Pastorick v. Pelican Point Realty, LLC d/b/a Pelican Point Golf & Country Club
Plaintiff: Lillie Pastorick
Defendant: Pelican Point Realty, LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv00236
Filed: April 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Richard L Bourgeois
Referring Judge: Brian A Jackson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SCHEDULING ORDER: The Scheduling Conference set for 6/27/2019 is CANCELLED. In accordance with FRCP 16(b), the following discovery deadlines are established. Amended Pleadings due by 6/28/2019. F.R.C.P. 26(a)(1) disclosures due by 6/28/2019. Discovery due by 12/2/2019. Plaintiff`s Expert Witness List due by 8/15/2019. Defendant`s Expert Witness List due by 9/16/2019. Plaintiff`s Expert Reports due by 9/3/2019. Defendant`s Expert Reports due by 10/1/2019. Discovery from Experts due by 12/2/2019. Motions shall be filed by 1/2/2020. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 4/23/2020. Pretrial Conference set for 5/14/2020 at 01:30 PM in chambers before Judge Brian A. Jackson. Motions In Limine shall be filed by 5/29/2020. Affidavit of Settlement Efforts due by 6/11/2020. Joint jury instructions, voir dire, verdict forms, and trial briefs due by 7/2/2020. Jury Trial set for 7/20/2020 - 7/22/2020 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 2 before Judge Brian A. Jackson. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 6/24/2019. (SGO)
June 4, 2019 Filing 6 Joint STATUS REPORT by Lillie Pastorick. (Craft, Jill)
May 21, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint by Pelican Point Realty, LLC.(Lambert, Kristyn)
May 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 6/27/2019 at 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois Jr. Status Report due by 6/13/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 06/27/2019. (ELW)
May 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Pelican Point Realty, LLC's answer due 5/21/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 5/1/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (JSL)
April 29, 2019 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #2 Ex Parte MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (SGO)
April 26, 2019 Filing 2 Ex Parte MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Pelican Point Realty, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading; Order)(Lambert, Kristyn)
April 23, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 23rd JDC, Ascension Parish, Case Number 125,115 Div B. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAMDC-1931120), filed by Pelican Point Realty, LLC d/b/a Pelican Point Golf & Country Club. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet)(Lambert, Kristyn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pastorick v. Pelican Point Realty, LLC d/b/a Pelican Point Golf & Country Club
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pelican Point Realty, LLC
Represented By: Jennifer L. Englander
Represented By: Kristyn L. Lambert
Represented By: Christopher E. Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lillie Pastorick
Represented By: Jill L Craft
Represented By: William Brett Conrad, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?