De La Cruz v. Master Stucco Brick and Gutters, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Rodolfo De La Cruz
Defendant: Wilfredo Castro, Master Stucco Brick and Gutters, Inc. and Liliana Viera
Case Number: 3:2019cv00247
Filed: April 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Shelly D Dick
Referring Judge: Erin Wilder-Doomes
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 3, 2019 Filing 8 Notice to Counsel: In light of the parties having not submitted a Joint Status Report, the Scheduling Conference is reset for 8/15/2019 at 10:00 AM in chambers before Chief Judge Shelly D. Dick. Status Report due by 8/1/2019.(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.)(BLR)
June 4, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Wilfredo Castro, Master Stucco Brick and Gutters, Inc., Liliana Viera.(Saunders, Henri)
May 31, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Rodolfo De La Cruz. Wilfredo Castro served on 5/22/2019, answer due 6/12/2019. (Davis, Daniel)
May 31, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Rodolfo De La Cruz. Master Stucco Brick and Gutters, Inc. served on 5/22/2019, answer due 6/12/2019. (Davis, Daniel)
May 31, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Rodolfo De La Cruz. Liliana Viera served on 5/22/2019, answer due 6/12/2019. (Davis, Daniel)
May 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 7/11/2019 at 10:30 AM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes. Status Report due by 6/27/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 05/01/2019. (ELW)
April 25, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Wilfredo Castro, Master Stucco Brick and Gutters, Inc., Liliana Viera. (NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve both the summons and all attachments in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4.) (SWE)
April 24, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Wilfredo Castro, Master Stucco Brick and Gutters, Inc., Liliana Viera ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAMDC-1932033.), filed by Rodolfo De La Cruz. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Attachment Summons, #3 Attachment Summons, #4 Attachment Summons)(Davis, Daniel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: De La Cruz v. Master Stucco Brick and Gutters, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rodolfo De La Cruz
Represented By: Daniel Brian Davis
Represented By: Vivian Jeansonne
Represented By: Randall Eugene Estes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wilfredo Castro
Represented By: Henri Michel Saunders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Master Stucco Brick and Gutters, Inc.
Represented By: Henri Michel Saunders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liliana Viera
Represented By: Henri Michel Saunders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?