Wells v. Crete Construction, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Terrill Wells
Defendant: Dylan Bagwell and Crete Construction, LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv00217
Filed: April 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Richard L Bourgeois
Referring Judge: Brian A Jackson
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 26, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint and, COUNTERCLAIM against Terrill Wells by Crete Construction, LLC, Dylan Bagwell.(Foster, Murphy)
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SCHEDULING ORDER: The Scheduling Conference set for 6/27/2019 is CANCELLED. In accordance with FRCP 16(b), the following discovery deadlines are established. Amended Pleadings due by 9/26/2019. F.R.C.P. 26(a)(1) disclosures due by 7/31/2019. Discovery due by 12/11/2019. Plaintiff`s Expert Witness List due by 1/8/2020. Defendant`s Expert Witness List due by 1/29/2020. Plaintiff`s Expert Reports due by 2/7/2020. Defendant`s Expert Reports due by 3/6/2020. Discovery from Experts due by 4/22/2020. Motions shall be filed by 5/20/2020. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 9/11/2020. Pretrial Conference set for 10/1/2020 at 01:30 PM in chambers before Judge Brian A. Jackson. Motions In Limine shall be filed by 10/16/2020. Affidavit of Settlement Efforts due by 11/6/2020. Joint jury instructions, voir dire, verdict forms, and trial briefs due by 11/13/2020. Bench Trial set for 11/30/2020 - 12/1/2020 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 2 before Judge Brian A. Jackson. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 6/24/2019. (SGO)
June 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Plead with Request for Expedited Consideration. Defendants Dylan Bagwell and Crete Construction, LLC are granted an extension of time of ten (10) days, or until 6/26/2019, to answer or otherwise plead. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 6/18/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (SGO)
June 18, 2019 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #6 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to #1 Complaint With Request for Expedited Consideration. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (KMW)
June 17, 2019 Filing 6 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to #1 Complaint With Request for Expedited Consideration by Dylan Bagwell, Crete Construction, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading; Order)(Foster, Murphy)
June 13, 2019 Filing 5 Joint STATUS REPORT by Terrill Wells. (Bowling, Tori)
May 3, 2019 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Crete Construction, LLC, Dylan Bagwell. Crete Construction, LLC waiver sent on 4/18/2019, answer due 6/17/2019; Dylan Bagwell waiver sent on 4/18/2019, answer due 6/17/2019. (Foster, Murphy)
April 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 6/27/2019 at 01:30 PM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois Jr. Status Report due by 6/13/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 4/25/2019. (SGO)
April 15, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Dylan Bagwell, Crete Construction, LLC. (NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve both the summons and all attachments in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4.) (Attachments: #1 summons)(EDC)
April 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAMDC-1927613.), filed by Terrill Wells. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(Bowling, Tori)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wells v. Crete Construction, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dylan Bagwell
Represented By: Murphy James Foster, III
Represented By: Jacob Ellis Roussel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crete Construction, LLC
Represented By: Murphy James Foster, III
Represented By: Jacob Ellis Roussel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terrill Wells
Represented By: Tori S. Bowling
Represented By: Vonceil Patrice Haley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?