Grimes v. West Baton Rouge Parish School Board, et al
Plaintiff: Nakiva Grimes
Defendant: West Baton Rouge Parish School Board and William Mulina
Case Number: 3:2019cv00166
Filed: March 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Shelly D Dick
Referring Judge: Erin Wilder-Doomes
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Education
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #11 Joint Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 7/11/2019. (SWE)
July 10, 2019 Set Deadlines: Plaintiff shall file adequate proof of service in the record as to Defendant William Mulina by no later than 8/10/2019. (ELW)
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER : #10 Motion to Appoint Curator is DENIED. #10 Motion for Extension of Time is extended. Plaintiff shall file adequate proof of service in the record as to Defendant William Mulina by no later than August 10, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 07/10/2019. (ELW)
July 10, 2019 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #11 Joint MOTION for Protective Order . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (KMW)
July 9, 2019 Filing 11 Joint MOTION for Protective Order by Nakiva Grimes. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading;)(Craft, Jill)
July 2, 2019 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #10 Unopposed MOTION to Appoint Curator and Alternatively, for an Extension of Time to Serve Defendant William Mulina . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (ELW)
July 1, 2019 Filing 10 Unopposed MOTION to Appoint Curator and Alternatively, for an Extension of Time to Serve Defendant William Mulina by Nakiva Grimes. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Proposed Pleading; Order 1, #6 Proposed Pleading; Order 2)(Conrad, William). Added MOTION for Extension of Time on 7/9/2019 (ELW).
June 7, 2019 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to William Mulina. (NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve both the summons and all attachments in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4.) (KMW)
June 6, 2019 Filing 8 Summons Submitted (Craft, Jill) (Main Document 8 replaced on 6/7/2019) (KMW). Modified on 6/7/2019 to flatten the document (KMW).
May 24, 2019 Filing 7 Notice to Counsel: In light of all defendants having not made an appearance in this matter, the Scheduling Conference reset for 8/8/2019 at 10:00 AM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes. Status Report due by 7/25/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.)(BLR)
May 13, 2019 Filing 6 Joint STATUS REPORT by Nakiva Grimes. (Craft, Jill)
April 10, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint by West Baton Rouge Parish School Board.(Gee, Michael)
April 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 5/30/2019 at 02:30 PM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes. Status Report due by 5/16/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 4/9/2019. (KAH)
March 29, 2019 Filing 3 Letter to Attorney Michael G. Gee regarding Bobby J. Triche who is Co-Counsel for party West Baton Rouge Parish School Board. Attorney is not admitted to practice in LAMD. (SWE)
March 28, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Compliance by West Baton Rouge Parish School Board (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Gee, Michael)
March 21, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from West Baton Rouge Parish District Court, Case Number 1045027. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAMDC-1916133), filed by West Baton Rouge Parish School Board. (Attachments: #1 Attachment, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(Gee, Michael)(SWE). Modified on 3/21/2019 to flatten and rotate pages (SWE).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Grimes v. West Baton Rouge Parish School Board, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: West Baton Rouge Parish School Board
Represented By: Glenn Brozman Adams
Represented By: Michael G. Gee
Represented By: Marla E Mitchell
Represented By: Michelle DeLoach Brooks
Represented By: Marla Mitchell Abel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Mulina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nakiva Grimes
Represented By: Jill L Craft
Represented By: William Brett Conrad, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?