Simpson v. Rowe et al

Plaintiff: Darrin Simpson
Defendant: Unknown Rowe and Unknown Davis
Case Number: 3:2019cv00225
Filed: April 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Richard L Bourgeois
Referring Judge: Shelly D Dick
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Conditions
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 18, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Documents (Letter to the Showing of Due Deligence) Returned to the Inmate for Non Compliance with Local Rule 5(e)(1). Document returned electronically and original returned via USPS. (Attachments: #1 local rule, #2 Proposed Pleading;)(EDC)
May 28, 2019 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #4 MOTION for Leave to File to File An Amended Complaint. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (EDC)
May 28, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to File An Amended Complaint by Darrin Simpson. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading;, #2 summons)(EDC)
May 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #2 Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. It is ordered that the plaintiff pay an initial partial filing fee of $8.17 in accordance with 28 USC 1915. A copy of this order shall be sent to the plaintiff and to Centralized Inmate Banking. Filing Fee due by 6/6/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 5/16/2019. (KAH)
April 16, 2019 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #2 MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis with Statement of Account. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (EDC)
April 15, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis with Statement of Account by Darrin Simpson. (EDC)
April 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Unknown Davis, Unknown Rowe, filed by Darrin Simpson.(EDC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Simpson v. Rowe et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darrin Simpson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Rowe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?