Falgout et al v. Johnson & Johnson et al
Plaintiff: Ronald Falgout and Chad Falgout
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson Consumer Companies, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, ABC Company, K&B Louisiana Corporation and XYZ Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2019cv00242
Filed: April 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Shelly D Dick
Referring Judge: Erin Wilder-Doomes
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 11:101
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 26, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Supplemental Authority in Support of #8 Motion to Remand by Chad Falgout, Ronald Falgout (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Cheek, Lindsey) Modified on 6/27/2019 to edit the text (KAH).
June 14, 2019 Filing 16 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to #8 Emergency MOTION to Remand filed by Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Companies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit)(ELW)
June 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #14 Ex Parte Motion for Leave to Exceed Page Limit. The clerk is directed to file R. Doc. 14-1 through 14-7 into the record. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 6/14/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (BLR)
June 13, 2019 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #14 Ex Parte MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand by Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc. and. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (LT)
June 13, 2019 Filing 14 Ex Parte MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages in Opposition to #8 Plaintiff's Motion to Remand by Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc. and by Johnson & Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading; Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand, #2 Exhibit 1 to Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand, #3 Exhibit 2 to Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand, #4 Exhibit 3 to Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand, #5 Exhibit 4 to Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand, #6 Exhibit 5 to Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand, #7 Exhibit 6 to Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand, #8 Proposed Pleading; Proposed Order)(Sossamon, Meera) Modified on 6/13/2019 to create a relationship (LT).
May 28, 2019 Filing 13 MEMORANDUM in Support of #8 Emergency MOTION to Remand filed by Chad Falgout, Ronald Falgout. (SWE)
May 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER denying #10 Motion for Oral Argument on #8 Emergency Motion to Remand. If the Court determines that oral argument will assist in resolution of the Emergency Motion to Remand, the Court will order oral argument. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 5/28/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (BLR)
May 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting for good cause the #9 MOTION for Leave to File Memo in Support of Motion to remand. The clerk of court is directed to file R. Doc. 9-1 into the record. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 5/28/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (BLR)
May 24, 2019 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #10 MOTION for Oral Argument on #8 Emergency MOTION to Remand , #8 Emergency MOTION to Remand , #9 MOTION for Leave to File Memo in Support of Motion to remand . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (EDC)
May 23, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Oral Argument on #8 Emergency MOTION to Remand by Chad Falgout, Ronald Falgout. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading;)(Cheek, Lindsey)
May 23, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to File Memo in Support of Motion to remand by Chad Falgout, Ronald Falgout. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed Pleading;)(Cheek, Lindsey)
May 23, 2019 Filing 8 Emergency MOTION to Remand by Chad Falgout, Ronald Falgout. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading;, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D1, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit F, #9 Notice of Submission)(Cheek, Lindsey)
May 21, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER and Defenses to Plaintiff's Original Petition for Damages with Jury Demand by Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc. and by Johnson & Johnson.(Sossamon, Meera) Modified on 5/21/2019 to edit docket text (KMW).
May 1, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Recent Court Decision from the Southern District of New York by Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Companies, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Recent Decision from SDNY Court)(Benach, Carlos)
April 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Johnson & Johnson answer due 5/21/2019; Johnson & Johnson Consumer Companies, Inc. answer due 5/21/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 04/30/2019. (ELW)
April 30, 2019 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #4 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to #1 Notice of Removal, . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (KAH)
April 29, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to #1 Notice of Removal, by Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Companies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Benach, Carlos)
April 24, 2019 Filing 3 Letter to JPML Panel notifying panel of possible JPML case (SWE)
April 24, 2019 Filing 2 Letter to Attorney Lindsey A. Cheek regarding Rubi L. Brown who is Co-Counsel for party Ronald Falgout and Chad Falgout. Attorney is not admitted to practice in LAMD. (SWE)
April 23, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 19th Judicial District, Case Number C-6760243. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAMDC-1931437), filed by Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certified State Court Record, #2 Exhibit B -- Part 1, #3 Exhibit B -- Part 2, #4 Exhibit B -- Part 3, #5 Exhibit B -- Part 4, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(Sossamon, Meera)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Falgout et al v. Johnson & Johnson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson Consumer Companies, Inc.
Represented By: Leila A. D'Aquin
Represented By: Claire A. Noonan
Represented By: John W. Sinnott
Represented By: Carlos A Benach
Represented By: Kim E. Moore
Represented By: Meera Unnithan Sossamon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Represented By: Leila A. D'Aquin
Represented By: Claire A. Noonan
Represented By: John W. Sinnott
Represented By: Carlos A Benach
Represented By: Kim E. Moore
Represented By: Meera Unnithan Sossamon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K&B Louisiana Corporation
Represented By: Lambert J. Hassinger, Jr.
Represented By: Jeffrey J Siemann
Represented By: Jonathan D Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: XYZ Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald Falgout
Represented By: Scott Michael Galante
Represented By: Christopher Joseph Fransen
Represented By: Lindsey A Cheek
Represented By: Damon R. Pourciau
Represented By: Jeanne Louise St. Romain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chad Falgout
Represented By: Scott Michael Galante
Represented By: Christopher Joseph Fransen
Represented By: Lindsey A Cheek
Represented By: Damon R. Pourciau
Represented By: Jeanne Louise St. Romain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?