United States of America v. Belden Investments, L.L.C. et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Belden Investments, L.L.C., Interstate Exploration, LLC and Pharaoh Oil & Gas, Incorporated
Case Number: 3:2019cv00224
Filed: April 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Shelly D Dick
Referring Judge: Erin Wilder-Doomes
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 21, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Initial Disclosures by Pharaoh Oil & Gas, Incorporated (Crawford, Michael)
June 20, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: For court use. (BLR)
June 20, 2019 Filing 13 Notice to Counsel: In light of all defendants having not made an appearance and and answers to the complaint having been due 6/17/2019, the Scheduling Conference is reset for 8/1/2019 at 10:00 AM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes. Status Report due by 7/18/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (BLR)
June 19, 2019 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Pharaoh Oil & Gas, Incorporated. (Crawford, Michael)
June 17, 2019 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Interstate Exploration, LLC. (Flanagan, Harold)
June 17, 2019 Filing 10 Affirmative Defenses and ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Interstate Exploration, LLC.(Flanagan, Harold)
June 17, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Pharaoh Oil & Gas, Incorporated.(Crawford, Michael)
June 13, 2019 Filing 8 First STATUS REPORT by All Parties by United States of America. (Carroll, Thomas)
May 24, 2019 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Belden Investments, L.L.C.. Belden Investments, L.L.C. waiver sent on 4/18/2019, answer due 6/17/2019. (Salley, David) Modified correct sent and due date on 6/20/2019 (BLR).
May 17, 2019 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by United States of America. Interstate Exploration, LLC waiver sent on 4/18/2019, answer due 6/17/2019. (Carroll, Thomas)
May 10, 2019 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by United States of America. Pharaoh Oil & Gas, Incorporated waiver sent on 4/18/2019, answer due 6/17/2019. (Carroll, Thomas)
April 18, 2019 Set Hearings: Scheduling Conference set for 6/27/2019 at 02:00 PM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes. (NLT)
April 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 6/27/2019 at 02:00 PM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes. Status Report due by 6/13/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 04/17/2019. (NLT) Modified on 4/18/2019 to edit the text (NLT).
April 17, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by United States of America (Zachary, Chase)
April 17, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Belden Investments, L.L.C., Interstate Exploration, LLC, Pharaoh Oil & Gas, Incorporated. (NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve both the summons and all attachments in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4.) (KAH)
April 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons - Belden Investments, #3 Summons - Interstate Exploration, #4 Summons - Pharaoh Oil & Gas)(Zachary, Chase)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Belden Investments, L.L.C. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Belden Investments, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Interstate Exploration, LLC
Represented By: Harold J. Flanagan
Represented By: Anders F Holmgren
Represented By: Ann Redlich Koppel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pharaoh Oil & Gas, Incorporated
Represented By: Michael Allen Crawford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Chase Evan Zachary
Represented By: Thomas P. Carroll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?