Darren James & Associates, Inc. v. Moleads, LLC
Plaintiff: Darren James & Associates, Inc.
Defendant: Moleads, LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv00245
Filed: April 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Richard L Bourgeois
Referring Judge: John W deGravelles
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 19, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Court Use Only) (SGO)
June 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER: The Clerk's Office shall STRIKE record documents 9 through 11 and the Motion to File Separate Status Report (R. Dec. 9) and Motion to Supplement Motion for Leave to File Separate Status Report and Motion to Strike (R. Doc. 11) are DENIED AS MOOT. The scheduling conference is RESET for 8/22/2019 at 3:00 p.m. in chambers to allow plaintiff time to effect service upon defendants. The joint status report is to be filed no later than 8/8/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 6/18/2019. (SGO)
June 14, 2019 MOTION(S) REFERRED: 11 MOTION to Supplement Motion for Leave to File Separate Status Report MOTION to Strike an Incorrectly Filed Document 10 Status Report. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (SWE)
June 14, 2019 Filing 11 STRICKEN FROM THE RECORD MOTION to Supplement Motion for Leave to File Separate Status Report, MOTION to Strike an Incorrectly Filed Document 10 Status Report by Darren James & Associates, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment Order, # 2 Proposed Pleading; Status Report, # 3 Exhibit Proof of Attempted Service, # 4 Exhibit Proof of Service)(Platte, Michael) Modified on 6/14/2019 to edit the text (SWE). Modified on 6/19/2019 to remove the document as it has been stricken per RD 12 (SGO).
June 13, 2019 Filing 10 STRICKEN FROM THE RECORD First STATUS REPORT by Darren James & Associates, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Service Attempt, # 2 Exhibit Proof of Service)(Platte, Michael) Modified on 6/19/2019 to remove the document as it has been stricken per RD 12 (SGO).
June 13, 2019 MOTION(S) REFERRED: 9 First MOTION for Leave to File Separate Status Report. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (SWE)
June 13, 2019 Filing 9 STRICKEN FROM THE RECORD First MOTION for Leave to File Separate Status Report by Darren James & Associates, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Pleading; Order)(Platte, Michael) Modified on 6/19/2019 to remove the document as it has been stricken per RD 12 (SGO).
June 10, 2019 Filing 8 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Moleads, LLC filed by Darren James & Associates, Inc.(SGO)
June 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Motion to Amend Petition for Damages. The Clerk's Office shall filed R. Doc. 6-2 into the record of this matter as it properly alleges citizenship of Plaintiff Darren James & Associates, Inc. and defendant MoLeads, LLC. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 6/10/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (SGO)
June 6, 2019 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #6 First MOTION to Amend Petition. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (LT)
June 6, 2019 Filing 6 First MOTION to Amend Petition by Darren James & Associates, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Attachment, #2 Proposed Pleading;)(Platte, Michael)
June 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1653, on or before 6/13/2019 the plaintiff shall file an amended complaint providing the citizenship of Plaintiff Darren James & Associates, Inc. and defendant MoLeads, LLC, by setting forth all citizenship particulars required to sustain federal diversity jurisdiction. Amended Pleadings due by 6/13/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 6/6/2019. (SWE)
May 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1653, on or before 5/28/2019, the plaintiff shall file an amended complaint providing the citizenship of plaintiff Darren James & Associates, Inc. and defendant MoLeads, LLC, by setting forth all citizenship particulars required to sustain federal diversity jurisdiction. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 5/22/2019. (SGO) Modified on 5/22/2019 to edit text (SGO).
May 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 6/27/2019 at 02:30 PM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois Jr. Status Report due by 6/13/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 5/6/2019. (SGO)
April 25, 2019 Case reassigned to Judge John W. deGravelles. Chief Judge Shelly D. Dick no longer assigned to the case. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (NLT)
April 24, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Moleads, LLC. (NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve both the summons and all attachments in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4.) (KAH)
April 24, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Moleads, LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAMDC-1931685.), filed by Darren James & Associates, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Attachment, #2 Attachment)(Platte, Michael) Modified on 4/24/2019 to flatten attachments (KAH).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Darren James & Associates, Inc. v. Moleads, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darren James & Associates, Inc.
Represented By: David H. Ogwyn
Represented By: Michael Eugene Platte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Moleads, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?