Louisiana Farm Bureau Mutual Insurance Company v. LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Louisiana Farm Bureau Mutual Insurance Company
Defendant: LG Electronics Alabama, Inc. and LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00208
Filed: April 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Shelly D Dick
Referring Judge: Erin Wilder-Doomes
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 10, 2019 Filing 13 Notice Setting Trial and Related Deadlines: Jury Trial set for 3/29/2021 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3 before Chief Judge Shelly D. Dick. Pretrial Conference set for 3/16/2021 at 03:00 PM in chambers before Chief Judge Shelly D. Dick. Affidavit of Settlement Efforts due by 2/15/2021. All other Trial deadlines are set as stated in the attached Notice. Signed by Chief Judge Shelly D. Dick on 7/10/19. (BKA)
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER: Settlement Conference set for 7/14/2020 at 01:30 PM in chambers. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 7/10/2019. (SWE)
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SCHEDULING ORDER: In accordance with FRCP 16(b), the following discovery deadlines are established. Amended Pleadings due by 10/7/2019. Discovery due by 1/23/2020. Plaintiff`s Expert Witness List due by 1/23/2020. Defendant`s Expert Witness List due by 2/24/2020. Plaintiff`s Expert Reports due by 3/24/2020. Defendant`s Expert Reports due by 4/24/2020. Discovery from Experts due by 6/30/2020. Motions shall be filed by 7/30/2020. The district judge will set the remaining deadlines, including dates for a pretrial conference and trial in this matter. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 7/9/2019. (SWE)
June 24, 2019 Filing 10 Notice to Counsel: The Scheduling Conference set for 6/27/2019 is CANCELED pending further review of the #9 Status Report. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (BLR)
June 10, 2019 Filing 9 STATUS REPORT by Louisiana Farm Bureau Mutual Insurance Company. (Rachel, Adrienne)
June 4, 2019 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Louisiana Farm Bureau Mutual Insurance Company. (Rachel, Adrienne)
April 15, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by LG Electronics Alabama, Inc., LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc..(Frohn, David)
April 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 6/27/2019 at 11:30 AM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes. Status Report due by 6/13/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 4/12/2019. (KAH)
April 12, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Filing Notice of Removal to State Court Clerk by LG Electronics Alabama, Inc., LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc. re #1 Notice of Removal, (Frohn, David)
April 9, 2019 Filing 4 Letter to Attorney Matthew Lee Mann regarding Nicholas K. Pritchett who is Co-Counsel for party Louisiana Farm Bureau Mutual Insurance Company. Attorney is not admitted to practice in LAMD. (KAH)
April 9, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Filing Notice of Removal to Plaintiff by LG Electronics Alabama, Inc., LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc. re #1 Notice of Removal, (Frohn, David)
April 9, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by LG Electronics Alabama, Inc., LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc. (Frohn, David)
April 9, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 19th Judicial District Court, Case Number 680360. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAMDC-1925153), filed by LG Electronics Alabama, Inc., LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-E, #2 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Attachment Certification of State Court Record, #4 Attachment Certification of Counsel)(Frohn, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Louisiana Farm Bureau Mutual Insurance Company v. LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LG Electronics Alabama, Inc.
Represented By: Natasha Amber Corb
Represented By: David R. Frohn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc.
Represented By: Natasha Amber Corb
Represented By: David R. Frohn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Louisiana Farm Bureau Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Matthew Patrick Roth
Represented By: Matthew Lee Mann
Represented By: Adrienne Danielle Rachel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?