings Part 203, #9 Attachment State Court Pleadings Part 204, #10 Attachment State Court Pleadings Part 205, #11 Attachment State Court Pleadings Part 206, #12 Attachment State Court Pleadings Part 207, #13 Attachment State Court Pleadings Part 208, #14 Attachment Amended Ex. A)(Barrasso, Judy) Modified on 3/25/2013 to edit docket text (CGP). [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 8/9/2013.] [Transferred from Texas Northern on 3/8/2019.]
March 25, 2013 Filing 49 NOTICE of Filing a State Court Record and Amended Exhibit A to Notice of Removal. (Attachments: #1 Attachment State Court Pleadings Part 181, #2 Attachment State Court Pleadings Part 182, #3 Attachment State Court Pleadings Part 183, #4 Attachment State Court Pleadings Part 184, #5 Attachment State Court Pleadings Part 185, #6 Attachment State Court Pleadings Part 186, #7 Attachment State Court Pleadings Part 187, #8 Attachment State Court Pleadings Part 188, #9 Attachment State Court Pleadings Part 189, #10 Attachment State Court Pleadings Part 190, #11 Attachment State Court Pleadings Part 191, #12 Attachment State Court Pleadings Part 192, #13 Attachment State Court Pleadings Part 193, #14 Attachment State Court Pleadings Part 194, #15 Attachment State Court Pleadings Part 195)(Barrasso, Judy) Modified on 3/25/2013 to edit docket text(CGP). [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 8/9/2013.] [Transferred from Texas Northern on 3/8/2019.]
March 25, 2013 Filing 48 NOTICE of Filing State Court Record and Amended Exhibit A to Notice of Removal (Attachments: #1 Attachment State Court Pleadings Part 163, #2 Attachment State Court Pleadings Part 164, #3 Attachment State Court Pleadings Part 165, #4 Attachment State Court Pleadings Part 166, #5 Attachment State Court Pleadings Part 167, #6 Attachment State Court Pleadings Part 168, #7 Attachment State Court Pleadings Part 169, #8 Attachment State Court Pleadings Part 170, #9 Attachment State Court Pleadings Part 171, #10 Attachment State Court Pleadings Part 172, #11 Attachment State Court Pleadings Part 173, #12 Attachment State Court Pleadings Part 174, #13 Attachment State Court Pleadings Part 175, #14 Attachment State Court Pleadings Part 176, #15 Attachment State Court Pleadings Part 177, #16 Attachment State Court Pleadings Part 178, #17 Attachment State Court Pleadings Part 179, #18 Attachment State Court Pleadings Part 180)(Barrasso, Judy) Modified on 3/25/2013 to edit docket text (CGP). [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 8/9/2013.] [Transferred from Texas Northern on 3/8/2019.]
March 25, 2013 Filing 47 NOTICE OF Filing State Court Record and Amended Exhibit A to Notice of Removal. (Attachments: #1 Attachment State Court Pleadings Part 145, #2 Attachment State Court Pleadings Part 146, #3 Attachment State Court Pleadings Part 147, #4 Attachment State Court Pleadings Part 148, #5 Attachment State Court Pleadings Part 149, #6 Attachment State Court Pleadings Part 150, #7 Attachment State Court Pleadings Part 151, #8 Attachment State Court Pleadings Part 152, #9 Attachment State Court Pleadings Part 153, #10 Attachment State Court Pleadings Part 154, #11 Attachment State Court Pleadings Part 155, #12 Attachment State Court Pleadings Part 156, #13 Attachment State Court Pleadings Part 157, #14 Attachment State Court Pleadings Part 158, #15 Attachment State Court Pleadings Part 159, #16 Attachment State Court Pleadings Part 160, #17 Attachment State Court Pleadings Part 161, #18 Attachment State Court Pleadings Part 162)(Barrasso, Judy) Modified on 3/25/2013 to edit docket text (CGP). [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 8/9/2013.] [Transferred from Texas Northern on 3/8/2019.]
March 25, 2013 Filing 46 NOTICE of Filing State Court Record and Amended Exhibit A to Notice of Removal.(Attachments: #1 Attachment State Court Pleadings Part 128, #2 Attachment State Court Pleadings Part 129, #3 Attachment State Court Pleadings Part 130, #4 Attachment State Court Pleadings Part 131, #5 Attachment State Court Pleadings Part 132, #6 Attachment State Court Pleadings Part 133, #7 Attachment State Court Pleadings Part 134, #8 Attachment State Court Pleadings Part 135, #9 Attachment State Court Pleadings Part 136, #10 Attachment State Court Pleadings Part 137, #11 Attachment State Court Pleadings Part 138, #12 Attachment State Court Pleadings Part 139, #13 Attachment State Court Pleadings Part 140, #14 Attachment State Court Pleadings Part 141, #15 Attachment State Court Pleadings Part 142, #16 Attachment State Court Pleadings Part 143, #17 Attachment State Court Pleadings Part 144)(Barrasso, Judy) Modified on 3/25/2013 to edit docket text(CGP). [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 8/9/2013.] [Transferred from Texas Northern on 3/8/2019.]
March 25, 2013 Filing 45 NOTICE of Filing State Court Record and Amended Exhibit A to Notice of Removal. (Attachments: #1 Attachment State Court Pleadings Part 111, #2 Attachment State Court Pleadings Part 112, #3 Attachment State Court Pleadings Part 113, #4 Attachment State Court Pleadings Part 114, #5 Attachment State Court Pleadings Part 115, #6 Attachment State Court Pleadings Part 116, #7 Attachment State Court Pleadings Part 117, #8 Attachment State Court Pleadings Part 118, #9 Attachment State Court Pleadings Part 119, #10 Attachment State Court Pleadings Part 120, #11 Attachment State Court Pleadings Part 121, #12 Attachment State Court Pleadings Part 122, #13 Attachment State Court Pleadings Part 123, #14 Attachment State Court Pleadings Part 124, #15 Attachment State Court Pleadings Part 125, #16 Attachment State Court Pleadings Part 126, #17 Attachment State Court Pleadings Part 127)(Barrasso, Judy) Modified on 3/25/2013 to edit docket text (CGP).[Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 8/9/2013.] [Transferred from Texas Northern on 3/8/2019.]
March 25, 2013 Filing 44 NOTICE of Filing State Court Record and Amended Exhibit A to Notice of Removal (Attachments: #1 Attachment State Court Pleadings Part 96, #2 Attachment State Court Pleadings Part 97, #3 Attachment State Court Pleadings Part 98, #4 Attachment State Court Pleadings Part 99, #5 Attachment State Court Pleadings Part 100, #6 Attachment State Court Pleadings Part 101, #7 Attachment State Court Pleadings Part 102, #8 Attachment State Court Pleadings Part 103, #9 Attachment State Court Pleadings Part 104, #10 Attachment State Court Pleadings Part 105, #11 Attachment State Court Pleadings Part 106, #12 Attachment State Court Pleadings Part 107, #13 Attachment State Court Pleadings Part 108, #14 Attachment State Court Pleadings Part 109, #15 Attachment State Court Pleadings Part 110)(Barrasso, Judy) Modified on 3/25/2013 to edit docket text(CGP). [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 8/9/2013.] [Transferred from Texas Northern on 3/8/2019.]
March 25, 2013 Filing 43 NOTICE of Filing State Court Record and Amended Exhibit A to Notice of Removal (Attachments: #1 Attachment State Court Pleadings 78, #2 Attachment State Court Pleadings 79, #3 Attachment State Court Pleadings 80, #4 Attachment State Court Pleadings 81, #5 Attachment State Court Pleadings 82, #6 Attachment State Court Pleadings 83, #7 Attachment State Court Pleadings 84, #8 Attachment State Court Pleadings 85, #9 Attachment State Court Pleadings 86, #10 Attachment State Court Pleadings 87, #11 Attachment State Court Pleadings 88, #12 Attachment State Court Pleadings 89, #13 Attachment State Court Pleadings 90, #14 Attachment State Court Pleadings 91, #15 Attachment State Court Pleadings 92, #16 Attachment State Court Pleadings 93, #17 Attachment State Court Pleadings 94, #18 Attachment State Court Pleadings 95)(Barrasso, Judy) Modified on 3/25/2013 to edit docket text (CGP). [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 8/9/2013.] [Transferred from Texas Northern on 3/8/2019.]
March 25, 2013 Filing 42 NOTICE of Filing State Court Record and Amended Exhibit A to Notice of Removal (Attachments: #1 Attachment State Court Pleadings Part 70, #2 Attachment State Court Pleadings Part 71, #3 Attachment State Court Pleadings Part 72, #4 Attachment State Court Pleadings Part 73, #5 Attachment State Court Pleadings Part 74, #6 Attachment State Court Pleadings Part 75, #7 Attachment State Court Pleadings Part 76, #8 Attachment State Court Pleadings Part 77)(Barrasso, Judy) Modified on 3/25/2013 to edit docket text(CGP). [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 8/9/2013.] [Transferred from Texas Northern on 3/8/2019.]
March 25, 2013 Filing 41 NOTICE of Filing State Court Record and Amended Exhibit A to Notice of Removal (Attachments: #1 Attachment State Court Pleadings 55, #2 Attachment State Court Pleadings 56, #3 Attachment State Court Pleadings 57, #4 Attachment State Court Pleadings 58, #5 Attachment State Court Pleadings 59, #6 Attachment State Court Pleadings 60, #7 Attachment State Court Pleadings 61, #8 Attachment State Court Pleadings 62, #9 Attachment State Court Pleadings 63, #10 Attachment State Court Pleadings 64, #11 Attachment State Court Pleadings 65, #12 Attachment State Court Pleadings 66, #13 Attachment State Court Pleadings 67, #14 Attachment State Court Pleadings 68, #15 Attachment State Court Pleadings 69)(Barrasso, Judy) Modified on 3/25/2013 to edit docket text(CGP). [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 8/9/2013.] [Transferred from Texas Northern on 3/8/2019.]
March 25, 2013 Filing 40 NOTICE of Filing State Court Record and Amended Exhibit A to Notice of Removal (Attachments: #1 Attachment State Court Pleadings Part 37, #2 Attachment State Court Pleadings Part 38, #3 Attachment State Court Pleadings Part 39, #4 Attachment State Court Pleadings Part 40, #5 Attachment State Court Pleadings Part 41, #6 Attachment State Court Pleadings Part 42, #7 Attachment State Court Pleadings Part 43, #8 Attachment State Court Pleadings Part 44, #9 Attachment State Court Pleadings Part 45, #10 Attachment State Court Pleadings Part 46, #11 Attachment State Court Pleadings Part 47, #12 Attachment State Court Pleadings Part 48, #13 Attachment State Court Pleadings Part 49, #14 Attachment State Court Pleadings Part 50, #15 Attachment State Court Pleadings Part 51, #16 Attachment State Court Pleadings Part 52, #17 Attachment State Court Pleadings Part 53, #18 Attachment State Court Pleadings Part 54)(Barrasso, Judy) Modified on 3/25/2013 to edit docket text (CGP). [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 8/9/2013.] [Transferred from Texas Northern on 3/8/2019.]
March 25, 2013 Filing 39 Exhibit(s) to #38 Notice of (other),,,, by Allied World Assurance Company (U.S.), Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Attachment State Court Pleadings Part 19, #2 Attachment State Court Pleadings Part 20, #3 Attachment State Court Pleadings Part 21, #4 Attachment State Court Pleadings Part 22, #5 Attachment State Court Pleadings Part 23, #6 Attachment State Court Pleadings Part 24, #7 Attachment State Court Pleadings Part 25, #8 Attachment State Court Pleadings Part 26, #9 Attachment State Court Pleadings Part 27, #10 Attachment State Court Pleadings Part 28, #11 Attachment State Court Pleadings Part 29, #12 Attachment State Court Pleadings Part 30, #13 Attachment State Court Pleadings Part 31, #14 Attachment State Court Pleadings Part 32, #15 Attachment State Court Pleadings Part 33, #16 Attachment State Court Pleadings Part 34, #17 Attachment State Court Pleadings Part 35, #18 Attachment State Court Pleadings Part 36)(Barrasso, Judy) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 8/9/2013.] [Transferred from Texas Northern on 3/8/2019.]
March 25, 2013 Filing 38 NOTICE of of Filing State Court Record and Amended Exhibit A to Notice of Removal by Allied World Assurance Company (U.S.), Inc. (Attachments: #1 Attachment State Court Pleadings Part 1, #2 Attachment State Court Pleadings Part 2, #3 Attachment State Court Pleadings Part 3, #4 Attachment State Court Pleadings Part 4, #5 Attachment State Court Pleadings Part 5, #6 Attachment State Court Pleadings Part 6, #7 Attachment State Court Pleadings Part 7, #8 Attachment State Court Pleadings Part 8, #9 Attachment State Court Pleadings Part 9, #10 Attachment State Court Pleadings Part 10, #11 Attachment State Court Pleadings Part 11, #12 Attachment State Court Pleadings Part 12, #13 Attachment State Court Pleadings Part 13, #14 Attachment State Court Pleadings Part 14, #15 Attachment State Court Pleadings Part 15, #16 Attachment State Court Pleadings Part 16, #17 Attachment State Court Pleadings Part 17, #18 Attachment State Court Pleadings Part 18)(Barrasso, Judy) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 8/9/2013.] [Transferred from Texas Northern on 3/8/2019.]
March 22, 2013 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #37 MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Memorandum in Support of "Plaintiffs' Motion for Expedited Briefing Schedule, Expedited Status Conference, and Expedited Consideration of Their Motion to Remand" . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (SMG) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 8/9/2013.] [Transferred from Texas Northern on 3/8/2019.]
March 22, 2013 Filing 37 MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Memorandum in Support of "Plaintiffs' Motion for Expedited Briefing Schedule, Expedited Status Conference, and Expedited Consideration of Their Motion to Remand" by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading; Order, #2 Proposed Pleading; Supplemental Memorandum in Support of "Plaintiffs' Motion for Expedited Briefing Schedule, Expedited Status Conference, and Expedited Consideration of Their Motion to Remand", #3 Exhibit 1 to Supplemental Memorandum, #4 Exhibit 2 to Supplemental Memorandum, #5 Exhibit 3 to Supplemental Memorandum, #6 Exhibit 4 to Supplemental Memorandum)(Preis, Phillip) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 8/9/2013.][Transferred from Texas Northern on 3/8/2019.]
March 22, 2013 Filing 36 Corporate Disclosure Statement by SEI Private Trust Company identifying Corporate Parent SEI Investments Company for SEI Private Trust Company.. (Holmes, Duris) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 8/9/2013.] [Transferred from Texas Northern on 3/8/2019.]
March 22, 2013 Filing 35 Corporate Disclosure Statement by SEI Investments Company. (Holmes, Duris) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 8/9/2013.] [Transferred from Texas Northern on 3/8/2019.]
March 21, 2013 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #34 MOTION to Enroll Daniel Centner as Additional Attorney . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (SMG) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 8/9/2013.] [Transferred from Texas Northern on 3/8/2019.]
March 21, 2013 Filing 34 MOTION to Enroll Daniel Centner as Additional Attorney by Nutmeg Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Schmeeckle, Seth) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 8/9/2013.] [Transferred from Texas Northern on 3/8/2019.]
March 20, 2013 Filing 33 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Nutmeg Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Hartford Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent The Hartford Financial Services Group, Inc. for Nutmeg Insurance Company.. (Schmeeckle, Seth) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 8/9/2013.] [Transferred from Texas Northern on 3/8/2019.]
March 20, 2013 Filing 32 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to #31 MOTION to Enroll Robert E. Kerrigan, Jr., Michael H. Rubin and Juston M. OBrien as Additional Attorney filed by All Plaintiffs. (Preis, Phillip) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 8/9/2013.] [Transferred from Texas Northern on 3/8/2019.]
March 20, 2013 Filing 31 Ex Parte MOTION to Enroll Robert E. Kerrigan, Jr., Michael H. Rubin and Juston M. OBrien as Additional Attorney by SEI Investments Company, SEI Private Trust Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Holmes, Duris) Modified to edit text on 3/20/2013 (SMG). [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 8/9/2013.] [Transferred from Texas Northern on 3/8/2019.]
March 19, 2013 Filing 30 Additional Exhibits to #27 MOTION for Expedited Briefing Schedule, Expedited Status Conference, and Expedited Consideration of Their Motion to Remand by All Plaintiffs. filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B-1, #2 Exhibit C-1)(Preis, Phillip) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 8/9/2013.] [Transferred from Texas Northern on 3/8/2019.]
March 19, 2013 Filing 29 MOTION for Order Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1447(b) Requiring Removing Defendants to Supplement Federal Court Record with Certified Copy of State Court Record by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading; Order, #2 Memorandum in Support of Motion for Order Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1447(b) Requiring Removing Defendants to Supplement Federal Court Record with Certified Copy of State Court Record, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3)(Preis, Phillip) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 8/9/2013.] [Transferred from Texas Northern on 3/8/2019.]
March 19, 2013 Filing 28 SEALED MOTION for Leave to File To File Under Seal Exhibits to Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand Under Seal by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading; Order, #2 Memorandum in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File Under Seal Exhibits to Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit 13, #6 Exhibit 17, #7 Exhibit 20, #8 Exhibit 32, #9 Exhibit 33, #10 Exhibit 34, #11 Exhibit 37, #12 Exhibit 45)(Preis, Phillip) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 8/9/2013.] [Transferred from Texas Northern on 3/8/2019.]
March 19, 2013 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #27 MOTION Expedited Briefing Schedule, Expedited Status Conference, and Expedited Consideration of Their Motion to Remand . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (SMG) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 8/9/2013.] [Transferred from Texas Northern on 3/8/2019.]
March 19, 2013 Filing 27 MOTION for Expedited Briefing Schedule, Expedited Status Conference, and Expedited Consideration of Their Motion to Remand by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading; Order, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Memorandum in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Expedited Briefing Schedule, Expedited Status Conference and Expedited Consideration of Their Motion to Remand)(Preis, Phillip) Modified to edit text on 3/19/2013 (SMG). [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 8/9/2013.] [Transferred from Texas Northern on 3/8/2019.]
March 19, 2013 Filing 26 Additional Exhibits to #24 MOTION to Remand by All Plaintiffs. filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 21, #2 Exhibit 22, #3 Exhibit 23, #4 Exhibit 24, #5 Exhibit 25, #6 Exhibit 26, #7 Exhibit 27, #8 Exhibit 28, #9 Exhibit 29, #10 Exhibit 30, #11 Exhibit 31, #12 Exhibit 32, #13 Exhibit 33, #14 Exhibit 34, #15 Exhibit 35, #16 Exhibit 36, #17 Exhibit 37, #18 Exhibit 38, #19 Exhibit 39, #20 Exhibit 40, #21 Exhibit 41, #22 Exhibit 42, #23 Exhibit 43, #24 Exhibit 44, #25 Exhibit 45, #26 Exhibit 46)(Preis, Phillip) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 8/9/2013.] [Transferred from Texas Northern on 3/8/2019.]
March 19, 2013 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #24 MOTION to Remand . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (SMG) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 8/9/2013.] [Transferred from Texas Northern on 3/8/2019.]
March 19, 2013 Filing 25 Additional Exhibits to #24 MOTION to Remand by All Plaintiffs. filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20)(Preis, Phillip) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 8/9/2013.] [Transferred from Texas Northern on 3/8/2019.]
March 19, 2013 Filing 24 MOTION to Remand by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading; Order, #2 Memorandum in Support Motion to Remand, #3 Exhibit A--Exhibit List to Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand)(Preis, Phillip) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 8/9/2013.] [Transferred from Texas Northern on 3/8/2019.]
March 18, 2013 Filing 23 ANSWER to Complaint by Nutmeg Insurance Company.(Schmeeckle, Seth) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 8/9/2013.] [Transferred from Texas Northern on 3/8/2019.]
March 18, 2013 Filing 22 ANSWER to Complaint (Plaintiffs' First Amended and Restated Class Action Petition) by Allied World Assurance Company (U.S.), Inc..(Barrasso, Judy) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 8/9/2013.] [Transferred from Texas Northern on 3/8/2019.]
March 18, 2013 Filing 21 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Indian Harbor Insurance Company (Burns, Robert) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 8/9/2013.] [Transferred from Texas Northern on 3/8/2019.]
March 18, 2013 Filing 20 ANSWER to Complaint First Amended and Restated Class Action Petition by Continental Casualty Company.(Torian, Robert) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 8/9/2013.] [Transferred from Texas Northern on 3/8/2019.]
March 18, 2013 Filing 19 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Indian Harbor Insurance Company.(Burns, Robert) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 8/9/2013.] [Transferred from Texas Northern on 3/8/2019.]
March 18, 2013 Filing 18 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Arch Insurance Company (Burns, Robert) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 8/9/2013.] [Transferred from Texas Northern on 3/8/2019.]
March 18, 2013 Filing 17 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Arch Insurance Company.(Burns, Robert) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 8/9/2013.] [Transferred from Texas Northern on 3/8/2019.]
March 18, 2013 Filing 16 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's of London (Burns, Robert) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 8/9/2013.] [Transferred from Texas Northern on 3/8/2019.]
March 18, 2013 Filing 15 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's of London.(Burns, Robert) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 8/9/2013.] [Transferred from Texas Northern on 3/8/2019.]
March 15, 2013 Filing 14 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Continental Casualty Company identifying Corporate Parent Loews Corporation, Corporate Parent CNA Financial Corporation for Continental Casualty Company. (Torian, Robert) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 8/9/2013.] [Transferred from Texas Northern on 3/8/2019.]
March 14, 2013 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #4 SEALED MOTION for Leave to File First Amended and Restated Class Action Petition Under Seal . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (NLT) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 8/9/2013.] [Transferred from Texas Northern on 3/8/2019.]
March 11, 2013 Filing 13 Letter to Attorney Kylie McNally who is lead counsel for party Endurance Specialty Insurance Ltd. Attorney is not admitted to practice in LAMD. (JDL) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 8/9/2013.] [Transferred from Texas Northern on 3/8/2019.]
March 11, 2013 Filing 12 Letter to Attorney Daniel J. Standish who is Co-Counsel for party Indian Harbor Insurance Company and Arch Insurance Company. Attorney is not admitted to practice in LAMD. (JDL) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 8/9/2013.] [Transferred from Texas Northern on 3/8/2019.]
March 11, 2013 Filing 11 Letter to Attorney Hillary A. Wegner who is Co-Counsel for party Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's of London. Attorney is not admitted to practice in LAMD. (JDL) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 8/9/2013.] [Transferred from Texas Northern on 3/8/2019.]
March 11, 2013 Filing 10 Letter to Attorney Stefan R. Dandelles who is Co-Counsel for party Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's of London. Attorney is not admitted to practice in LAMD. (JDL) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 8/9/2013.] [Transferred from Texas Northern on 3/8/2019.]
March 11, 2013 Filing 9 Letter to Attorney David Timmins who is lead counsel for party Continental Casualty Company. Attorney is not admitted to practice in LAMD. (JDL) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 8/9/2013.] [Transferred from Texas Northern on 3/8/2019.]
March 11, 2013 Filing 8 Letter to Attorney J. Gordon Cooney who is Co-Counsel for party SEI Investments Company and SEI Private Trust Company. Attorney is not admitted to practice in LAMD. (JDL) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 8/9/2013.] [Transferred from Texas Northern on 3/8/2019.]
March 11, 2013 Filing 7 Letter to Attorney David Luttinger who is Co-Counsel for party SEI Investments Company and SEI Private Trust Company. Attorney is not admitted to practice in LAMD. (JDL) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 8/9/2013.] [Transferred from Texas Northern on 3/8/2019.]
March 11, 2013 Filing 6 Letter to Attorney Duris L. Holmes who is lead counsel for party SEI Investments Company and SEI Private Trust Company. Attorney is not admitted to practice in LAMD. (JDL) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 8/9/2013.] [Transferred from Texas Northern on 3/8/2019.]
March 11, 2013 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Allied World Assurance Company (U.S.), Inc.. (Barrasso, Judy) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 8/9/2013.] [Transferred from Texas Northern on 3/8/2019.]
March 11, 2013 Filing 4 SEALED MOTION for Leave to File First Amended and Restated Class Action Petition Under Seal by Allied World Assurance Company (U.S.), Inc., Arch Insurance Company, Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's of London, Continental Casualty Compnay, Indian Harbor Insurance Company, Nutmeg Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Attachment First Amended and Restated Class Action Petition, #2 Attachment Proposed Order)(Barrasso, Judy) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 8/9/2013.] [Transferred from Texas Northern on 3/8/2019.]
March 11, 2013 Filing 3 NOTICE of Compliance by Allied World Assurance Company (U.S.), Inc., Arch Insurance Company, Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's of London, Continental Casualty Compnay, Indian Harbor Insurance Company, Nutmeg Insurance Company (Barrasso, Judy) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 8/9/2013.] [Transferred from Texas Northern on 3/8/2019.]
March 11, 2013 Filing 2 NOTICE of to Adverse Party of Removal by Allied World Assurance Company (U.S.), Inc., Arch Insurance Company, Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's of London, Continental Casualty Compnay, Indian Harbor Insurance Company, Nutmeg Insurance Company (Barrasso, Judy) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 8/9/2013.] [Transferred from Texas Northern on 3/8/2019.]
March 11, 2013 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from East Baton Rouge Parish, 19th JDC, Case Number C581670. (Receipt #053N-921701 in the amount of $350.00), filed by Allied World Assurance Company (U.S.), Inc., Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's of London, Nutmeg Insurance Company, Indian Harbor Insurance Company, Continental Casualty Company, Arch Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Attachment LR 3.1 Notice of Collateral Proceedings, #3 Exhibit A., #4 Exhibit B., #5 Exhibit C., #6 Exhibit D.)(Barrasso, Judy) Modified on 3/12/2013 to add text (JDL). [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 8/9/2013.] [Transferred from Texas Northern on 3/8/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lillie et al v. Stanford Trust Company, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fred Demarest
Represented By: Charles Malcolm Gordon
Represented By: Caroline Dana Preis
Represented By: Phillip W. Preis
Represented By: Jennifer Rae Dietz
Represented By: Crystal DiBenedetto Burkhalter
Represented By: John Neher Grinton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Wilkewitz
Represented By: Charles Malcolm Gordon
Represented By: Caroline Dana Preis
Represented By: Phillip W. Preis
Represented By: Jennifer Rae Dietz
Represented By: Crystal DiBenedetto Burkhalter
Represented By: John Neher Grinton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Bruce Johnson
Represented By: Charles Malcolm Gordon
Represented By: Caroline Dana Preis
Represented By: Phillip W. Preis
Represented By: Jennifer Rae Dietz
Represented By: Crystal DiBenedetto Burkhalter
Represented By: John Neher Grinton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Margaret S Nix
Represented By: Charles Malcolm Gordon
Represented By: Caroline Dana Preis
Represented By: Phillip W. Preis
Represented By: Jennifer Rae Dietz
Represented By: Crystal DiBenedetto Burkhalter
Represented By: John Neher Grinton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Claudia O'Rear
Represented By: Charles Malcolm Gordon
Represented By: Caroline Dana Preis
Represented By: Phillip W. Preis
Represented By: Jennifer Rae Dietz
Represented By: Crystal DiBenedetto Burkhalter
Represented By: John Neher Grinton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald McMorris
Represented By: Charles Malcolm Gordon
Represented By: Caroline Dana Preis
Represented By: Phillip W. Preis
Represented By: Jennifer Rae Dietz
Represented By: Crystal DiBenedetto Burkhalter
Represented By: John Neher Grinton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles White
Represented By: Charles Malcolm Gordon
Represented By: Caroline Dana Preis
Represented By: Phillip W. Preis
Represented By: Jennifer Rae Dietz
Represented By: Crystal DiBenedetto Burkhalter
Represented By: John Neher Grinton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laura Lee
Represented By: Charles Malcolm Gordon
Represented By: Caroline Dana Preis
Represented By: Phillip W. Preis
Represented By: Jennifer Rae Dietz
Represented By: Crystal DiBenedetto Burkhalter
Represented By: John Neher Grinton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Hart
Represented By: Charles Malcolm Gordon
Represented By: Caroline Dana Preis
Represented By: Phillip W. Preis
Represented By: Jennifer Rae Dietz
Represented By: Crystal DiBenedetto Burkhalter
Represented By: John Neher Grinton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martha Jean Witmer
Represented By: Charles Malcolm Gordon
Represented By: Caroline Dana Preis
Represented By: Phillip W. Preis
Represented By: Jennifer Rae Dietz
Represented By: Crystal DiBenedetto Burkhalter
Represented By: John Neher Grinton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terry Tullis
Represented By: Charles Malcolm Gordon
Represented By: Caroline Dana Preis
Represented By: Phillip W. Preis
Represented By: Jennifer Rae Dietz
Represented By: Crystal DiBenedetto Burkhalter
Represented By: John Neher Grinton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathleen Mier
Represented By: Charles Malcolm Gordon
Represented By: Caroline Dana Preis
Represented By: Phillip W. Preis
Represented By: Jennifer Rae Dietz
Represented By: Crystal DiBenedetto Burkhalter
Represented By: John Neher Grinton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rodney P Starkey
Represented By: Charles Malcolm Gordon
Represented By: Caroline Dana Preis
Represented By: Phillip W. Preis
Represented By: Jennifer Rae Dietz
Represented By: Crystal DiBenedetto Burkhalter
Represented By: John Neher Grinton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Smith
Represented By: Charles Malcolm Gordon
Represented By: Caroline Dana Preis
Represented By: Phillip W. Preis
Represented By: Jennifer Rae Dietz
Represented By: Crystal DiBenedetto Burkhalter
Represented By: John Neher Grinton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charlie L Massey
Represented By: Charles Malcolm Gordon
Represented By: Caroline Dana Preis
Represented By: Phillip W. Preis
Represented By: Jennifer Rae Dietz
Represented By: Crystal DiBenedetto Burkhalter
Represented By: John Neher Grinton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Claude Marquette
Represented By: Charles Malcolm Gordon
Represented By: Caroline Dana Preis
Represented By: Phillip W. Preis
Represented By: Jennifer Rae Dietz
Represented By: Crystal DiBenedetto Burkhalter
Represented By: John Neher Grinton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marcel Dumestre
Represented By: Charles Malcolm Gordon
Represented By: Caroline Dana Preis
Represented By: Phillip W. Preis
Represented By: Jennifer Rae Dietz
Represented By: Crystal DiBenedetto Burkhalter
Represented By: John Neher Grinton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dennis Kirby
Represented By: Charles Malcolm Gordon
Represented By: Caroline Dana Preis
Represented By: Phillip W. Preis
Represented By: Jennifer Rae Dietz
Represented By: Crystal DiBenedetto Burkhalter
Represented By: John Neher Grinton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sharon Witmer
Represented By: Charles Malcolm Gordon
Represented By: Caroline Dana Preis
Represented By: Phillip W. Preis
Represented By: Jennifer Rae Dietz
Represented By: Crystal DiBenedetto Burkhalter
Represented By: John Neher Grinton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gwen Fabre
Represented By: Charles Malcolm Gordon
Represented By: Caroline Dana Preis
Represented By: Phillip W. Preis
Represented By: Jennifer Rae Dietz
Represented By: Crystal DiBenedetto Burkhalter
Represented By: John Neher Grinton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Virginia Buscheme
Represented By: Charles Malcolm Gordon
Represented By: Caroline Dana Preis
Represented By: Phillip W. Preis
Represented By: Jennifer Rae Dietz
Represented By: Crystal DiBenedetto Burkhalter
Represented By: John Neher Grinton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Boyd
Represented By: Charles Malcolm Gordon
Represented By: Caroline Dana Preis
Represented By: Phillip W. Preis
Represented By: Jennifer Rae Dietz
Represented By: Crystal DiBenedetto Burkhalter
Represented By: John Neher Grinton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Roland
Represented By: Charles Malcolm Gordon
Represented By: Caroline Dana Preis
Represented By: Phillip W. Preis
Represented By: Jennifer Rae Dietz
Represented By: Crystal DiBenedetto Burkhalter
Represented By: John Neher Grinton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clyde J Chisholm
Represented By: Charles Malcolm Gordon
Represented By: Caroline Dana Preis
Represented By: Phillip W. Preis
Represented By: Jennifer Rae Dietz
Represented By: Crystal DiBenedetto Burkhalter
Represented By: John Neher Grinton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lonnie Ordoyne
Represented By: Charles Malcolm Gordon
Represented By: Caroline Dana Preis
Represented By: Phillip W. Preis
Represented By: Jennifer Rae Dietz
Represented By: Crystal DiBenedetto Burkhalter
Represented By: John Neher Grinton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Olivia Sue Warnock
Represented By: Charles Malcolm Gordon
Represented By: Caroline Dana Preis
Represented By: Phillip W. Preis
Represented By: Jennifer Rae Dietz
Represented By: Crystal DiBenedetto Burkhalter
Represented By: John Neher Grinton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald R Marston
Represented By: Charles Malcolm Gordon
Represented By: Caroline Dana Preis
Represented By: Phillip W. Preis
Represented By: Jennifer Rae Dietz
Represented By: Crystal DiBenedetto Burkhalter
Represented By: John Neher Grinton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry Smith
Represented By: Charles Malcolm Gordon
Represented By: Caroline Dana Preis
Represented By: Phillip W. Preis
Represented By: Jennifer Rae Dietz
Represented By: Crystal DiBenedetto Burkhalter
Represented By: John Neher Grinton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bobby Nix
Represented By: Charles Malcolm Gordon
Represented By: Caroline Dana Preis
Represented By: Phillip W. Preis
Represented By: Jennifer Rae Dietz
Represented By: Crystal DiBenedetto Burkhalter
Represented By: John Neher Grinton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Louis Mier
Represented By: Charles Malcolm Gordon
Represented By: Caroline Dana Preis
Represented By: Phillip W. Preis
Represented By: Jennifer Rae Dietz
Represented By: Crystal DiBenedetto Burkhalter
Represented By: John Neher Grinton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lynn J. Phillipe
Represented By: Charles Malcolm Gordon
Represented By: Caroline Dana Preis
Represented By: Phillip W. Preis
Represented By: Jennifer Rae Dietz
Represented By: Crystal DiBenedetto Burkhalter
Represented By: John Neher Grinton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacqueline Millett
Represented By: Charles Malcolm Gordon
Represented By: Caroline Dana Preis
Represented By: Phillip W. Preis
Represented By: Jennifer Rae Dietz
Represented By: Crystal DiBenedetto Burkhalter
Represented By: John Neher Grinton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Walter Stone
Represented By: Charles Malcolm Gordon
Represented By: Caroline Dana Preis
Represented By: Phillip W. Preis
Represented By: Jennifer Rae Dietz
Represented By: Crystal DiBenedetto Burkhalter
Represented By: John Neher Grinton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Buscheme
Represented By: Charles Malcolm Gordon
Represented By: Caroline Dana Preis
Represented By: Phillip W. Preis
Represented By: Jennifer Rae Dietz
Represented By: Crystal DiBenedetto Burkhalter
Represented By: John Neher Grinton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Bush
Represented By: Charles Malcolm Gordon
Represented By: Caroline Dana Preis
Represented By: Phillip W. Preis
Represented By: Jennifer Rae Dietz
Represented By: Crystal DiBenedetto Burkhalter
Represented By: John Neher Grinton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mamie Sanchez
Represented By: Charles Malcolm Gordon
Represented By: Caroline Dana Preis
Represented By: Phillip W. Preis
Represented By: Jennifer Rae Dietz
Represented By: Crystal DiBenedetto Burkhalter
Represented By: John Neher Grinton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julie Savoy
Represented By: Charles Malcolm Gordon
Represented By: Caroline Dana Preis
Represented By: Phillip W. Preis
Represented By: Jennifer Rae Dietz
Represented By: Crystal DiBenedetto Burkhalter
Represented By: John Neher Grinton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kerry Kling
Represented By: Charles Malcolm Gordon
Represented By: Caroline Dana Preis
Represented By: Phillip W. Preis
Represented By: Jennifer Rae Dietz
Represented By: Crystal DiBenedetto Burkhalter
Represented By: John Neher Grinton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerry Burris
Represented By: Charles Malcolm Gordon
Represented By: Caroline Dana Preis
Represented By: Phillip W. Preis
Represented By: Jennifer Rae Dietz
Represented By: Crystal DiBenedetto Burkhalter
Represented By: John Neher Grinton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Slaughter
Represented By: Charles Malcolm Gordon
Represented By: Caroline Dana Preis
Represented By: Phillip W. Preis
Represented By: Jennifer Rae Dietz
Represented By: Crystal DiBenedetto Burkhalter
Represented By: John Neher Grinton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darrell Courville
Represented By: Charles Malcolm Gordon
Represented By: Caroline Dana Preis
Represented By: Phillip W. Preis
Represented By: Jennifer Rae Dietz
Represented By: Crystal DiBenedetto Burkhalter
Represented By: John Neher Grinton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Stegall
Represented By: Charles Malcolm Gordon
Represented By: Caroline Dana Preis
Represented By: Phillip W. Preis
Represented By: Jennifer Rae Dietz
Represented By: Crystal DiBenedetto Burkhalter
Represented By: John Neher Grinton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa Scrantz
Represented By: Charles Malcolm Gordon
Represented By: Caroline Dana Preis
Represented By: Phillip W. Preis
Represented By: Jennifer Rae Dietz
Represented By: Crystal DiBenedetto Burkhalter
Represented By: John Neher Grinton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Margaret Dumestre
Represented By: Charles Malcolm Gordon
Represented By: Caroline Dana Preis
Represented By: Phillip W. Preis
Represented By: Jennifer Rae Dietz
Represented By: Crystal DiBenedetto Burkhalter
Represented By: John Neher Grinton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeanne Anne Mayhall
Represented By: Charles Malcolm Gordon
Represented By: Caroline Dana Preis
Represented By: Phillip W. Preis
Represented By: Jennifer Rae Dietz
Represented By: Crystal DiBenedetto Burkhalter
Represented By: John Neher Grinton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael J Giambrone
Represented By: Charles Malcolm Gordon
Represented By: Caroline Dana Preis
Represented By: Phillip W. Preis
Represented By: Jennifer Rae Dietz
Represented By: Crystal DiBenedetto Burkhalter
Represented By: John Neher Grinton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kendall Forbes
Represented By: Charles Malcolm Gordon
Represented By: Caroline Dana Preis
Represented By: Phillip W. Preis
Represented By: Jennifer Rae Dietz
Represented By: Crystal DiBenedetto Burkhalter
Represented By: John Neher Grinton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Dawson
Represented By: Charles Malcolm Gordon
Represented By: Charles M Thompson
Represented By: Caroline Dana Preis
Represented By: Phillip W. Preis
Represented By: Jennifer Rae Dietz
Represented By: Crystal DiBenedetto Burkhalter
Represented By: John Neher Grinton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Virginia McMorris
Represented By: Charles Malcolm Gordon
Represented By: Caroline Dana Preis
Represented By: Phillip W. Preis
Represented By: Jennifer Rae Dietz
Represented By: Crystal DiBenedetto Burkhalter
Represented By: John Neher Grinton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Brown
Represented By: Charles Malcolm Gordon
Represented By: Caroline Dana Preis
Represented By: Phillip W. Preis
Represented By: Jennifer Rae Dietz
Represented By: Crystal DiBenedetto Burkhalter
Represented By: John Neher Grinton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Feucht
Represented By: Charles Malcolm Gordon
Represented By: Caroline Dana Preis
Represented By: Phillip W. Preis
Represented By: Jennifer Rae Dietz
Represented By: Crystal DiBenedetto Burkhalter
Represented By: John Neher Grinton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arthur Ordoyne
Represented By: Charles Malcolm Gordon
Represented By: Caroline Dana Preis
Represented By: Phillip W. Preis
Represented By: Jennifer Rae Dietz
Represented By: Crystal DiBenedetto Burkhalter
Represented By: John Neher Grinton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Troy Lillie
Represented By: Charles Malcolm Gordon
Represented By: Caroline Dana Preis
Represented By: Phillip W. Preis
Represented By: Jennifer Rae Dietz
Represented By: Crystal DiBenedetto Burkhalter
Represented By: John Neher Grinton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan Roland
Represented By: Charles Malcolm Gordon
Represented By: Caroline Dana Preis
Represented By: Phillip W. Preis
Represented By: Jennifer Rae Dietz
Represented By: Crystal DiBenedetto Burkhalter
Represented By: John Neher Grinton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ira Causey
Represented By: Charles Malcolm Gordon
Represented By: Caroline Dana Preis
Represented By: Phillip W. Preis
Represented By: Jennifer Rae Dietz
Represented By: Crystal DiBenedetto Burkhalter
Represented By: John Neher Grinton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Doughtery
Represented By: Charles Malcolm Gordon
Represented By: Caroline Dana Preis
Represented By: Phillip W. Preis
Represented By: Jennifer Rae Dietz
Represented By: Crystal DiBenedetto Burkhalter
Represented By: John Neher Grinton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Murphy Buell
Represented By: Charles Malcolm Gordon
Represented By: Caroline Dana Preis
Represented By: Phillip W. Preis
Represented By: Jennifer Rae Dietz
Represented By: Crystal DiBenedetto Burkhalter
Represented By: John Neher Grinton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nancy Gill
Represented By: Charles Malcolm Gordon
Represented By: Caroline Dana Preis
Represented By: Phillip W. Preis
Represented By: Jennifer Rae Dietz
Represented By: Crystal DiBenedetto Burkhalter
Represented By: John Neher Grinton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anita Ellen Carter
Represented By: Charles Malcolm Gordon
Represented By: Caroline Dana Preis
Represented By: Phillip W. Preis
Represented By: Jennifer Rae Dietz
Represented By: Crystal DiBenedetto Burkhalter
Represented By: John Neher Grinton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Willa Mae Gildersleeve
Represented By: Charles Malcolm Gordon
Represented By: Caroline Dana Preis
Represented By: Phillip W. Preis
Represented By: Jennifer Rae Dietz
Represented By: Crystal DiBenedetto Burkhalter
Represented By: John Neher Grinton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wanda Bevis
Represented By: Charles Malcolm Gordon
Represented By: Caroline Dana Preis
Represented By: Phillip W. Preis
Represented By: Jennifer Rae Dietz
Represented By: Crystal DiBenedetto Burkhalter
Represented By: John Neher Grinton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Chustz, Jr.
Represented By: Charles Malcolm Gordon
Represented By: Caroline Dana Preis
Represented By: Phillip W. Preis
Represented By: Jennifer Rae Dietz
Represented By: Crystal DiBenedetto Burkhalter
Represented By: John Neher Grinton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Monty Perkins
Represented By: Charles Malcolm Gordon
Represented By: Caroline Dana Preis
Represented By: Phillip W. Preis
Represented By: Jennifer Rae Dietz
Represented By: Crystal DiBenedetto Burkhalter
Represented By: John Neher Grinton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry Perkins
Represented By: Charles Malcolm Gordon
Represented By: Caroline Dana Preis
Represented By: Phillip W. Preis
Represented By: Jennifer Rae Dietz
Represented By: Crystal DiBenedetto Burkhalter
Represented By: John Neher Grinton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deborah S Forbes
Represented By: Charles Malcolm Gordon
Represented By: Caroline Dana Preis
Represented By: Phillip W. Preis
Represented By: Jennifer Rae Dietz
Represented By: Crystal DiBenedetto Burkhalter
Represented By: John Neher Grinton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas E Bowden
Represented By: Charles Malcolm Gordon
Represented By: Caroline Dana Preis
Represented By: Phillip W. Preis
Represented By: Jennifer Rae Dietz
Represented By: Crystal DiBenedetto Burkhalter
Represented By: John Neher Grinton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Sanchez
Represented By: Charles Malcolm Gordon
Represented By: Caroline Dana Preis
Represented By: Phillip W. Preis
Represented By: Jennifer Rae Dietz
Represented By: Crystal DiBenedetto Burkhalter
Represented By: John Neher Grinton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary Magee
Represented By: Charles Malcolm Gordon
Represented By: Caroline Dana Preis
Represented By: Phillip W. Preis
Represented By: Jennifer Rae Dietz
Represented By: Crystal DiBenedetto Burkhalter
Represented By: John Neher Grinton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leah Farr
Represented By: Charles Malcolm Gordon
Represented By: Caroline Dana Preis
Represented By: Phillip W. Preis
Represented By: Jennifer Rae Dietz
Represented By: Crystal DiBenedetto Burkhalter
Represented By: John Neher Grinton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terry Tarver
Represented By: Charles Malcolm Gordon
Represented By: Caroline Dana Preis
Represented By: Phillip W. Preis
Represented By: Jennifer Rae Dietz
Represented By: Crystal DiBenedetto Burkhalter
Represented By: John Neher Grinton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lynn Gildersleeve Michelli
Represented By: Charles Malcolm Gordon
Represented By: Caroline Dana Preis
Represented By: Phillip W. Preis
Represented By: Jennifer Rae Dietz
Represented By: Crystal DiBenedetto Burkhalter
Represented By: John Neher Grinton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gordon C Gill
Represented By: Charles Malcolm Gordon
Represented By: Caroline Dana Preis
Represented By: Phillip W. Preis
Represented By: Jennifer Rae Dietz
Represented By: Crystal DiBenedetto Burkhalter
Represented By: John Neher Grinton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Gildersleeve
Represented By: Charles Malcolm Gordon
Represented By: Caroline Dana Preis
Represented By: Phillip W. Preis
Represented By: Jennifer Rae Dietz
Represented By: Crystal DiBenedetto Burkhalter
Represented By: John Neher Grinton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Wade
Represented By: Charles Malcolm Gordon
Represented By: Caroline Dana Preis
Represented By: Phillip W. Preis
Represented By: Jennifer Rae Dietz
Represented By: Crystal DiBenedetto Burkhalter
Represented By: John Neher Grinton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ralph D D'Amore
Represented By: Charles Malcolm Gordon
Represented By: Caroline Dana Preis
Represented By: Phillip W. Preis
Represented By: Jennifer Rae Dietz
Represented By: Crystal DiBenedetto Burkhalter
Represented By: John Neher Grinton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bille Ruth McMorris
Represented By: Charles Malcolm Gordon
Represented By: Caroline Dana Preis
Represented By: Phillip W. Preis
Represented By: Jennifer Rae Dietz
Represented By: Crystal DiBenedetto Burkhalter
Represented By: John Neher Grinton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Merrill Laplante
Represented By: Charles Malcolm Gordon
Represented By: Caroline Dana Preis
Represented By: Phillip W. Preis
Represented By: Jennifer Rae Dietz
Represented By: Crystal DiBenedetto Burkhalter
Represented By: John Neher Grinton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mamie Baumann
Represented By: Charles Malcolm Gordon
Represented By: Caroline Dana Preis
Represented By: Phillip W. Preis
Represented By: Jennifer Rae Dietz
Represented By: Crystal DiBenedetto Burkhalter
Represented By: John Neher Grinton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Schwendimann
Represented By: Charles Malcolm Gordon
Represented By: Caroline Dana Preis
Represented By: Phillip W. Preis
Represented By: Jennifer Rae Dietz
Represented By: Crystal DiBenedetto Burkhalter
Represented By: John Neher Grinton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joan Feucht
Represented By: Charles Malcolm Gordon
Represented By: Caroline Dana Preis
Represented By: Phillip W. Preis
Represented By: Jennifer Rae Dietz
Represented By: Crystal DiBenedetto Burkhalter
Represented By: John Neher Grinton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Benny O'Rear
Represented By: Charles Malcolm Gordon
Represented By: Caroline Dana Preis
Represented By: Phillip W. Preis
Represented By: Jennifer Rae Dietz
Represented By: Crystal DiBenedetto Burkhalter
Represented By: John Neher Grinton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen Wilson
Represented By: Charles Malcolm Gordon
Represented By: Caroline Dana Preis
Represented By: Phillip W. Preis
Represented By: Jennifer Rae Dietz
Represented By: Crystal DiBenedetto Burkhalter
Represented By: John Neher Grinton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carol Stegall
Represented By: Charles Malcolm Gordon
Represented By: Caroline Dana Preis
Represented By: Phillip W. Preis
Represented By: Jennifer Rae Dietz
Represented By: Crystal DiBenedetto Burkhalter
Represented By: John Neher Grinton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Ventrella
Represented By: Charles Malcolm Gordon
Represented By: Caroline Dana Preis
Represented By: Phillip W. Preis
Represented By: Jennifer Rae Dietz
Represented By: Crystal DiBenedetto Burkhalter
Represented By: John Neher Grinton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arthur Waxley
Represented By: Charles Malcolm Gordon
Represented By: Caroline Dana Preis
Represented By: Phillip W. Preis
Represented By: Jennifer Rae Dietz
Represented By: Crystal DiBenedetto Burkhalter
Represented By: John Neher Grinton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel P Landry
Represented By: Charles Malcolm Gordon
Represented By: Caroline Dana Preis
Represented By: Phillip W. Preis
Represented By: Jennifer Rae Dietz
Represented By: Crystal DiBenedetto Burkhalter
Represented By: John Neher Grinton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald Valentine
Represented By: Charles Malcolm Gordon
Represented By: Caroline Dana Preis
Represented By: Phillip W. Preis
Represented By: Jennifer Rae Dietz
Represented By: Crystal DiBenedetto Burkhalter
Represented By: John Neher Grinton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terence Beven, MD
Represented By: Charles Malcolm Gordon
Represented By: Caroline Dana Preis
Represented By: Phillip W. Preis
Represented By: Jennifer Rae Dietz
Represented By: Crystal DiBenedetto Burkhalter
Represented By: John Neher Grinton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Phillips
Represented By: Charles Malcolm Gordon
Represented By: Caroline Dana Preis
Represented By: Phillip W. Preis
Represented By: Jennifer Rae Dietz
Represented By: Crystal DiBenedetto Burkhalter
Represented By: John Neher Grinton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Continental Casualty Company
Represented By: Robert E. Torian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arch Insurance Company
Represented By: Robert Joseph Burns, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endurance Specialty Insurance Ltd
Represented By: Jacob A. Airey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SEI Investments Company
Represented By: J. Gordon Cooney, Jr.
Represented By: Robert E. Kerrigan, Jr.
Represented By: Elizabeth Hoop Fay
Represented By: Juston M. O'Brien
Represented By: Michael H. Rubin
Represented By: Duris L. Holmes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's of London
Represented By: Robert Joseph Burns, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stanford Trust Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allied World Assurance Company (U.S.), Inc.
Represented By: Judy Y. Barrasso
Represented By: Zachary I Rosenberg
Represented By: Sarah Leslie Rubin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nutmeg Insurance Company
Represented By: Daniel B. Centner
Represented By: Seth A. Schmeeckle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Indian Harbor Insurance Company
Represented By: Robert Joseph Burns, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SEI Private Trust Company
Represented By: J. Gordon Cooney, Jr.
Represented By: Ryan McCarthy
Represented By: Robert E. Kerrigan, Jr.
Represented By: Elizabeth Hoop Fay
Represented By: Juston M. O'Brien
Represented By: Michael H. Rubin
Represented By: Duris L. Holmes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Office of Financial Institutions State of Louisiana
Represented By: Keary L. Everitt
Represented By: Marie Ganucheau Everitt
Represented By: David M Latham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: Robert C Ahders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?