In Re: Moncla Marine, LLC as Owner of the Moncla Rig #107 its Engines, Tackle, Apparel, Etc., and Moncla Marine Operations, LLC as the Operator of the Moncla Rig #107
In Re: Moncla Marine, LLC as Owner of the Moncla Rig #107 its Engines, Tackle, Apparel, Etc., and Moncla Marine Operations, LLC as the Operator of the Moncla Rig #107
Claimant: Leroy Fuselier
Case Number: 3:2019cv00164
Filed: March 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Shelly D Dick
Referring Judge: Erin Wilder-Doomes
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1333
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #12 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages; granting #12 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages and MOTION to Substitute [Rec. Doc. 10] Memorandum in Opposition to the Claimants Motion to Dismiss this Limitation Proceeding under Rule 12(B)(6) or, in the Alternative, to Lift Stay Order filed by Moncla Marine, LLC as Owner of the Moncla Rig #107 its Engines, Tackle, Apparel, Etc., and Moncla Marine Operations, LLC as the Operator of the Moncla Rig #107. Signed by Chief Judge Shelly D. Dick on 6/26/19. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (BKA)
June 21, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages and, MOTION to Substitute [Rec. Doc. 10] Memorandum in Opposition to the Claimants Motion to Dismiss this Limitation Proceeding under Rule 12(B)(6) or, in the Alternative, to Lift Stay Order by Moncla Marine, LLC as Owner of the Moncla Rig #107 its Engines, Tackle, Apparel, Etc., and Moncla Marine Operations, LLC as the Operator of the Moncla Rig #107. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proposed Pleading;)(DeGruy, Jacques)
June 21, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE OF NON-COMPLIANCE with LR 7(g) as to #10 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion,. REQUIRED CORRECTION: A combined Motion for Leave to Exceed the Page Limits and Motion to Substitute the Incorrect Pleading must filed within 24 hours of this notice. Otherwise, the original filing may be stricken by the Court without further notice. (ELW)
June 21, 2019 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #9 MOTION for Leave to File Third-Party Complaint . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (ELW)
June 20, 2019 Filing 10 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to #8 MOTION to Dismiss This Limitation Proceeding Under Rule 12(b)(6) or, In the Alternative, To Lift Stay Order MOTION to Lift Stay filed by Moncla Marine, LLC as Owner of the Moncla Rig #107 its Engines, Tackle, Apparel, Etc., and Moncla Marine Operations, LLC as the Operator of the Moncla Rig #107. (DeGruy, Jacques) Modified on 6/28/2019 to replace as per rec doc 13 (KAH).
June 20, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to File Third-Party Complaint by Moncla Marine, LLC as Owner of the Moncla Rig #107 its Engines, Tackle, Apparel, Etc., and Moncla Marine Operations, LLC as the Operator of the Moncla Rig #107. (Attachments: #1 Rule 7(e) Certificate, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Proposed Pleading;)(DeGruy, Jacques)
May 30, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss This Limitation Proceeding Under Rule 12(b)(6) or, In the Alternative, To Lift Stay Order by Leroy Fuselier. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Notice of Service, #3 Claimant's Stipulations, #4 Notice of Submission, #5 Proposed Alternative Orders)(Curtis, Lawrence). Added MOTION to Lift Stay on 5/31/2019 (KMW).
May 23, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Publication of Legal Notice by Moncla Marine, LLC as Owner of the Moncla Rig #107 its Engines, Tackle, Apparel, Etc., and Moncla Marine Operations, LLC as the Operator of the Moncla Rig #107 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-C)(Johnston, Robert)
April 4, 2019 Funds Deposited: $ 250.00, receipt number 4699029183. (KAH)
April 2, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO CLAIMANTS OF EXONERATION FROM OR LIMITATION OF LIABILITY (ELW) (Main Document 6 replaced on 4/9/2019) (ELW). Modified on 4/9/2019 to correct date (ELW). Modified on 4/9/2019 to correct filing date (ELW).
April 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER APPROVING PETITIONERS' AD INTERIM STIPULATION FOR VALUE DIRECTING ISSUANCE OF NOTICE AND RESTRAINING PROSECUTION OF CLAIMS as to #1 Complaint. Signed by Chief Judge Shelly D. Dick on 04/02/2019. (ELW)
April 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #3 Motion to Deposit Funds. The Clerk of Court accept and deposit into the Registry of the Court the check in the amount of$250.00 on behalf of Petitioners, Moncla Marine, LLC and Moncla Marine Operations, LLC as the owner and operator of the daylight keyway workover barge Moncla Rig# I 07 THE SPECK, its engines, gear, tackle, etc., in lieu of filing a cost bond. Signed by Chief Judge Shelly D. Dick on 04/01/2019. (ELW)
March 21, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to Deposit Funds ($250.00) into the Registry of the Court in Lieu of Cost Bond by MONCLA MARINE OPERATIONS, LLC, MONCLA MARINE, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed Pleading;)(Johnston, Robert)
March 21, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Security Under Rule F and Other Supplemental Rules for Certain Admiralty and Maritime Claims by MONCLA MARINE OPERATIONS, LLC, MONCLA MARINE, LLC (Attachments: #1 Attachment Letter of Undertaking)(Johnston, Robert)
March 21, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Exoneration from or Limitation of Liability against MONCLA MARINE, LLC, MONCLA MARINE OPERATIONS, LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAMDC-1915823.), filed by MONCLA MARINE, LLC, MONCLA MARINE OPERATIONS, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-D, #2 Ad Interim Stipulation, #3 Proposed Order Approving Ad Interim Stipulation, #4 Notice to Claimants of Exoneration from or Limitation of Liability, #5 Verification, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(Johnston, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In Re: Moncla Marine, LLC as Owner of the Moncla Rig #107 its Engines, Tackle, Apparel, Etc., and Moncla Marine Operations, LLC as the Operator of the Moncla Rig #107
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: Moncla Marine, LLC as Owner of the Moncla Rig #107 its Engines, Tackle, Apparel, Etc., and Moncla Marine Operations, LLC as the Operator of the Moncla Rig #107
Represented By: Constance Colley Waguespack
Represented By: Jacques P. DeGruy
Represented By: Robert R. Johnston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Leroy Fuselier
Represented By: Lawrence Neil Curtis
Represented By: D'Ann Rose Penner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?