McAdams v. Receivable Recovery Services, LLC
Plaintiff: Michael McAdams
Defendant: Receivable Recovery Services, LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv00248
Filed: April 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Brian A Jackson
Referring Judge: Erin Wilder-Doomes
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 3, 2019 Filing 14 Notice to Counsel: In light of the pending #9 Motion to Dismiss, good cause is shown to defer entry of a scheduling order at this time. The court will review this matter in 120 days. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (BLR)
July 3, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Service of Initial Disclosures by Receivable Recovery Services, LLC (McMullan, Johanna)
June 25, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for Leave to File AUDIO CD by Receivable Recovery Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Proposed Order)(McMullan, Johanna)
June 25, 2019 Filing 11 First STATUS REPORT by Michael McAdams. (Imbraguglio, Niko)
June 18, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Receivable Recovery Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Petition for Probate of Notarial Will, #2 Exhibit B Order Appointing Executor)(McMullan, Johanna)
June 18, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss or, MOTION for Summary Judgment by Receivable Recovery Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A DUPP of KNaquin, #2 Exhibit B DUPP of WVW, #3 Exhibit C Marie McAdams Obituary from the Advocate, #4 Exhibit D Petition for Probate of Notarial Will, #5 Exhibit E Order Appointing Executor, #6 Statement of Undisputed Facts, #7 Memorandum in Support)(McMullan, Johanna) (Attachment 1 replaced on 6/18/2019 to correct page orientation) (KMW).
June 3, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Michael McAdams. Receivable Recovery Services, LLC served on 5/6/2019, answer due 6/18/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Summons, #2 Exhibit Green Card)(Imbraguglio, Niko)
May 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Receivable Recovery Services, LLC responsive pleadings due 6/18/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 5/29/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (BLR)
May 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #4 Motion for William V. Westbrook, III to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 5/29/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (BLR)
May 29, 2019 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #5 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (KMW)
May 28, 2019 Filing 5 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Receivable Recovery Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(McMullan, Johanna) Modified on 5/29/2019 to edit docket text (KMW).
May 24, 2019 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #4 MOTION for WILLIAM V. WESTBROOK, III to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $100.00, Receipt Number ALAMDC-1946939). This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (LT)
May 24, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for WILLIAM V. WESTBROOK, III to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $100.00, Receipt Number ALAMDC-1946939) by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Affidavit, #3 Exhibit)(McMullan, Johanna)
May 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 7/11/2019 at 09:30 AM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes. Status Report due by 6/27/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 05/01/2019. (ELW)
April 25, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Receivable Recovery Services, LLC. (NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve both the summons and all attachments in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4.) (ELW)
April 24, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Receivable Recovery Services, LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAMDC-1932140.), filed by Michael McAdams. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Proposed Summons)(Imbraguglio, Niko)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McAdams v. Receivable Recovery Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Receivable Recovery Services, LLC
Represented By: William V. Westbrook, III
Represented By: Johanna Malbrough McMullan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael McAdams
Represented By: Niko Imbraguglio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?