Ziegler v. Weatherspoon et al
Plaintiff: Philip Ziegler
Defendant: Lionel Weatherspoon, Progressive Security Insurance Company, Allmerica Financial Benefit Insurance Company and James River Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2019cv00235
Filed: April 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Office: Baton Rouge Office
Presiding Judge: Shelly D Dick
Referring Judge: Erin Wilder-Doomes
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 24, 2019 Filing 11 Notice to Counsel: The Scheduling Conference set for 6/27/2019 is CANCELED pending further review of the #10 Status Report. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (BLR)
June 12, 2019 Filing 10 STATUS REPORT by Philip Ziegler. (Prendergast, Brian) Modified on 6/12/2019 to edit the text (SWE).
June 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Motion to Enroll as Attorney. Added attorney John E. Unsworth, III for Allmerica Financial Benefit Insurance Company. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 6/7/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (BLR)
June 6, 2019 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #8 MOTION to Enroll John E. Unsworth, III as Attorney . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (KMW)
June 6, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Enroll John E. Unsworth, III as Attorney by Allmerica Financial Benefit Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Order)(Unsworth, John)
May 15, 2019 Filing 7 Consent to Removal by Philip Ziegler (Prendergast, Brian)
May 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Ex Parte MOTION to Substitute Document. The clerk is directed to replace R. Doc. 1 with 5-2 and replace R. Docs. 1-1 through 1-8 with 5-3 though 5-11. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 5/10/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (BLR)
May 10, 2019 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #5 Ex Parte MOTION to Substitute Notice of Removal with Amended Notice of Removal. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (EDC)
May 9, 2019 Filing 5 Ex Parte MOTION to Substitute Notice of Removal with Amended Notice of Removal by James River Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proposed Pleading;, #3 Proposed Pleading; Exhibit A, #4 Proposed Pleading; Exhibit B, #5 Proposed Pleading; Exhibit C, #6 Proposed Pleading; Exhibit D, #7 Proposed Pleading; Exhibit E, #8 Proposed Pleading; Exhibit F, #9 Proposed Pleading; Exhibit G, #10 Proposed Pleading; Exhibit H, #11 Proposed Pleading; Exhibit I)(Truxillo, Kevin) (Attachment 11 replaced on 5/10/2019) (EDC). Modified on 5/10/2019 to rotate pages. (EDC).
April 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE AND ORDER: On or before 5/10/2019, James River Insurance Company shall file a motion to substitute the Notice of Removal with a comprehensive Amended Notice of Removal that adequately alleges the citizenship of all named parties in this action, including Lionel Weatherspoon, Progressive Security Insurance Company, and The Hanover American Insurance Company. On or before 5/24/2019, Plaintiff shall file either: (1) a Notice stating that Plaintiff does not dispute that James River has established the jurisdictional requirements of 28 U.S.C. 1332; or (2) a Motion to Remand. The case will be allowed to proceed if jurisdiction is adequately established. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 4/29/2019. (KAH)
April 25, 2019 Filing 3 Letter to Attorney Brian J. Prendergast regarding Joseph R. Cataldie who is Co-Counsel for party Philip M. Ziegler. Attorney is not admitted to practice in LAMD. (ELW)
April 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 6/27/2019 at 02:30 PM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes. Status Report due by 6/13/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 4/24/2019. (KAH)
April 22, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 19th Judicial District Court, Case Number 674750. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAMDC-1930798), filed by James River Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Attachment Certificate of Service, #10 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet, #11 Attachment State Court Record)(Truxillo, Kevin) (Attachment 7 replaced on 4/23/2019) (ELW). Modified on 4/23/2019 to correct page orientation (ELW).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ziegler v. Weatherspoon et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Philip Ziegler
Represented By: Brian J. Prendergast
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lionel Weatherspoon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Progressive Security Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allmerica Financial Benefit Insurance Company
Represented By: Leon Anthony Crist
Represented By: John E. Unsworth, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James River Insurance Company
Represented By: Kevin Truxillo
Represented By: Danielle Mikel Sczesny
Represented By: Lyon H. Garrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?