Rayborn v. Zanca, LLC
Plaintiff: Bobby Rayborn
Defendant: Zanca, LLC and Bayou Motorcycles, LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv00211
Filed: April 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Richard L Bourgeois
Referring Judge: Shelly D Dick
Nature of Suit: Truth in Lending
Cause of Action: 15:1601
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Motion to Reset Scheduling Conference. In light of the answer deadline of 7/17/2019, the Scheduling Conference set for 7/25/2019 is RESET to 8/22/2019 at 02:00 PM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois Jr. A Status Report shall be filed on or before 8/8/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 7/1/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (SGO)
June 28, 2019 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #9 MOTION to Continue Scheduling Conference . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (KAH)
June 28, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Continue Scheduling Conference by Bobby Rayborn. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Ridge, Garth)
June 28, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bobby Rayborn. Bayou Motorcycles, LLC served on 6/26/2019, answer due 7/17/2019. (Ridge, Garth)
June 20, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Bayou Motorcycles, LLC. (NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve both the summons and all attachments in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4.) (SWE)
June 19, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Submitted (Ridge, Garth)
June 14, 2019 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Bayou Motorcycles, LLC, filed by Bobby Rayborn.(Ridge, Garth)
June 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: As service of process has not been made, the scheduling conference is RESET for 7/25/2019 at 1:45 p.m. to allow plaintiff time to effect service upon defendants. The deadline for filing a Joint Status Report is RESET to 7/11/2019. Failure to file the Joint Status Report may result in a show cause order issued to counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 6/12/2019. (SGO)
April 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 6/20/2019 at 11:00 AM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois Jr. Status Report due by 6/6/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 4/25/2019. (SGO)
April 10, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Zanca, LLC. (NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve both the summons and all attachments in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4.) (SWE)
April 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Zanca, LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAMDC-1925769.), filed by Bobby Rayborn. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Ridge, Garth)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rayborn v. Zanca, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bobby Rayborn
Represented By: Garth Jonathan Ridge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zanca, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bayou Motorcycles, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?