Eymard v. GEICO Marine Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Scotty Eymard
Defendant: GEICO Marine Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2019cv00219
Filed: April 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Richard L Bourgeois
Referring Judge: John W deGravelles
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SCHEDULING ORDER: The scheduling conference set for 6/6/2019 is CANCELLED. In accordance with FRCP 16(b), the following discovery deadlines are established. Amended Pleadings due by 7/8/2019. Discovery due by 2/6/2020. Plaintiff`s Expert Witness List due by 2/6/2020. Defendant`s Expert Witness List due by 2/6/2020. Plaintiff`s Expert Reports due by 3/6/2020. Defendant`s Expert Reports due by 4/6/2020. Discovery from Experts due by 5/6/2020. Motions shall be filed by 7/6/2020. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 10/29/2020. Pretrial Conference set for 11/19/2020 at 1:30 PM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois Jr. Motions In Limine shall be filed by 12/4/2020. Affidavit of Settlement Efforts due by 12/23/2020. Joint jury instructions, voir dire, verdict forms, and trial briefs due by 12/31/2020. Jury Trial set for 1/18/2021 - 1/19/2021 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 1 before Judge John W. deGravelles. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 5/30/2019. (SGO)
May 23, 2019 Filing 4 Joint STATUS REPORT by GEICO Marine Insurance Company and by Scotty Eymard. (Bland, Wilton)
April 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 6/6/2019 at 01:30 PM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois Jr. Status Report due by 5/23/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 4/25/2019. (SGO)
April 16, 2019 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint by GEICO Marine Insurance Company.(Malish, Jedd)
April 15, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 22nd JDC, Parish of St. Tammany, Case Number 2019-109509. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAMDC-1928186), filed by GEICO Marine Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet)(Malish, Jedd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Eymard v. GEICO Marine Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GEICO Marine Insurance Company
Represented By: Jedd S. Malish
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scotty Eymard
Represented By: Wilton Ellwood Bland, III
Represented By: Adam P. Sanderson
Represented By: Trevor M. Cutaiar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?